Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Brian J Davis
Referred: Patricia D Barksdale
Case #: 3:23-cv-00059
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2023 6:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Artful Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Kearney Bean
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Jacqueline Alyse Van Laningham
Abl Law P.A.
contact info
Jared Joseph Burns
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Lucinda Chapin
Represented By
Daniel Kearney Bean
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Jacqueline Alyse Van Laningham
Abl Law P.A.
contact info
Jared Joseph Burns
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Jacksonville Academy Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Kearney Bean
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Jacqueline Alyse Van Laningham
Abl Law P.A.
contact info
Jared Joseph Burns
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
RDL Properties of North Florida, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Kearney Bean
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Jacqueline Alyse Van Laningham
Abl Law P.A.
contact info
Jared Joseph Burns
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Spyglass Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Kearney Bean
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Jacqueline Alyse Van Laningham
Abl Law P.A.
contact info
Jared Joseph Burns
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
The Academy at Julington Creek, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Kearney Bean
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Jacqueline Alyse Van Laningham
Abl Law P.A.
contact info
Jared Joseph Burns
Abl Law, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
IC US Properties 1, LLC
Represented By
Todd A. Wind
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Vickroy Purdy
Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, PA
contact info
Nathan D. Converse
Fredrikson & Byron
contact info
Derek Kyle Mountford
Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Pa+hfinder, LLC
Represented By
Todd A. Wind
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Vickroy Purdy
Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, PA
contact info
Nathan D. Converse
Fredrikson & Byron
contact info
Derek Kyle Mountford
Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, January 30, 2025
49 49 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 01/30 12:54 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: 48 Joint Motion for Bench Trial and to Modify Scheduling Order and to Continue Trial Date is GRANTED. The remaining trial deadlines are vacated and the Court will reset this matter for a bench trial. Signed by Senior Judge Brian J. Davis on 1/30/2025. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
48 48 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/29 10:45 AM
Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically For Bench Trial and to Modify Scheduling Order and to Continue Trial Date by Spyglass Property Holdings, LLC, The Academy at Julington Creek, LLC, RDL Properties of North Florida, LLC, Lucinda Chapin, Artful Enterprises, LLC, Jacksonville Academy Holdings, LLC, IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC. (Bean, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
47 47 6 pgs respm Memorandum in support Wed 12/11 2:12 PM
MEMORANDUM in support re42 Reply to Response to Motion Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Artful Enterprises, LLC, Lucinda Chapin, Jacksonville Academy Holdings, LLC, RDL Properties of North Florida, LLC, Spyglass Property Holdings, LLC, The Academy at Julington Creek, LLC. (Bean, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
46 46 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 11/22 3:34 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: 43 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is GRANTED. On or before December 11, 2024, Defendants shall file their reply of no more than five (5) substantive pages. Signed by Senior Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/22/2024. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
45 45 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/13 4:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re43 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC. (Mountford, Derek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
44 44 adr Mediation report Wed 11/06 12:18 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 09/12/2024. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Adams, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
43 43 motion Leave to File Document Tue 11/05 3:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Bean, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
42 42 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/01 9:40 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC.(Mountford, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Supp. Declaration of T. Collins
41 41 8 pgs respm Memorandum in support Fri 11/01 5:22 PM
MEMORANDUM in support re33 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim filed by Artful Enterprises, LLC, Lucinda Chapin, Jacksonville Academy Holdings, LLC, RDL Properties of North Florida, LLC, Spyglass Property Holdings, LLC, The Academy at Julington Creek, LLC. (Bean, Daniel)
Related: [-]
40 40 8 pgs respm Memorandum in support Fri 11/01 5:20 PM
MEMORANDUM in support re34 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Artful Enterprises, LLC, Lucinda Chapin, Jacksonville Academy Holdings, LLC, RDL Properties of North Florida, LLC, Spyglass Property Holdings, LLC, The Academy at Julington Creek, LLC. (Bean, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
39 39 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/23 2:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC.(Mountford, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, October 18, 2024
38 38 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/18 5:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re35 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Artful Enterprises, LLC, Lucinda Chapin, Jacksonville Academy Holdings, LLC, RDL Properties of North Florida, LLC, Spyglass Property Holdings, LLC, The Academy at Julington Creek, LLC.(Bean, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit Exhibit 22,
Att: 23 Exhibit Exhibit 23,
Att: 24 Exhibit Exhibit 24,
Att: 25 Exhibit Exhibit 25,
Att: 26 Exhibit Exhibit 26,
Att: 27 Exhibit Exhibit 27,
Att: 28 Exhibit Exhibit 28,
Att: 29 Exhibit Exhibit 29,
Att: 30 Exhibit Exhibit 30,
Att: 31 Exhibit Exhibit 31,
Att: 32 Exhibit Exhibit 32,
Att: 33 Exhibit Exhibit 33,
Att: 34 Exhibit Exhibit 34,
Att: 35 Exhibit Exhibit 35,
Att: 36 Exhibit Exhibit 36
37 37 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 10/18 3:47 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re33 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim filed by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC.(Mountford, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
36 36 respm Response to motion Fri 10/18 3:43 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re34 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC.(Mountford, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, September 27, 2024
35 35 motion Partial Summary Judgment Fri 09/27 7:05 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC.(Purdy, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Part 1 - Declaration of Tristram Collins,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Part 2 - Declaration of Tristram Collins,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Text Messages
34 34 motion Summary Judgment Fri 09/27 5:24 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by All Defendants.(Van Laningham, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
33 33 motion Summary Judgment Fri 09/27 5:21 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Counterclaim by Lucinda Chapin.(Van Laningham, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
32 32 adr Mediation report Wed 09/25 11:10 AM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on 9/12/2024. Hearing outcome: Continued.. (Adams, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Fri 08/30 3:40 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 09/12/2024 at 9:30 am before William E. Adams, Jr..(Adams, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
30 30 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 05/13 4:53 PM
Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendants' REPLY to 29 Counterclaim of Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiff's by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC. Related document: 29 Answer to Complaint Counterclaimfiled by Lucinda ChapinJacksonville Academy Holdings, LLCArtful Enterprises, LLCRDL Properties of North Florida, LLCSpyglass Property Holdings, LLCThe Academy at Julington Creek, LLC.(Purdy, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
29 29 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 04/22 5:22 PM
Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC by Spyglass Property Holdings, LLC, The Academy at Julington Creek, LLC, RDL Properties of North Florida, LLC, Lucinda Chapin, Artful Enterprises, LLC, Jacksonville Academy Holdings, LLC.(Bean, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/11 2:21 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 the unopposed motion for an extension of time. The defendants must respond to the complaint by April 22, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on April 11, 2024. (AMH)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Thu 04/11 11:20 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Bean, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
26 26 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss / Failure to State a Claim Thu 03/28 1:25 PM
ORDER DENYING 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Brian J. Davis on 3/28/2024. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 02/27 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Daniel Kearney Bean on behalf of Artful Enterprises, LLC, Lucinda Chapin, Jacksonville Academy Holdings, LLC, RDL Properties of North Florida, LLC, Spyglass Property Holdings, LLC, The Academy at Julington Creek, LLC. Lead Counsel: Daniel K. Bean. (Bean, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
24 24 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 02/16 11:04 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jacqueline Alyse Van Laningham and Daniel Kearney Bean of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
23 23 order Case Management Scheduling Order Thu 02/15 4:02 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The following settings and deadlines shall apply: Discovery due by 8/26/2024; Dispositive motions due by 9/27/2024; Conduct mediation hearing by 10/31/2024; Pretrial statement due by 2/12/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2025 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Senior Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 3/3/2025 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Senior Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Senior Judge Brian J. Davis on 2/14/2024. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
22 22 order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 02/08 5:25 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order 21 is GRANTED. An amended case management and scheduling order will enter. Signed by Senior Judge Brian J. Davis on 2/7/2024. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
21 21 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Mon 01/29 4:52 PM
Joint MOTION to Modify14 Case Management Scheduling Order and Extend Case Deadlines by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC. (Purdy, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of appearance Tue 07/11 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Alyse Van Laningham on behalf of Artful Enterprises, LLC, Lucinda Chapin, Jacksonville Academy Holdings, LLC, RDL Properties of North Florida, LLC, Spyglass Property Holdings, LLC, The Academy at Julington Creek, LLC (Van Laningham, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 07/03 11:44 AM
ORDER granting 18 Jared Burns's unopposed motion for leave to withdraw from representing the defendants in this case and directing the clerk to modify the docket accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 7/3/2023. (ASL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
18 18 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 06/30 7:58 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Jared J. Burns to Withdraw as Attorney by All Defendants. (Burns, Jared)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Wed 04/26 4:15 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: The Joint Motion for Leave to File Reply and Sur-Reply 16 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/26/2023. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
16 16 motion Leave to File Amicus Brief / Document Mon 04/24 11:28 AM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support and Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint by All Defendants. (Burns, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
14 14 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 04/10 3:24 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/24/2024; Dispositive motions due by 6/28/2024; Conduct mediation hearing by 7/31/2024; Pretrial statement due by 11/13/2024; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2024 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 12/2/2024 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/10/2023.(AMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mediation Report Form,
Att: 2 Docket Sheets
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/10 3:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC. (Mountford, Derek)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Tue 04/11 7:56 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (BGR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
12 12 misc Case Management Report Thu 03/30 11:35 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mountford, Derek)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/24 9:30 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Artful Enterprises, LLC, Lucinda Chapin, Jacksonville Academy Holdings, LLC, RDL Properties of North Florida, LLC, Spyglass Property Holdings, LLC, The Academy at Julington Creek, LLC. (Burns, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/20 4:47 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Burns, Jared)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 20, 2023
9 9 service Waiver of service executed Mon 02/20 3:56 PM
WAIVER of service returned executed on 01/18/2023 by Pa+hfinder, LLC, IC US Properties 1, LLC as to All Defendants. (Mountford, Derek)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 02/03 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Todd A. Wind on behalf of IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC. Lead Counsel: Todd Wind. (Wind, Todd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/24 12:21 PM
ORDER granting 4 , 5 , Nathan Converse's and Todd Wind's motions asking the Court for permission to specially appear to represent the plaintiffs in this action. By 2/7/2023, counsel must notify the Court who will be serving as lead counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 1/24/2023. (ASL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/23 4:51 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC. (Mountford, Derek)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/23 2:41 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Todd A. Wind to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20427928 for $150 by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC. (Mountford, Derek)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/23 2:37 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Nathan D. Converse to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20427868 for $150 by IC US Properties 1, LLC, Pa+hfinder, LLC. (Mountford, Derek)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 01/20 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/18 7:55 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:23-cv-0059-BJD-PDB. (SJB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
1 1 42 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/17 5:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Artful Enterprises, LLC, Lucinda Chapin, Jacksonville Academy Holdings, LLC, RDL Properties of North Florida, LLC, Spyglass Property Holdings, LLC, The Academy at Julington Creek, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20408220) filed by Pa+hfinder, LLC, IC US Properties 1, LLC.(Purdy, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter of Intent,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Asset Purchase Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - PSA - Jacksonville,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - PSA - St. Johns,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Closing Conditions Waiver,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet