Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-13918

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:23-ap-01007
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2023
Terminated:May 07, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Holy Grounds Tiny Homes, LLC
3697 S Natches Court
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Holy Grounds Tiny Homes, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Holy Grounds Real Estate
3697 S Natches Court
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Holy Grounds Real Estate
contact info
Defendant
Revelations in Christ Ministries
3697 S. Natches Ct.
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Revelations in Christ Ministries
contact info
Defendant
Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC
3697 S Natches Court
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Sowash
3697 S Natches Court
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Matthew Sowash
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin & Andra Ramsay
1899 Vista Plaza Street
Severance, CO 80550
Represented By
Arthur Lindquist-Kleissler
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 05/07 11:33 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 23-01007 TBM. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. (saa)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/07 11:36 AM
Adversary Case Number 23-01007 TBM Closed. (saa)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 17, 2024
31 31 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/17 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 03/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Judgment for AP Case
Friday, March 15, 2024
30 30 order Judgment for AP Case Fri 03/15 3:10 PM
Judgment against Revelations in Christ Ministries f/k/a Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC, dba Holy Grounds Real Estate and in favor of Plaintiffs in the amount of Fifty-Eight Thousand One Hundred Thirty Dollars ($58,130.00) (the Judgment). Related [+]. (saa)
Related: [-] 28 Other Order
Thursday, March 14, 2024
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/14 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 03/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Other Order
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
28 28 order Other Order Tue 03/12 11:41 AM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Judgment and Dismissal of Certain Parties. Related [+]. (saa)
Related: [-] 27 Motion
Friday, March 08, 2024
27 27 motion Motion Fri 03/08 10:45 AM
Motion Entry of Judgment and the Dismissal of Parties Filed by Arthur Lindquist-Kleissler on behalf of Holy Grounds Real Estate, Holy Grounds Tiny Homes, LLC, Kevin & Andra Ramsay, Revelations in Christ Ministries, Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC, Matthew Sowash. (Lindquist-Kleissler, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 01/31 10:18 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 01/31/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Monday, January 29, 2024
25 25 order Abeyance Mon 01/29 11:40 AM
Order Granting Motion To Hold Adversary Case In Abeyance Related [+]. Document due by 3/8/2024 for24 , (saa)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Friday, January 26, 2024
24 24 motion Abeyance Fri 01/26 10:10 AM
Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of Holy Grounds Real Estate, Holy Grounds Tiny Homes, LLC, Revelations in Christ Ministries, Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC, Matthew Sowash. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, December 07, 2023
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/07 10:16 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 12/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order on Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
22 22 order Abeyance Tue 12/05 11:03 AM
Order Denying Motion To Hold Adversary Case In Abeyance without Prejudice. Related [+]. (saa)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
21 21 motion Abeyance Wed 11/29 3:55 PM
Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 07/12 10:16 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Setting Hearing
Monday, July 10, 2023
19 19 order Set Hearing (Adversary) Mon 07/10 3:19 PM
Order Modifying Scheduling Order and Setting Trial. Related [+]. Final Pre-Trial Hearing to be held on 2/15/2024 at 10:30 AM Courtroom E for1 , . Trial to be held on 2/27/2024 at 09:00 AM Courtroom E for1 , . Stipulation of Exhibits, Pretrial Statement and jurisdictional briefs due by 2/8/2024 for1 , (saa)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
court Notice of Judge Reassignment (Batch) Wed 06/28 4:10 PM
Notice of Reassignment of Case. Judge Thomas B. McNamara added to case. Involvement of Judge Elizabeth E. Brown, terminated. This reassignment is for internal purposes only. Any hearing currently scheduled may be rescheduled. A separate notice will be issued if a hearing is rescheduled. Any pleadings in this matter must display the initials TBM after the case number. . (pt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/31 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 03/31/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 7016 Scheduling Order
