Washington Western District Court
Judge:Richard A Jones
Case #: 2:23-cv-00072
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2023
Terminated:Nov 16, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jul 13, 2023 2:54 AM PDT
Defendant
21Air LLC
Defendant
Anthony Tirri
Plaintiff
Karl E Seuring
721 4TH AVE PO BOX 2221
KIRKLAND, WA 98083


Docket last updated: 12/08/2023 11:59 PM PST
Thursday, November 16, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 11/16 2:20 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. There being no response by Plaintiff to the Court's11 Minute Order to Show Cause, and no showing that service has been effectuated on Defendants as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), this matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (cc: Plaintiff via US Mail) (VE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
13 13 service Certificate of Service Fri 11/17 4:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, by Plaintiff Karl E Seuring. (SS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 10/24 9:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. To date, Plaintiff has not provided proof that proper service of the Complaint has been made on Defendants as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Plaintiff is ordered to show cause by 11/13/2023 why this matter should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Absent a timely response to this order, the Court will dismiss this matter without prejudice. (cc: Plaintiff via US Mail) (VE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
10 10 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 06/16 8:47 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET; filed by Plaintiff Karl E Seuring. (SS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
9 9 cmp Complaint Wed 04/12 2:42 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) 21Air LLC, Anthony Tirri with JURY DEMAND Related [+] filed by Karl E Seuring.(CDA)
Related: [-] ceipt # Fee Paid # 200001748
8 8 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Fri 04/07 8:49 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on 21 AIR, LLC on 3/9/2023, filed by Plaintiff Karl E Seuring. (SS)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Thu 04/06 3:04 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Civil Cover Sheet Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. cc: Plaintiff via USPS. (CR)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 04/06 3:03 PM
FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 402.00, receipt number 200001748 (CR)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
6 6 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Fri 01/20 8:12 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re Karl E Seuring ***Action Required*** Filing Fee Not Paid, Civil Cover Sheet Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 2/21/2023 to correct IFP application cc: IFP and Civil Cover Sheet mailed to Plaintiff. (CR)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/20 9:33 AM
***Deadlines/Hearings set per Dkt2 are terminated per Dkt6 Corrected Filing Deficiency. (CDA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
4 4 misc RAJ Standing Order Tue 01/17 9:37 AM
STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail) (VE)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
3 3 misc Letter Fri 01/13 3:13 PM
LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. filed by Karl E Seuring Mailed to filer via USPS 1/13/23 (CR) Modified on 1/13/2023 (CR)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Fri 01/13 3:12 PM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Filing Fee, Civil Cover Sheet Omitted. See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filing fee due by 1/20/2023 Mailed to filer via USPS 1/13/23 (CR) Modified on 1/13/2023 (CR)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/13 3:02 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) 21Air LLC, Anthony Tirri with JURY DEMAND, filed by Karl E Seuring.(CR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EEOC Determination and Notice of Rights
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 01/13 3:08 PM
Judge Richard A. Jones added. (CR)
Related: [-]