Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:23-mj-00116
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 14, 2023 1:36 AM CST
Defendant
Luis Antonio Mijares-Hernandez (1)
Represented By
Tara D. Zehner
Zehner Law, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Michael Rojas-Garcia (2)
Represented By
Jad P. Harper
Law Office Of Jad P. Harper, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 01/14/2023 2:08 AM CST
Sunday, January 08, 2023
Arrest of Luis Antonio Mijares-Hernandez, Michael Rojas-Garcia (drda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
Warrant Returned Executed as to Luis Antonio Mijares-Hernandez. (drda)
Related: [-]
Warrant Returned Executed as to Michael Rojas-Garcia. (drda)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Luis Antonio Mijares-Hernandez, Michael Rojas-Garcia. (ccl)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Luis Antonio Mijares-Hernandez (1), Michael Rojas-Garcia (2); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. as to Luis Antonio Mijares-Hernandez (1), Michael Rojas-Garcia (2) by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ccl)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Michael Rojas-Garcia (2). (ccl)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Luis Antonio Mijares-Hernandez. (drda)
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Michael Rojas-Garcia. (drda)
Related: [-]
4 4 Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Initial Appearance as to Luis Antonio Mijares-Hernandez held on 1/12/2023 ( Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 1/18/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia,), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Luis Antonio Mijares-Hernandez (Court Reporter FTR Gold C. Levrie.) (ccl)
Related: [-]
5 5 Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Initial Appearance as to Michael Rojas-Garcia held on 1/12/2023 ( Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 1/18/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia,), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Michael Rojas-Garcia (Court Reporter FTR Gold C. Levrie.) (ccl)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Luis Antonio Mijares-Hernandez Tara D. Zehner for Luis Antonio Mijares-Hernandez appointed.. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (mgc)
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Michael Rojas-Garcia Jad P. Harper for Michael Rojas-Garcia appointed.. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (mgc)
Related: [-]