New Jersey District Court
Judge:Robert Kirsch
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:23-cv-00218
Nature of Suit450 Other Statutes - Commerce
Cause49:81 Damaged Goods While Being Transported
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2023
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2023 6:16 AM EDT
Defendant
XPO LOGISTICS, LLC
Represented By
TROY HILLEL GEISSER
Spector Rubin PA
contact info
Plaintiff
MUNICH RE SPECIALTY (UK) LTD.
Represented By
JOHN JAMES SULLIVAN
Hill Rivkins LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 02/19 10:11 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 2/19/2025. (amv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Tue 02/18 1:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by XPO LOGISTICS, LLC. (GEISSER, TROY)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 29, 2024
20 20 order Text Order Sun 12/29 3:28 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' status update submitted on 12/27/2024. In same, the parties request additional time to finalize discovery prior to convening a settlement conference and/or final pretrial conference. The Court hereby grants the parties' request. Accordingly, the parties are directed to submit an additional update by 01/28/2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 12/29/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
19 19 order Text Order Wed 11/13 1:58 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' status update submitted on 11/12/2024. The parties report that minor additional discovery is necessary before convening a settlement conference and/or final pretrial conference. The parties are, hereby, provided the opportunity to conduct same. The parties are directed to submit an additional update by 12/27/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/13/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 09/17 11:15 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 9/4/2024. Given that further discovery is necessary before convening a settlement conference and/or final pretrial conference, an update shall be submitted by 10/31/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
18 18 order Order Reassigning Case Wed 07/10 4:08 PM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert Kirsch for all further proceedings. Judge Peter G. Sheridan no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/10/2024. (km)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 07/10 10:46 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties reporting that this matter is not ripe for a settlement conference, discovery may commence. A status telephone conference will be conducted on 9/4/2024 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Given the parties' intention to expedite discovery, they may contact the Court prior to 9/4/2024 if discovery has been completed. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/10/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 04/10 3:21 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 4/9/2024. A subpoena for records necessary to further settlement discussions will be issued to a third party. A status update is to be submitted by 6/12/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/03 5:03 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court shall conduct a telephone conference regarding the status of the parties' settlement discussions on 4/9/2024 at 10:00 a.m. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. Dial-in information for the conference shall be circulated at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/3/2024. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2024
15 15 order Order Mon 02/19 5:35 PM
TEXT ORDER: After reviewing the parties' update submitted on 2/16/2024, the Court maintains the stay on formal discovery as the parties' settlement discussions are progressing. An additional update shall be submitted by 3/22/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/19/2024. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
14 14 order Order Tue 01/23 12:42 PM
TEXT ORDER: After reviewing the parties' update submitted on 1/19/2024, the Court maintains the stay on formal discovery as the parties' settlement discussions are progressing. An additional update shall be submitted by 2/16/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/23/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
13 13 order Order Fri 01/12 11:16 AM
TEXT ORDER: After reviewing the parties' update submitted on 1/5/2024, the Court maintains the stay on formal discovery as the parties' settlement discussions are progressing. An additional update shall be submitted by 1/19/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1/12/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
12 12 order Order Tue 11/07 3:46 PM
TEXT ORDER: After reviewing the parties' update submitted on 11/7/2023, the Court maintains the stay on formal discovery. The parties may continue to exchange discovery necessary to facilitate settlement. An update is to be submitted by 1/5/2024. The discovery schedule will be addressed if the matter does not settle. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/07/2023. (jem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 08/31 2:26 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/31/2023. Formal discovery is stayed. The parties may exchange discovery necessary to facilitate settlement. An update is to be submitted by 10/31/2023. The discovery schedule will be addressed if the matter does not settle. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
11 11 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 07/14 3:42 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2023 at 2:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/14/2023. (jem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 07/13 5:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by XPO LOGISTICS, LLC identifying XPO Logistics, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GEISSER, TROY)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 07/13 4:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by XPO LOGISTICS, LLC.(GEISSER, TROY)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation Thu 07/13 4:55 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint to Answer Complaint by XPO LOGISTICS, LLC. (GEISSER, TROY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Wed 04/26 11:19 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint until 5/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/26/2023. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 04/25 1:53 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint Extending Time to Respond by XPO LOGISTICS, LLC. (GEISSER, TROY)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/25 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TROY HILLEL GEISSER on behalf of XPO LOGISTICS, LLC (GEISSER, TROY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Wed 04/12 4:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summon & complaint served on XPO Logistics LLC, by Ronald John on 4/10/2023, filed by MUNICH RE SPECIALTY (UK) LTD.. (SULLIVAN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 01/18 11:58 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to XPO LOGISTICS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 01/17 1:35 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MUNICH RE SPECIALTY (UK) LTD. identifying Munich Re Group/Munich Reinsurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (SULLIVAN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/17 1:15 PM
COMPLAINT against XPO LOGISTICS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13961376), filed by MUNICH RE SPECIALTY (UK) LTD..(SULLIVAN, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 01/18 11:56 AM
Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mlh)
Related: [-]