Texas Northern District Court
Judge:James Wesley Hendrix
Case #: 5:23-cv-00013
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2023
Re-opened:Feb 03, 2025
Terminated:Dec 04, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2023 5:00 AM CDT
Defendant
Clay County
214 N. Main St.
Henrietta, TX 76365
Represented By
Thomas P Brandt
Fanning Harper Martinson Brandt & Kutchin, P.C.
contact info
John D Husted
Fanning Harper Martinson Brandt & Kutchin, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Concord Medical Group PLLC
5301 Southwest Parkway
Austin, TX 78735
Represented By
Charles C Self, III
The Whitten Law Firm, PC
contact info
Defendant
Clay County Memorial Hospital
Represented By
Ramon D Bissmeyer
Cox Smith Matthews Incorporated
contact info
Defendant
Clay County Memorial Hospital Foundation
Represented By
Ramon D Bissmeyer
Cox Smith Matthews Incorporated
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Ashley
3401 Allen Parkway Ste. 100
Houston, TX 77019
Represented By
Patrick M Dennis
Doyle LLP
contact info
Michael P Doyle
Doyle LLP
contact info
Emma Brockway
Doyle Dennis LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
90 90 8 pgs order Order Tue 05/13 5:00 PM
ORDER: Clay County's motion under Rule 12(b)(1) asserts that it has immunity from the state-law claim against it and that the Court thus lacks jurisdiction over the suit. Ashley asserts that the state abrogated governmental immunity over these claims. Because Section 301.413(g) waives governmental immunity only in state courts, the Court grants the motion in part, dismissing without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction Ashleys state-law claim against the County. The Court reserves ruling on the 12(b)(6) portion of the motion until the Court has resolved the motion to compel arbitration. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 5/13/2025) (krr)
Related: [-]