17 17 misc 26 (a) Disclosure Fri 03/31 9:06 AM
F.R.C.P. 26 (a) Disclosure Filed by Arthur Lindquist-Kleissler on behalf of Kevin & Andra Ramsay Related [+]. (Lindquist-Kleissler, Arthur)
Related: [-] 16 7016 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
16 16 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Wed 03/29 5:00 PM
Scheduling Order for Pre-Trial Deadlines Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7016(b) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) (related document(s)1 Complaint). Discovery due by 12/31/2023, Dispositive Motions due 1/15/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2023. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
15 15 misc 7026 (f) Report Thu 03/23 11:41 AM
F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Arthur Lindquist-Kleissler on behalf of Kevin & Andra Ramsay Related [+]. (Lindquist-Kleissler, Arthur)
Related: [-] 13 Order to File
Friday, March 03, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/04 10:11 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 03/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order to File
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
13 13 order File Wed 03/01 8:12 AM
Order for Compliance with Rule 7026, Fed.R.Bankr.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.) Related [+]. Parties to file written report by 3/31/2023 for1 . (mjb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, February 27, 2023
12 12 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/27 2:00 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jonathan Dickey on behalf of Holy Grounds Tiny Homes, LLC. (Dickey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/27 10:03 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brian DeBauche on behalf of Matthew Sowash... (DeBauche, Brian)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 02/27 9:11 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of Revelations in Christ Ministries, Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/27 8:18 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of Holy Grounds Real Estate, Holy Grounds Tiny Homes, LLC, Revelations in Christ Ministries, Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC, Matthew Sowash Related [+]. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, February 16, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/16 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 02/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
7 7 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 02/14 8:52 AM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To for Defendants to File Responses to Complaint. Holy Grounds Real Estate Answer Due 2/27/2023; Holy Grounds Tiny Homes, LLC Answer Due 2/27/2023; Revelations in Christ Ministries Answer Due 2/27/2023; Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC Answer Due 2/27/2023; Matthew Sowash Answer Due 2/27/2023 Related [+]. (mjb)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, February 13, 2023
6 6 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 02/13 12:13 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Aaron J. Conrardy on behalf of Revelations in Christ Ministries Related [+]. (Conrardy, Aaron)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
5 5 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 01/17 9:12 AM
Summons Service Executed On: Revelations in Christ Ministries Matthew Sowash Registered Agent; Revelations in Christ Ministries Matthew Sowash, President, Holy Grounds Tiny Homes, LLC Matthew Sowash, President, Revelations in Christ Ministries Matthew Sowash, President, Holy Grounds Real Estate Matthew Sowash, President Filed by Arthur Lindquist-Kleissler on behalf of Kevin & Andra Ramsay. (Lindquist-Kleissler, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
4 4 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 01/13 9:55 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-01007 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31745993. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Fri 01/13 9:46 AM
Summons Service Executed On: Holy Grounds Tiny Homes, LLC, Holy Grounds Real Estate, Revelations in Christ Ministries, Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC and Matthew Sowash Filed by Arthur Lindquist-Kleissler on behalf of Kevin & Andra Ramsay. (Lindquist-Kleissler, Arthur)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 01/13 9:43 AM
Summons Issued on Holy Grounds Real Estate Answer Due 02/13/2023; Holy Grounds Tiny Homes, LLC Answer Due 02/13/2023; Revelations in Christ Ministries Answer Due 02/13/2023; Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC Answer Due 02/13/2023; Matthew Sowash Answer Due 02/13/2023. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Lindquist-Kleissler, Arthur)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/13 9:41 AM
Adversary case 23-01007 Complaint by Kevin & Andra Ramsay against Holy Grounds Tiny Homes, LLC, Holy Grounds Real Estate, Revelations in Christ Ministries, Revelations in Christ Ministries, LLC, Matthew Sowash. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 05/15/2023 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Lindquist-Kleissler, Arthur)
Related: [-]