New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Paul J Barbadoro
Referred: Andrea K Johnstone
Case #: 1:23-cv-00019
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Case Filed:Jan 15, 2023
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 14, 2023 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Joshua Longacre
240 Mechanic Street Suite 301
Lebanon, NH 03766
Represented By
Ashley Rae Theodore
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Kevin M. Sibbernsen
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Lyme Computer Systems, Inc.
240 Mechanic Street Suite 301
Lebanon, NH 03766
Represented By
Ashley Rae Theodore
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Kevin M. Sibbernsen
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Nagy
240 Mechanic Street Suite 301
Lebanon, NH 03766
Represented By
Ashley Rae Theodore
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Kevin M. Sibbernsen
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Andrew Sullivan
240 Mechanic Street Suite 301
Lebanon, NH 03766
Represented By
Ashley Rae Theodore
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Kevin M. Sibbernsen
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Henry S. Flickinger, Jr.
240 Mechanic Street Suite 301
Lebanon, NH 03766
Represented By
Ashley Rae Theodore
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Kevin M. Sibbernsen
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
William McCarthy
25 Town Line Drive
Cornish, NH 03745
Represented By
Carolyn K. Cole
Cole Associates Civil Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen T. Micare
19 Brook Road
Orford, NH 03777
Represented By
Carolyn K. Cole
Cole Associates Civil Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Neubelt
129 Philbrick Street
Farmington, ME 04938
Represented By
Carolyn K. Cole
Cole Associates Civil Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Colin Nicol
374 Bahia Avenue
Key Largo, FL 33037
Represented By
Carolyn K. Cole
Cole Associates Civil Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Teresa Orechovesky
2012 Element Circle
Garner, NC 27529
Represented By
Carolyn K. Cole
Cole Associates Civil Law PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lyme Computer Systems, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan
Terminated: 04/17/2023
240 Mechanic Street Suite 301
Lebanon, NH 03766


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
25 25 1 pgs order Judgment Tue 07/09 4:20 PM
JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with 24 Stipulation of Dismissal, Endorsed Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (jwb)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/09 2:51 PM
///STIPULATION of Dismissal as to the case by William McCarthy, Stephen T. Micare, Linda Neubelt, Colin Nicol, Teresa Orechovesky(Cole, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 07/08 3:49 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 21 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories. Text of Order: The pending motion to compel is denied as moot in light of settlement. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jwb)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Mediation Report Mon 07/08 1:01 PM
MEDIATION REPORT: The parties successfully resolved the case following mediation sessions held on June 27, 2024, and June 28, 2024. Case Settlement Deadline 7/31/2024. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(bf)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference/Mediation Mon 07/01 9:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. MEDIATION held on 6/27/2024 & 6/28/2024. The parties successfully resolved the case. (Pltfs Atty: Carolyn Cole) (Defts Atty: Kevin Sibbernsen)(Total Hearing Time: 6/27/2024 8 hr; 6/28/2024 7 hr 42 min) (bf)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
22 22 15 pgs respm Objection to Motion Mon 06/24 5:39 PM
OBJECTION to21 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories filed by Lyme Computer Systems, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 7/1/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Theodore, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit Ex. A - Second Supplemental Production to 1st RPD,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit Ex. B - Supplemental Responses to Ist Int and 2nd RPD
Monday, June 10, 2024
21 21 22 pgs motion Compel Mon 06/10 8:46 PM
MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Answers to Interrogatories filed by William McCarthy, Stephen T. Micare, Linda Neubelt, Colin Nicol, Teresa Orechovesky.Follow up on Objection on 6/24/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Cole, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit 1. Email dated Dec. 4, 2023,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. Email dated Dec. 18, 2023,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3. Email dated Feb. 5, 2024,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4. Email dated Feb. 14, 2024,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5. Email dated Feb. 28, 2024,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6. Email dated March 28, 2024,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7. Email dated Apr. 22, 2024,
Att: 8 1 pgs Exhibit 8. Email dated Apr. 24, 2024,
Att: 9 9 pgs Exhibit 9. Def. Answers to 2nd RPD and Interrogatories,
Att: 10 4 pgs Exhibit 10. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Request for Answers to 2nd RPD and Interrogatories,
Att: 11 3 pgs Exhibit (Affidavit) 11. Affidavit of Stephen Micare,
Att: 12 4 pgs Exhibit (Affidavit) 12. Affidavit of Robert Moody
Monday, May 20, 2024
20 20 notice Mediation Notice Tue 05/28 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Mediation. Mediation set for 6/27/2024 09:00 AM and 6/28/2024 09:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(bf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 05/16 12:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. PRE-MEDIATION CONFERENCE held on 5/16/2024. (Pltfs Atty: Carolyn Cole) (Defts Atty: Kevin Sibbernsen)(Total Hearing Time: 13 min) (bf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
