California Northern District Court
Judge:William H Orrick
Referred: Lisa J Cisneros
Case #: 3:23-cv-00201
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause17:504 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2023
Last checked: Friday Nov 22, 2024 7:33 PM PST
Defendant
DeviantArt, Inc.
Represented By
Michael H. Rubin
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Brittany Nichole Lovejoy
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Andrew Michael Gass
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Midjourney, Inc.
Represented By
Angela Lucille Dunning
Cooley LLP
contact info
James Asheton Lemay
Cooley LLP
contact info
Angela Dunning
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Vishakha Joshi
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Kayla Elizabeth Blaker
Cooley Llp - Library
contact info
Arminda B Bepko
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Sam Blankenship
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Amira Perryman
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Judd D. Lauter
Cooley LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stability AI Ltd.
Represented By
Tiffany Cheung
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Joseph Charles Gratz
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Eoin Paul Connolly
Box, Inc.
contact info
Timothy Chen Saulsbury
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Aditya Vijay Kamdar
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Allyson Roz Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Mark Alan Lemley
Lex Lumina PLLC
contact info
Laura Gilbert Remus
Morrison & Forester LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stability AI, Inc.
Represented By
Tiffany Cheung
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Joseph Charles Gratz
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Eoin Paul Connolly
Box, Inc.
contact info
Timothy Chen Saulsbury
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Aditya Vijay Kamdar
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Allyson Roz Bennett
Morrison & Foerster LLP
contact info
Mark Alan Lemley
Lex Lumina PLLC
contact info
Laura Gilbert Remus
Morrison & Forester LLP
contact info
Defendant
Runway AI, Inc.
Represented By
David Jason Silbert
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Bailey Wilson Heaps
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Luke P. Apfeld
Keker, Van Nest And Peters LLP
contact info
Julia Leigh Greenberg
Keker, Van Nest And Peters LLP
contact info
Celina Malave
Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Paven Malhotra
Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerald Brom
Represented By
Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Sidran Law Corp
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Holden J. Benon
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Christopher K.L. Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Evan Creutz
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
David William Lerch
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jingna Zhang
Represented By
Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Sidran Law Corp
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Holden J. Benon
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Christopher K.L. Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Evan Creutz
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
David William Lerch
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Grzegorz Rutkowski
Represented By
Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Sidran Law Corp
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Holden J. Benon
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Christopher K.L. Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Evan Creutz
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
David William Lerch
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gregory Manchess
Represented By
Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Sidran Law Corp
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Holden J. Benon
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Christopher K.L. Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Evan Creutz
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
David William Lerch
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Julia Kaye
Represented By
Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Sidran Law Corp
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Holden J. Benon
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Christopher K.L. Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Evan Creutz
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
David William Lerch
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Adam Ellis
Represented By
Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Sidran Law Corp
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Holden J. Benon
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Christopher K.L. Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Evan Creutz
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
David William Lerch
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Andersen
Represented By
Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Sidran Law Corp
contact info
Eura Chang
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Laura Matson
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Holden J. Benon
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Christopher K.L. Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Matthew Butterick
Matthew Butterick, Attorney At Law
contact info
Brian D Clark
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Evan Creutz
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
David William Lerch
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Travis Luke Manfredi
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Cadio R. Zirpoli
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Arielle S. Wagner
Lockridge Grindal Nauen, Pllp
contact info
Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Karla Ortiz
Represented By
Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Sidran Law Corp
contact info
Arielle S. Wagner
Lockridge Grindal Nauen, Pllp
contact info
Eura Chang
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Laura Matson
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Holden J. Benon
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Christopher K.L. Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Matthew Butterick
Matthew Butterick, Attorney At Law
contact info
Brian D Clark
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Evan Creutz
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
David William Lerch
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Getty Images (US), Inc.
Terminated: 11/29/2023
Represented By
Benjamin E. Marks
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
H Southworth
Terminated: 11/21/2024
Represented By
Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Sidran Law Corp
contact info
Joseph R. Saveri
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Holden J. Benon
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Christopher K.L. Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Evan Creutz
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
David William Lerch
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly McKernan
Terminated: 11/21/2024
Represented By
Kathleen Jordan McMahon
Sidran Law Corp
contact info
Arielle S. Wagner
Lockridge Grindal Nauen, Pllp
contact info
Eura Chang
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Laura Matson
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Christopher Kar-Lun Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Holden J. Benon
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.
contact info
Christopher K.L. Young
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Matthew Butterick
Matthew Butterick, Attorney At Law
contact info
Brian D Clark
Lockridge Grindal Nauen P.L.L.P.
contact info
Evan Creutz
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info
David William Lerch
Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 30 2023
ORDER ON 49,51,52,58 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND STRIKE by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2023)
GPO Feb 08 2024
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AND REQUESTS FOR FEES by Judge William H. Orrick re: 50 Motion to Strike and 136 MOTION to Strike. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2024)
GPO Aug 12 2024
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William H. Orrick re: 160,162,163,164,169 Motions to Dismiss. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2024)
GPO Dec 10 2024
NOTICE OF REFERRAL FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros on 12/10/2024. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2024)
GPO Mar 19 2025
ORDER on ESI Protocol; Protective Order; Deposition Protocol, ECF Nos. 248, 249, 257. Signed by Judge Lisa J. Cisneros on 3/19/2025. (Cisneros, Lisa) (Filed on 3/19/2025)
GPO Apr 15 2025
Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 270 Stipulation for Enlargement of Time for Production of Training Data. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2025)
GPO Apr 15 2025
Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 271 Stipulation Entering Deposition Protocol.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2025)
GPO Apr 15 2025
Order by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros granting 272 Stipulation Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information.(bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2025)
GPO Apr 15 2025
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR LITIGATION INVOLVING HIGHLY SENSITIVE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND/OR TRADE SECRETS re Docket No. 264 by Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2025)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
283 283 misc Joint Case Management Statement Tue 04/29 8:50 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sarah Andersen, Gregory Manchess, Adam Ellis, Gerald Brom, Grzegorz Rutkowski, Julia Kaye, Jingna Zhang, Karla Ortiz. (Saveri, Joseph)
Related: [-]
282 282 2 pgs minutes Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/29 3:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa J. Cisneros: Discovery Status Conference held on 4/29/2025 via Zoom. Total Time in Court: 43 minutes. Court Reporter: Recorded via Zoom: 2:11 p.m. - 2:54 p.m.4/29/2025)
Related: [-]
281 281 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 04/29 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Sarah F Mitchell on behalf of DeviantArt, Inc. (Mitchell, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
280 280 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 04/28 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Christopher Adler on behalf of Stability AI Ltd., Stability AI, Inc. (Adler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
279 279 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 04/25 3:27 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Sarah Andersen, Gregory Manchess, Adam Ellis, Gerald Brom, Grzegorz Rutkowski, Julia Kaye, Jingna Zhang, Karla Ortiz (Saveri, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
278 278 misc Status Report Thu 04/24 8:47 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Sarah Andersen, Gregory Manchess, Adam Ellis, Gerald Brom, Grzegorz Rutkowski, Julia Kaye, Jingna Zhang, Karla Ortiz. (Saveri, Joseph) Modified on 4/25/2025 (kmm2, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]