Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Sara Lioi
Case #: 5:23-cv-00086
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2023
Terminated:Oct 13, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2023 6:45 AM EDT
Defendant
FirstEnergy Corporation
Represented By
Samuel H. Ottinger
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart - Cleveland
contact info
Sean Alan McKinley
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart - Cleveland
contact info
Rebecca J. Bennett
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Defendant
Innosource, Inc.
1144 East Market Street
Akron, OH 44316
Represented By
James M. Patrick
Fisher & Phillips - Cleveland
contact info
Richard A. Millisor
Fisher & Phillips - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Heidi Ramsey
Represented By
Edward S. Jerse
Merriman Legando Williams & Klang
contact info
Loren B. Donnell
Shavitz Law - Boca Raton
contact info
Drew T. Legando
Merriman Legando Williams & Klang
contact info
Michael J. Palitz
Shavitz Law Group - New York
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, October 13, 2023
31 31 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 10/13 4:43 PM
Judgment Entry . For reasons set forth in the contemporaneously filed memorandum opinion and order, the claims in plaintiffs' complaint are dismissed with prejudice, and this case is closed. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/13/2023. (V,A)
Related: [-]
30 30 15 pgs order Order on Motion for attorney fees Fri 10/13 4:41 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order . The Court approves in part the parties' joint oral motion for approval of settlement (including, in part, the attorney's fees and costs requested) (Doc. No. 48 ) and denies plaintiff's written motion for attorney's fees (Doc. No.27 ) as moot. The settlement agreement is modified to pay $500 to each plaintiff (as proposed by the parties) and $15,721.17 in attorney's fees and costs (as found reasonable by the Court) for a total of $16,721.17. The claims in plaintiffs' complaint are dismissed with prejudice, and this case is closed. The Court retains jurisdiction over this action to enforce the terms of the settlement. Judge Sara Lioi on 10/13/2023. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
29 29 oth_doc SEALED DOCUMENT Thu 09/14 2:06 PM
SEALED Document: Lodging of Lodestar Details filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)28 ,27 .(Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, Legando Lodestar Detail,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, Shavitz Lodestar Detail
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
28 28 order Minute Order _ Settlement Conference Wed 09/13 4:43 PM
Minute Order . On September 12, 2023, the Court conducted a settlement hearing over Zoom. Counsel discussed the dispute between the parties, the proposed settlement terms, and the negotiations that produced those terms. Counsel orally moved for the Court to approve the settlement reached by the parties, which the Court took under advisement. (Court Reporter: Donnalee Cotone.) (Time: 20 minutes.). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/13/2023. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Attorney Fees Wed 09/13 12:59 PM
Unopposed Motion for attorney fees - Declaration of Counsel re: Lodestar & Expenses by Drew T. Legando filed by Plaintiff Heidi Ramsey. (Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for attorney fees Wed 09/13 6:49 PM
Order [non-document]. In light of the motion of plaintiffs' counsel for attorney fees (Doc. No.27 ), the Court orders counsel to file supporting documentation for his fees and the fees of co-counsel, the Shavitz Law Group, by September 15, 2023. Per the Courts previous minutes order, counsel may file this documentation under seal. (Doc. No.28 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/13/2023. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Wed 08/09 10:53 AM
Order [non-document]: The parties filed a joint motion to extend the date to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting until September 7, 2023. (Doc. No.26 .) The parties' motion is granted and the telephonic case management conference is rescheduled for 9/12/2023 at 11:00 a.m. Further extension requests will be disfavored by the Court. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/9/2023.(V,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
26 26 motion Extension (of deadlines) Tue 08/08 2:26 PM
Joint Motion for extension of to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting until September 7, 2023 filed by Defendant FirstEnergy Corporation. (Bennett, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
25 25 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/04 2:07 PM
Order : In light of Clark v. A&L Homecare & Training Center, LLC , 68 F.4th 1003 (6th Cir. 2023), the parties are instructed to complete the updated report of parties' planning meeting form. Additionally, the parties are directed to familiarize themselves with the Court's FLSA standing order (Doc. No.24 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 8/4/2023. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
24 24 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/04 1:47 PM
Order Governing Cases Under Fair Labor Standards Act, 29 U.S.C. 201-219. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/4/2023. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
order Order Tue 08/01 12:10 PM
Order [non-document]. The telephonic case management conference is rescheduled for 8/17/2023 at 11:00 a.m. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/1/2023. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
minutes ~Util - Set Hearings Order Tue 07/11 8:50 AM
Order [non-document]. The telephonic case management conference is rescheduled for 8/9/2023 at 1:00 p.m. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/11/2023. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
order Order Fri 07/07 11:31 AM
Order [non-document]. The telephonic case management conference is rescheduled for August 9 at 10:30 a.m. In light of the recent Sixth Circuit decision in Clark v. A&L Homecare & Training Ctr., LLC, 68 F.4th 1003 (6th Cir. 2023), the Court will be modifying the Report of Parties' Planning Meeting template previously used by the parties in this case. Counsel will be provided the new report template prior to the rescheduled case management conference and counsel should submit their new report no later than August 8 at 1:00 p.m. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/7/2023. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Thu 07/06 10:57 AM
Order [non-document] granting19 and20 motions for appearance pro hac vice by attorneys Loren B. Donnell and Michael J. Palitz for Heidi Ramsey. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/6/2023. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
23 23 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Wed 07/05 4:28 PM
Supplement to Motion for attorney Loren B. Donnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12039381, - Inked Version of Donnell Declaration, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)19 . (Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
