Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-00534
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jul 13, 2023 5:17 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
JUSTIN LEE ELLIOTT
Represented By
MUHAMMAD S AZIZ
Abraham Watkins Nichols Etc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Thursday, January 19, 2023
5 5 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 01/19 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by JUSTIN LEE ELLIOTT re3 Amended Complaint (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
misc Docket Annotation Tue 01/17 10:23 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Counsel - Please see Local Rule 15.1(B) Separately Docketing a Motion for Leave and the Amended Pleading. Also, The parties named in the referenced documents were added to the docket incorrectly and has been corrected by the clerk. For future reference: Party names are to be entered in ALL CAPS and without punctuation unless the punctuation is part of the name. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/13 2:11 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by Justin Lee Elliott. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/13 1:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/13 1:23 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7636312.), filed by Justin Lee Elliott. (AZIZ, MUHAMMAD)
Related: [-]