Party City Holdco Inc. and Trisar, Inc.
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Marvin Isgur |
Case #: | 4:23-bk-90005 |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2023 |
Debtor
Party City Holdco Inc.
100 Tice Blvd.
Woodcliff Lake, NJ 07677 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Thursday Jan 19, 2023 8:24 AM CST |
Creditor
PREIT Services LLC
Jeffrey Kurtzman, Esquire 101 N. Washington Ave Suite 4A
Margate, NJ 08403 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jefferson County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kimco Realty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
WPG Legacy, LLC
Attn: Ronald E. Gold 3300 Great American Tower 301 East Fourth Street
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lewisville ISD
Linbarger, Goggan, Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John K. Turner 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lubbock Central Appraisal District, et al
Perdue, Brandon, Fielder, Collins & Mott PO Box 817
Lubbock, TX 79408 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Metroplex West Associates LP
Jeffrey Kurtzman, Esquire 101 N. Washington Ave Suite 4A
Margate, NJ 08403 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Montgomery County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mudrick Capital Management L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
NEST International, Inc.
BROWN & CONNERY, LLP Attn: Donald L. Ludman, Esquire Attn: Julie F. Montgomery, Esquire 6 N. Broad Street - Suite 100
Woodbury, NJ 08096 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77235 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PWR16 48-18 Northern Blvd LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
RED Development, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Red Rose Commons LP
Jeffrey Kurtzman, Esquire 101 N. Washington Ave Suite 4A
Margate, NJ 08403 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Rockwall CAD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John K. Turner 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
225 West Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Smith County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John K. Turner 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John K. Turner 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tom Green CAD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson c/o John K. Turner 2777 N Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tyler Independent School District
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott PO Box 2007
Tyler, TX 75710 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Urban Edge Properties LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Berengaria Development, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Road Land, LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Weitzman
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Committee of Anagram Bondholders
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Noteholder Group
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
B33 Belmar II LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
B33 Centereach II LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
B33 Peach Street II LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
B33 Valley Central II LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
B33 Woodscreek Commons LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
B33 Wrangleboro II LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Boulevard North Associates LP
Jeffrey Kurtzman, Esquire 101 N. Washington Ave Suite 4A
Margate, NJ 08403 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bristol Place Limited Partnership
Tenenbaum & Saas, P.C. 4504 Walsh Street, Suite 200
Chevy Chase, MD 20815 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixmor Operating Partnership LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brookfield Properties Retail, Inc.
Kristen N. Pate, Esq. 350 N. Orleans St., Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60654 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
COLLIN COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR/COLLECTOR
Abernathy, Roeder, Boyd & Hullett, P.C. 1700 Redbud Blvd. Suite 300
McKinney, TX 75069 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
City of Frisco
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John K. Turner 2777 N. Stemmons Freeway Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cypress-Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP C/O Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John K Turner 2777 N. Stemmons Frwy Ste 1000
Dallas, TX 75207 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP C/O Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Galveston County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
(f/k/a Prime Clerk LLC) 55 East 52nd Street 17th Floor
New York, NY 10055 |
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
1. | Party City files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy protection (reuters.com) |
Submitted Fri 01/20/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
2266 | 2266
notice
Notice
Thu 05/02 12:13 PM
Notice of Hearing to be Held on May 17, 2024 at 10:00 AM (Prevailing Central Time) . Filed by Party City GUC Trust (Wilson, Sean) |
|
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
2265 | 2265
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 05/01 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 147. Notice Date 05/01/2024. (Admin.) |
|
2264 | 2264