notice Hearing Notice Mon 05/13 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Hearing. Pre-mediation Conference set for 5/16/2024 at 11:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(bf)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/13 8:21 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Motion to schedule Mediation with Magistrate Judge Johnstone. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jwb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/08 3:19 PM
Joint Assented to MOTION to schedule Mediation with Magistrate Judge Johnstone filed by Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan.(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
order Order on Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines Thu 02/29 1:10 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 18 Motion to Continue and Extend Deadlines. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jwb)
Related: [-]
notice Trial Notice Thu 02/29 1:13 PM
TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 2/4/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2025 03:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 1/6/2025. JERS Statement due 1/6/2025. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 1/21/2025. (jwb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
18 18 motion Continue and Extend Deadlines Wed 02/28 2:39 PM
Joint Assented to MOTION to Continue and Extend Deadlines established in the Court's July 13, 2023 Scheduling Order filed by Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan.(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment to Exhibit Civil Form 3
Friday, January 26, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/26 11:45 AM
RULE 502(d) ORDER. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jwb)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Protective Order Fri 01/26 11:44 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jwb)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 01/26 11:43 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 Motion for Protective Order. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jwb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
15 15 motion Protective Order Wed 01/24 3:08 PM
Assented to MOTION for Protective Order filed by Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan.(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Ex A Stipulated Draft of Protective Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Ex B Rule 502(d) Order
Friday, August 25, 2023
14 14 misc Status Report Fri 08/25 1:36 PM
STATUS REPORT by Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan : Joint Status Report: At this time, there are no known disagreements regarding the disputed systems that require the Courts involvement.(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
minutes Pretrial Conference Thu 07/13 3:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/13/2023. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Jan-Marie Glaze) (Pltfs Atty: Carolyn Cole) (Defts Atty: Kevin Sibbernsen)(Total Hearing Time: 40 minutes) (jwb)
Related: [-]
order Order on Discovery Plan Thu 07/13 3:20 PM
ENDORSED ORDER approving in part 13 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 4-7 days. Case Track: Standard. Text of Order: The proposed discovery plan, doc. no. 13, is approved with the following modifications: The parties disagree as to which systems should be prioritized for discovery. Counsel shall meet, confer, and agree on a list of deponents with knowledge of the disputed systems within 14 days. The parties shall then have 30 days to complete any depositions of the deponents and file a joint status report describing any remaining disagreements regarding the disputed systems. The defendants shall preserve all historic information in the disputed systems until further order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jwb)
Related: [-]
notice Trial Notice Thu 07/13 3:26 PM
TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 10/1/2024 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE for 9/16/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 9/3/2024. JERS Statement due 9/3/2024. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 9/17/2024.(jwb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
minutes Pretrial Conference Wed 07/12 4:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/12/2023. Hearing continued to 10:00 AM on 7/13/2023. (Court Reporter: Susan Bateman) (Pltfs Atty: Carolyn Cole) (Defts Atty: Kevin Sibbernsen)(Total Hearing Time: 30 minutes) (jwb)
Related: [-]
notice Pretrial Conference Wed 07/12 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE for 7/13/2023 10:00 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (jwb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
13 13 motion Discovery Plan Wed 07/05 8:02 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan. (Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
notice Pretrial Conference Mon 06/05 12:03 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE for 7/12/2023 04:00 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/5/2023. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(js)
Related: [-]
notice Pretrial Conference Mon 06/05 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE for 7/12/2023 04:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Follow up on Discovery Plan 7/5/2023. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/31 3:15 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 Joint Assented to Motion To Waive Compliance With Local Rule 9.4. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(lw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/26 4:05 PM
