Carter v. Minors et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Referred: | Christy D Comstock |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-04001 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 05, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal Order - Memo
Wed 04/05 2:36 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on April 5, 2023.(mll) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
utility
Memo of Reassignment
Mon 03/20 8:50 AM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Honorable Barry A Bryant no longer assigned to the case. (src) |
||
Monday, February 06, 2023 | ||
order
Order to Show Cause - Failure to Obey Order-TEXT ONLY
Mon 02/06 2:57 PM
TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order on January 13, 2023 directing Plaintiff to Amend Complaint by February 3, 2023. This Order was not returned as undeliverable. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 2/27/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on February 6, 2023. (awl) |
||
Friday, January 13, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Fri 01/13 5:15 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Clerk's Order PLRA Initial Fee
Fri 01/13 5:12 PM
CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Warden, Southwest Arkansas Community Correction Center to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $13.87; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (lgd) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) Order Directing Pleading to be Filed
Fri 01/13 5:05 PM
ORDER Granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350 from the Plaintiff. Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed.( Amended Complaint due by 2/3/2023) Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on January 13, 2023. (lgd) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)
Fri 01/13 4:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Dillon Carl Carter. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(lgd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Referred (42:1983)
Fri 01/13 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Doe Nurses, Tina Maxwell, John Minors, Shaunda Scoggins, Vickey Walker, filed by Dillon Carl Carter.(lgd) |