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 05/01 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 147. Notice Date 05/01/2024. (Admin.) |
|
2263 | 2263
misc
Withdraw Document
Wed 05/01 2:50 PM
Withdraw Document (Filed By Stratus Unlimited, LLC ) (Powell, Lisa) |
|
2262 | 2262
notice
Notice
Wed 05/01 11:42 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Appearance and Request for Removal from ECF Notifications . Filed by Christina Alexandra Fiallo (Fiallo, Christina) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
court
Hearing Set
Tue 04/30 5:28 PM
Hearing Set On Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court. Hearing scheduled for 5/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (tjl4) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
2261 | 2261
order
Generic Order
Mon 04/29 4:20 PM
Second Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending the New York State Department of Taxation & Finance's Deadline to Respond to Reorganized Debtor's Objection to Proof of Claim, Signed on 4/29/2024 (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
2260 | 2260
court
Letter
Mon 04/29 2:27 PM
Letter from Joy Edmond Re: Claim no. 2034 (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
2259 | 2259
audio
MP3
Mon 04/29 1:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/29/2024 10:13:54 AM ]. File Size [ 17312 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:36:04 ]. (admin) |
|
2258 | 2258
misc
Proposed Order
Mon 04/29 12:53 PM
Proposed Order RE: Order Sustaining the Party City GUC Trust's Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims Pursuant to Section 502(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 3007 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Seeking to Disallow Certain Claims (Late Filed Claims) Solely as it Relates to Claim No. 2034 Filed by Joy Edmond (Filed By Party City GUC Trust ) (Wilson, Sean) |
|
2257 | 2257
order
Generic Order
Mon 04/29 12:12 PM
Order Sustaining Reorganized Debtors' Twenty-Second Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim (Amended Claims), Signed on 4/29/2024 (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
2256 | 2256
court
Courtroom Minutes
Mon 04/29 11:37 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 10:13 AM - 10:49 PM. Appearances: Appearances: Bryan Roshell for the Reorganized Debtors. Todd Ross an interested party. Sean Wilson for Party City GUC Trust. The Court heard oral argument. Exhibits admitted: ECF no. 2202. Hearing continued for objection2193 to 06/17/24 at 9:00 AM. Hearing continued for objections2203 and2204 to 05/17/24 at 10:00 AM. Objection2205 sustained; order signed on the record. Hearing scheduled for 5/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (SierraThomasAnderson) |
|
court
Hearing Set
Mon 04/29 11:38 AM
Hearing Set Hearing scheduled for 6/17/2024 at 09:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
court
Hearing Set
Mon 04/29 12:07 PM
Hearing Set Hearing scheduled for 6/17/2024 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (SierraThomasAnderson) |
||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
2255 | 2255
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 147. Notice Date 04/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
2254 | 2254
misc
Agenda
Fri 04/26 8:13 PM
Agenda for Hearing on 4/29/2024 (Filed By Party City Holdco Inc. ). (Higgins, John) |
|
2253 | 2253
misc
Certificate of No Objection (Complex 11 ONLY)
Fri 04/26 3:12 PM
Certificate of No Objection with Respect to Reorganized Debtors' Twentieth-Second Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim (Amended Claims) (Filed By Party City Holdco Inc. ) (Higgins, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2252 | 2252
misc
Certificate of No Objection (Complex 11 ONLY)
Fri 04/26 3:07 PM
Certificate of No Objection with Respect to Reorganized Debtors' Twentieth-First Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim (Filed By Party City Holdco Inc. ) (Higgins, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2251 | 2251
misc
Certificate of No Objection (Complex 11 ONLY)
Fri 04/26 3:02 PM
Certificate of No Objection with Respect to Reorganized Debtors' Twentieth Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim (Satisfied Claims) (Filed By Party City Holdco Inc. ) (Higgins, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2250 | 2250
misc
Exhibit List
Fri 04/26 11:50 AM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Party City Holdco Inc. ) (Higgins, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 | ||
2249 | 2249
misc
Stipulation
Fri 04/26 11:14 AM
Stipulation By Party City Holdco Inc. and New York State Department of Taxation & Finance. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Party City Holdco Inc. ) (Higgins, John) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
2248 | 2248
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/25 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 147. Notice Date 04/25/2024. (Admin.) |
|
2247 | 2247
misc
Exhibit List
Thu 04/25 11:17 AM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Party City Holdco Inc. ) (Higgins, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 | ||
2246 | 2246
misc
Exhibit List
Thu 04/25 11:12 AM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Party City GUC Trust ) (Wilson, Sean) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Sixth Omnibus Objection | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of M. Berkin | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service | ||
2245 | 2245
misc
Withdraw Document
Thu 04/25 10:45 AM
Withdraw Document (Filed By COLLIN COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR/COLLECTOR ) (Lopez, Paul) |