Joint Assented to MOTION To Waive Compliance With Local Rule 9.4 filed by Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan.(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
order Endorsed Order - not on motion Wed 05/24 2:19 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: The defendants shall comply with local rule 9.4 within 14 days. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/12 12:19 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint - New Case,, filed by Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan.(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer Wed 05/03 12:28 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 9 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to May 12, 2023. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 23, 2023
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement Sun 04/23 8:34 AM
Disclosure Statement by Lyme Computer Systems, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
9 9 motion Extend Time to Answer Tue 04/18 9:06 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to May 12, 2023 filed by Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan.Follow up on Objection on 5/2/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
notice Clerk's Notice - Filing Due Tue 04/18 9:48 AM
Clerk's Notice - No Disclosure Statement Filed by Lyme Computer Systems, Inc. The party is directed to file a disclosure statement within 7 days of this notice. (js)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 04/17 12:36 PM
///ENDORSED ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss Defendant ESOP without Prejudice. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
8 8 motion Dismiss Fri 04/14 5:13 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant ESOP without Prejudice filed by Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan.Follow up on Objection on 4/28/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance Mon 04/03 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Rae Theodore on behalf of Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan Attorney Ashley Rae Theodore added to party Henry S. Flickinger, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Rae Theodore added to party Joshua Longacre(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Rae Theodore added to party Lyme Computer Systems, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Rae Theodore added to party Michael Nagy(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Rae Theodore added to party Andrew Sullivan(pty:dft).(Theodore, Ashley) Modified on 4/3/2023 to remove "Attorney Ashley Rae Theodore added to party Lyme Computer Systems, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan(pty:dft)"(js)
Related: [-]
notice ECF - Filing Error - Info Only Mon 04/03 2:40 PM
NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re:7 Notice of Attorney Appearance, filed by Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Andrew Sullivan, Henry S. Flickinger, Jr., Lyme Computer Systems, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, Michael Nagy. Incorrect filer chosen. Attorney Ashley Theodore does not represent Lyme Computer Systems, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan and shall be removed from such party. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. (js)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
6 6 motion Extend Time to Answer Fri 03/31 10:25 AM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 21, 2023 on behalf of all Defendants filed by Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan.(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Attorney Appearance Fri 03/31 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin M. Sibbernsen on behalf of Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan Attorney Kevin M. Sibbernsen added to party Henry S. Flickinger, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M. Sibbernsen added to party Joshua Longacre(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M. Sibbernsen added to party Lyme Computer Systems, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M. Sibbernsen added to party Michael Nagy(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M. Sibbernsen added to party Andrew Sullivan(pty:dft).(Sibbernsen, Kevin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer Fri 03/31 2:14 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 21, 2023 on behalf of all Defendants. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 01/30 2:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/30/2023. Answer Follow Up on 4/3/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Cole, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
3 3 service Summons - Waiver Issued Wed 01/18 3:11 PM
Summonses issued electronically as to Henry S. Flickinger, Jr, Joshua Longacre, Lyme Computer Systems, Inc., Lyme Computer Systems, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan, Michael Nagy, Andrew Sullivan. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice ECF,
Att: 2 ERISA Notice
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
2 2 notice ERISA Notice Tue 01/17 1:17 PM
ERISA Notice sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties.(ed)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - ECF Tue 01/17 1:17 PM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (ed)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 15, 2023
1 1 36 pgs cmp Complaint - New Case Sun 01/15 7:41 PM
NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2333580 filed by Linda Neubelt, Colin Nicol, Teresa Orechovesky.(Cole, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons - Waiver Summons
utility Case Assigned Tue 01/17 1:16 PM
Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:23-cv-19-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
Related: [-]