22 22 oth_doc Supplement (atty event) Wed 07/05 4:23 PM
Supplement to Motion for attorney Michael J. Palitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12039388, - Inked Version of Palitz Declaration, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s)20 . (Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 07/05 1:47 PM
Answer to10 Amended complaint filed by Innosource, Inc.. (Millisor, Richard)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 07/05 3:53 PM
Order [non-document] re19 and20 motions for attorneys Loren B. Donnell and Michael J. Palitz to appear pro hac vice. Counsel are directed to show cause as to why the two motions should not be denied for failure to comply with the Clerk's requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/5/2023. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/13 10:26 AM
Motion for attorney Michael J. Palitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12039388, filed by Plaintiff Heidi Ramsey.(Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/13 10:23 AM
Motion for attorney Loren B. Donnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12039381, filed by Plaintiff Heidi Ramsey.(Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Tue 06/06 10:06 AM
Order [non-document] granting defendant's17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's First Amended Collective Action Complaint. Defendant Innosource, Inc.'s answer is now due 7/5/2023. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/6/2023.(V,A)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 06/06 10:09 AM
Order [non-document]: The telephonic case management conference is rescheduled for 7/14/2023 at 11:30 a.m. Judge Sara Lioi on 6/6/2023. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
18 18 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 06/05 5:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Innosource, Inc.. (Millisor, Richard)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension (answer complaint) Mon 06/05 5:04 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 10, 2023 to answer Plaintiff's First Amended Collective Action Complaint filed by Defendant Innosource, Inc.. Related document(s)10 . (Millisor, Richard)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 06/05 5:01 PM
Attorney Appearance by James M. Patrick filed by on behalf of Innosource, Inc.. (Patrick, James)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 06/05 4:58 PM
Attorney Appearance by Richard A. Millisor filed by on behalf of Innosource, Inc.. (Millisor, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 06/02 2:01 PM
Answer to10 Amended complaint filed by FirstEnergy Corporation. (Bennett, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Tue 05/23 8:21 AM
Order [non-document] granting defendant's13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant FirstEnergy Corporation shall have up to and including June 2, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Judge Sara Lioi on 5/23/2023. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
13 13 motion Extension (answer complaint) Fri 05/19 3:30 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until June 2, 2023 to answer move or plead to the First Amended Collective Action Complaint filed by Defendant FirstEnergy Corporation. Related document(s)10 . (Bennett, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 05/15 3:56 PM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Innosource, Inc. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
11 11 oth_doc Praecipe Mon 05/15 12:56 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by All Plaintiffs.(Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Request for Summons
Friday, May 05, 2023
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/05 1:48 PM
Amended collective action complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Innosource Inc. Filed by Heidi Ramsey. (Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
order Order Mon 04/24 8:21 AM
Order [non-document]: In light of the parties' representation in the joint report9 that an amended complaint adding a second defendant will be filed by May 5, 2023, the telephonic case management conference scheduled for April 25, 2023 is continued until June 16, 2023, at 11:30 a.m. Judge Sara Lioi on 4/24/2023. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
9 9 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Fri 04/21 9:53 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Heidi Ramsey. (Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
8 8 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Fri 03/10 10:34 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order : Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 4/25/2023 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. Directions for joining the call will be emailed to counsel of record no later than the day before the CMC. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 4/4/2023. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 4/11/2023. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/10/2023. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Thursday, March 09, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/09 4:38 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, filed by FirstEnergy Corporation. (Bennett, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Wed 02/08 9:26 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. FirstEnergy Corporation's answer is now due by 3/9/2023. Judge Sara Lioi on 2/8/2023.(V,A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
6 6 motion Extension (answer complaint) Tue 02/07 3:49 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until March 9, 2023 to answer move or plead to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant FirstEnergy Corporation. Related document(s)1 . (Bennett, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Tue 01/31 10:43 AM
Return of Service by certified mail executed upon FirstEnergy Corporation on 1/23/2023, filed on behalf of Heidi Ramsey Related document(s)3 . (Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
4 4 notice Notice (atty event) Tue 01/17 10:31 PM
Notice of Filing Consent to Join filed by Heidi Ramsey.(Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Consent to Join
3 3 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 01/17 2:55 PM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon FirstEnergy Corporation. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
2 2 order Initial Order - Judge Lioi Tue 01/17 2:45 PM
Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/17/2023. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Witness List,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Exhibit List
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/17 2:18 PM
Collective Action Complaint with jury demand against FirstEnergy Corporation. Filing fee paid $ 402.00. Receipt number AOHNDC-11793673. Filed by Heidi Ramsey. (Legando, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, Consent to Join,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 01/17 2:42 PM
Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 01/17 2:44 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (B,DL)
Related: [-]