Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 5:22-mj-01295
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2022
Terminated:Jan 12, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 05, 2023 6:58 PM EDT
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Jennifer J. King
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Richard A. Murdock (1)
Terminated: 01/12/2023
Represented By
Mary K. Walsh
Friedman & Nemecek
contact info
Anthony Koukoutas
Law Office Of Anthony Koukoutas
contact info
Eric C. Nemecek
Friedman & Nemecek
contact info
Ian N. Friedman
Friedman & Nemecek
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/28/2024 8:53 PM EST
Friday, December 16, 2022
Case unsealed as to Richard A. Murdock (1). (S,S)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Richard A. Murdock (1) on 12/16/2022. (S,S)
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. Initial Appearance as to Richard A. Murdock (1) held on 12/16/2022. AUSA Jennifer King present for the government. Attorney Anthony Koukoutas present and appointed to represent defendant. Defendant present. As a result of the COVID-19 pandemic, all parties appeared by, and consented to, proceeding via video conference. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court reminds the government of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), to disclose evidence favorable to the defendant and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment. The government is ordered to comply with Brady and its progeny. The failure to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including dismissal of the indictment or information, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, sanctions by the Court, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Defendant consents/authorizes his counsel to sign financial affidavit on his behalf. Defendant advised of charges. Defendant waives preliminary hearing and consents/authorizes his counsel to sign waiver on his behalf. Court accepts waiver. Matter bound over to the Grand Jury for further proceedings. Government moves for detention. Defendant requests detention hearing. Detention Hearing set for 12/22/2022 at 10:00 a.m. via video conference (Akron) before Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. Defendant remanded to temporary custody of U.S. Marshal pending hearing. (Court Reporter/ECRO: D. Beatrice; Pretrial Officer: Alex Torres) (Time: 15 min.) (S,S)
Related: [-]
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Anthony Koukoutas for Richard A. Murdock. Counsel is reminded of their obligation to report significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. CJA Plan, Part IV (D)(2).. Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 12/16/2022. (S,S)
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 12/16/2022 as to Richard A. Murdock (1). (S,S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Affidavit
3 3 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/16/2022 in case as to Richard A. Murdock (1). (S,S)
Related: [-]
4 4 Order regarding use of video conference/teleconferencing as to Richard A. Murdock (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 12/16/2022. (S,S)
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Richard A. Murdock (1). (S,S)
Related: [-]
6 6 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Richard A. Murdock (1). (S,S)
Related: [-]
7 7 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Richard A. Murdock (1). Detention Hearing set for 12/22/2022 at 10:00 a.m. via video conference (Akron). Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp on 12/16/2022. (S,S)
Related: [-]