Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Lacey A Collier
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-00739
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2023
Terminated:Aug 30, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
49 49 appeal USCA Mandate Wed 04/02 10:14 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to32 Notice of Appeal. DISMISSED. (USCA case 23-13222 ) (alb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 05/30 10:31 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:20 Order on Motion to Extend Time. (No response filed.) (alb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 05/08 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by CHARLES LITTON MORRIS, Lake Butler Reception and Medical Center, PO Box 628, Lake Butler, FL. 32054. (alb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Fri 04/21 3:14 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time, ECF Doc. 19 , is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff shall have until May 26, 2023, to file a response to the Defendant's motion to dismiss. As a matter of courtesy, the clerk shall also send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at Lake Butler Medical & Reception Center. The clerk, however, shall not update the docket to reflect a change in address until the Court receives a notice of change of address from the Plaintiff confirming he has been transferred. (Courtesy copy mailed to LAKE BUTLER MEDICAL & RECEPTION CENTER). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 4/21/2023. (mb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/21 3:16 PM
Set Deadlines re20 ORDER. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to Motion not filed earlier: 5/26/2023) . (mb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
19 19 motion Extend Time Thu 04/20 2:10 PM
Request for Extension of Time and Notice of Change of Address, Holmes Correctional Institution, 3142 Thomas Dr., Bonifay, FL., 32425, by CHARLES LITTON MORRIS. (alb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Thu 04/20 2:16 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:19 MOTION to Extend Time. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Tue 03/28 1:57 PM
ORDER. Defendant's motion for extension of time, ECF Doc. 17 , is GRANTED. The motion to dismiss at ECF Doc. 17 -1 is accepted as timely and the clerk shall separately docket the motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to file a response to the motion to dismiss if he opposes the motion. The clerk shall send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at Holmes Correctional Institution and NWFRC Annex but shall not update Plaintiffs address on the docket until receiving a notice of change of address from Plaintiff. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 03/27/2023. (alb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 03/27 9:44 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:17 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
17 17 motion Extend Time Fri 03/24 4:56 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ESCAMBIA COUNTY. (CARSON, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Exhibits
16 16 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 03/24 12:24 PM
Notice of Repeated Changes of Address, by CHARLES LITTON MORRIS. (alb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 03/24 12:26 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:16 Notice of Repeated Changes of Address. (alb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
15 15 misc Mail Returned Thu 03/23 12:33 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable/Return to Sender-Attempted- Not known. Mail sent to CHARLES LITTON MORRIS Re:8 ORDER. (Mail forwarded to address listed on Notice of Change of Address: NWFRC-Annex, 4455 Sam Mitchell Dr., Chipley, FL. 32428., doc13 . Clerk also forwarded the Order at docket entry9 .) (alb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/02 12:21 PM
ORDER, re 13 Notice of Change of Address. Plaintiff's notice of change of address is accepted. The clerk is directed to update Plaintiff's address to NWFRC-Annex, 4455 Sam Mitchel Dr., Chipley, FL 32428. Plaintiff's request for summary judgment shall be STRICKEN. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 03/02/2023. (alb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 03/01 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address. Case and Plaintiff's Serious Medical Needs Update, by CHARLES LITTON MORRIS. Charles L. Morris 223820, NWFRC-Annex, 4455 Sam Mitchell Dr., Chipley, FL. 32428. (alb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 03/01 4:18 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:13 Notice of Change of Address, Case and Plaintiff's Serious Medical Needs Update, by CHARLES LITTON MORRIS. (alb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
12 12 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 02/27 11:54 AM
Process Receipt and Return. re11 Summons Returned Executed as to Escambia County. (alb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/27 11:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed ESCAMBIA COUNTY served on 2/24/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (alb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
service Summons Issued Wed 02/22 8:32 AM
Summons Issued as to ESCAMBIA COUNTY. (alb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
9 9 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/22 8:03 AM
ORDER re 1 Complaint. The clerk shall correct the docket entry for ECF Doc. 7 , entered on February 13, 2023, to reflect that the document received was a service copy of the original complaint, and was not a First Amended Complaint. The clerk shall issue a summons for Escambia County indicating the County has twenty-one (21) days from the date of service to respond to the complaint. The clerk shall send the summons, the service copy of the complaint, ECF Doc. 1 , and a copy of this Order to the USMS. The clerk shall refer this case to the undersigned if service on Escambia County is returned unexecuted, or if the USMS has filed a statement of costs incurred for making personal service. (Deadline for status of service - 4/10/2023 .) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 02/21/2023. (alb) Modified on 2/22/2023 documents placed in the USMS box (alb). Modified on 2/24/2023 to correct file date (alb)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 02/21 4:17 PM
ORDER denying 6 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 02/21/2023. (alb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Wed 02/15 9:32 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:6 MOTION to Amend/Correct,7 Amended Complaint. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/15 9:30 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ESCAMBIA COUNTY, filed by CHARLES LITTON MORRIS. (alb) Modified on 2/15/2023 No service copy (alb)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Amend/Correct - for Requesting Leave of Court to Amend Wed 02/15 9:24 AM
Motion to Amend § VII, Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies of Plaintiff's § 1983 Civil Complaint per Court Order Doc5 , § IV, pages 5-7, by CHARLES LITTON MORRIS. (alb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
5 5 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/20 3:48 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion to Rescind Procedural Bar of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), ECF Doc. 2 , is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF Doc. 3 , is GRANTED to the extent this case may proceed without prepayment of the entire filing fee. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this action, Plaintiff shall have twenty-one days from the date of this Order to submit one service copy of the complaint, ECF Doc. 1 . The clerk shall update the electronic docket to reflect that Escambia County is the sole defendant and terminate the Board as a defendant. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to: The Escambia County Jail, Finance Department, 6400 North W Street, Pensacola, Florida 32505, Attention Administrator of Inmate Accounts. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 01/20/2023. ( Service copy due 2/10/2023 .) (Order and letter mailed.) (alb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
4 4 notice Notice to Pro Se Tue 01/17 4:29 PM
Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/17 4:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by CHARLES LITTON MORRIS. (alb)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/17 4:25 PM
MOTION to Rescind Procedural Bar of 28 U.S.C. § 1915, by CHARLES LITTON MORRIS. (alb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/17 4:23 PM
COMPLAINT against ESCAMBIA COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS, filed by CHARLES LITTON MORRIS. (No service copies.) (alb)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Tue 01/17 4:30 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re:3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,2 MOTION to Rescind Procedural Bar of 28 U.S.C. 1915,1 Complaint. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (alb)
Related: [-]