Tennessee Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:22-mj-00310
Case Filed:Dec 16, 2022
Terminated:Dec 16, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jan 15, 2023 2:24 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Perry H Piper
U S Department Of Justice (chattanooga Usao)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Edmee Chavannes (2)
Terminated: 12/16/2022
Represented By
Brandon D Raulston
Law Office Of Brandon D Raulston
contact info
Defendant
Bevelyn Beatty Williams (1)
Terminated: 12/16/2022
Represented By
A. Christian Lanier, III
A. Christian Lanier Iii
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/22/2025 12:42 AM EST
Friday, December 16, 2022
Arrest of Bevelyn Beatty Williams, Edmee Chavannes in Eastern District of Tennessee. (CNC)
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Bevelyn Beatty Williams, Edmee Chavannes (CNC)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 5(c)(3)Documents Received (Sealed Indictment) as to Bevelyn Beatty Williams, Edmee Chavannes (CNC)
Related: [-]
4 4 DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER as to Bevelyn Beatty Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/16/22. (CNC)
Related: [-]
5 5 DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER as to Edmee Chavannes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/16/22. (CNC)
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing by Bevelyn Beatty Williams (CNC)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing by Edmee Chavannes (CNC)
Related: [-]
8 8 Appearance Bond Entered as to Bevelyn Beatty Williams (CNC)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Bevelyn Beatty Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/16/2022. (CNC)
Related: [-]
10 10 Appearance Bond Entered as to Edmee Chavannes (CNC)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Edmee Chavannes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/16/2022. (CNC)
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee:Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Edmee Chavannes held on 12/16/2022 Appearance entered by Brandon D Raulston for Edmee Chavannes on behalf of defendant., Bond Hearing as to Edmee Chavannes held on 12/16/2022 (CNC)
Related: [-]
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee:Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Bevelyn Beatty Williams held on 12/16/2022 Appearance entered by A. Christian Lanier, III for Bevelyn Beatty Williams on behalf of defendant., Bond Hearing as to Bevelyn Beatty Williams held on 12/16/2022 (CNC)
Related: [-]