Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-22744

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:23-ap-01008
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2023
Terminated:Jan 31, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dimension Capital Management
Represented By
Dimension Capital Management
contact info
Plaintiff
Soneet Kapila
Venable LLP 100 SE 2nd St 44th Floor
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Heather L Harmon, Esq
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
5 5 court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/31 10:12 AM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-1008 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Fri 01/20 1:59 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila. (Harmon, Heather)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Tue 01/17 9:40 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Tue 01/17 9:39 AM
Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Dimension Capital Management Answer Due 2/16/2023 Related [+] Scheduling Conference to be held on 03/06/2023 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Oriol-Bennett, Alexandra)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-01008 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Dimension Capital Management. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) filed by Plaintiff Soneet Kapila
Monday, January 16, 2023
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 01/16 11:39 PM
Adversary case 23-01008 Complaint by Soneet Kapila against Dimension Capital Management. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Harmon, Heather)
Related: [-]