California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 5:23-cv-00062
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2023
Terminated:May 04, 2023
Case in other court:Riverside Superior, CVRI2205012
Last checked: Friday Jul 14, 2023 2:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Rafael Alvarez
Represented By
Benjamin Sanchez
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
DOES 1-100
Defendant
Angelo Ortiz
Represented By
Benjamin Sanchez
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
QG Printing II LLC
Represented By
Yesenia Garcia Perez
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Gregory G Iskander
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Benjamin Sanchez
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Defendant
Quad Graphics, Inc.
Represented By
Yesenia Garcia Perez
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Gregory G Iskander
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Benjamin Sanchez
Littler Mendelson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eliud Ramirez
Represented By
Thomas R Nigro
Law Office Of Thomas Nigro
contact info
Nicholas K Cameron
Law Offices Of Nicholas Cameron And Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 04, 2023
21 21 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Thu 05/04 3:24 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of California, County of Riverside. (twdb)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Remand Case to State Court Thu 05/04 3:22 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Order (1) GRANTING Plaintiffs Motion to Remand and for Attorneys Fees (Dkt. No. 10); (2) VACATING the May 8, 2023 Hearing; and (3) VACATING the June 26, 2023 Scheduling Conference10 . Case Remanded to Superior Court, County of Riverside CVRI2205012. For the reasons above, the Court GRANTS the Motion, REMANDS to the Riverside County Superior Court, and AWARDS Plaintiff $7,600 in attorneys fees. The May 8, 2023 hearing is VACATED. The Scheduling Conference set for June 26, 2023 is VACATED. The Clerk is directed to close the case. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
19 19 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 04/28 12:05 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: First MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court10 . THE HEARING ON THE MOTION IS CONTINUED FROM 5/1/2023 TO 5/8/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 04/21 10:54 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: First MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court10 . THE HEARING ON THE MOTION IS CONTINUED FROM 4/24/2023 TO 5/1/2023 AT 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
17 17 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 04/17 2:53 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (tc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines Fri 04/07 2:50 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulated Request to Continue Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand15 . ( Motion hearing continued to 4/24/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
15 15 stip Continue Tue 04/04 5:23 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand from April 10, 2023 to April 24, 2023 filed by Defendants Rafael Alvarez, Angelo Ortiz, QG Printing II LLC, Quad Graphics, Inc..(Attorney Benjamin Sanchez added to party Rafael Alvarez(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Sanchez added to party Angelo Ortiz(pty:dft))(Sanchez, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 30, 2023
14 14 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 03/30 6:09 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court10 . The HEARING on the Motion set for 4/3/2023 is CONTINUED TO 4/10/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 03/09 6:59 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court10 . THE HEARING ON THE MOTION IS CONTINUED FROM 3/13/2023 TO 4/3/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
12 12 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 02/23 2:34 PM
REPLY Support First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court10 filed by Plaintiff Eliud Ramirez.(Cameron, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff Eliud Ramirez in Support of Plaintiff's Reply Brief
Friday, February 17, 2023
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/17 7:06 PM
OPPOSITION to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court10 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendants QG Printing II LLC, Quad Graphics, Inc..(Iskander, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Gregory Iskander ISO of Opp to Motion to Remand,
Att: 2 Declaration of Rafael Alvarez ISO of OPP to Motion to Remand,
Att: 3 Declaration of Angelo Ortiz ISO of OPP to Motion to Remand
Thursday, February 09, 2023
10 10 motion Remand Case to State Court Thu 02/09 2:37 PM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court filed by ELIUD RAMIREZ Eliud Ramirez. Motion set for hearing on 3/13/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Cameron, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Plaintiff Eluid Ramirez's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand the case to Riverside Superior Court and Request for Attorney Fees and Expenses,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Attorney Nicholas Cameron in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Riverside Superior Court and for Attorney Fees,
Att: 3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] Order to Remand Case to Superior Court of California, Riverside Historic Courthouse
Friday, January 20, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 01/20 4:12 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 01/17 5:58 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 01/17 5:57 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 01/17 5:57 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
4 4 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 01/13 12:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant QG Printing II LLC, Quad Graphics, Inc., re Notice of Related Case(s)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement3 served on 1/13/2023. (Iskander, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/13 12:07 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants QG Printing II LLC, Quad Graphics, Inc. (Iskander, Gregory)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Related Case(s) Fri 01/13 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant QG Printing II LLC, Quad Graphics, Inc.. (Iskander, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 75 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 01/13 11:52 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior, case number CVRI2205012 Receipt No: ACACDC-34616718 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant QG Printing II LLC, Quad Graphics, Inc.. (Attorney Gregory G Iskander added to party QG Printing II LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Gregory G Iskander added to party Quad Graphics, Inc.(pty:dft))(Iskander, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Declaration of Kim Brothers In Support Of Removal Of Civil Action From State Court Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332(D), 1441 And 1446
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 01/17 4:05 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Eliud Ramirez in Riverside Superior Court on 11-16/2022, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Tue 01/17 4:09 PM
NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants QG Printing II LLC and Quad Graphics, Inc, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
Related: [-]