Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-01077

Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lee M Jackwig
Case #: 3:23-ap-30003
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2023
Terminated:Jun 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Travis Michael Ehrecke
3477 150th Street
Durant, IA 52747
Represented By
Travis Michael Ehrecke
contact info
Plaintiff
Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC
Represented By
Abram V Carls
contact info
Plaintiff
Rock Solid Ag., Inc
Represented By
Abram V Carls
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, June 20, 2024
court Close Case - Adversary Thu 06/20 4:14 PM
Adversary Case Closed 23-30003 jmk)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
29 29 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 06/14 9:46 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by Plaintiffs Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC Related [+]. (Gray, Samuel)
Related: [-] 28 Judgment
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
28 28 court Judgment Tue 06/04 12:27 PM
Judgment For Plaintiff Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Rock Solid Ag, Inc. and against Defendant Travis Michael Ehrecke Follow Up Case Manager Deadline due by 6/20/2024. (tls)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Stipulation - Order Tue 06/04 12:25 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Related [+]. (tls)
Related: [-] 23
Saturday, May 18, 2024
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/18 11:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/18/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25
Thursday, May 16, 2024
25 25 court Notice of Bar Date - 14 day Thu 05/16 2:48 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+] Objections Due By 5/30/2024. (tls)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation By and Between Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC and Travis Michael Ehrecke filed by Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Plaintiff Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Plaintiff Rock Solid Ag., Inc
24 24 order Order Thu 05/16 2:47 PM
Docket Text Order Regarding Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Defendant. Whereas the stipulation regarding the 11 U.S.C. § 523(c) counts seemingly contemplates a dismissal of the 11 U.S.C. § 727 count and whereas the introductory language in Rule 7041 indicates notice of such disposition must be provided to the chapter trustee and the United States Trustee, the Court hereby Orders that: (1) The Clerk of Court shall bar date notice the stipulation. (2) If neither the chapter trustee nor the United States Trustee files a timely objection, the objection to discharge count shall be deemed dismissed by operation of this order. Beyond notice of electronic filing, service of this order is waived. This order has been entered on the docket as directed by Judge Jackwig. Related [+] (tls)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation
court Corrective Entry Thu 05/16 2:33 PM
Corrective Entry Incorrect docket event Related [+] (tls)
Related: [-] 22 Motion filed by Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Plaintiff Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Plaintiff Rock Solid Ag., Inc
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
23 23 motion Stipulation Thu 05/16 2:44 PM
Stipulation By and Between Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC and Travis Michael Ehrecke Filed by Plaintiffs Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC Related [+]. (tls)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Plaintiff Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Plaintiff Rock Solid Ag., Inc,4 Answer to Complaint filed by Counter-Claimant Travis Michael Ehrecke, Defendant Travis Michael Ehrecke
22 22 motion motion Wed 05/08 10:59 AM
Motion Filed by Samuel Gray on behalf of Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC (Gray, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Signed proposed order
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
21 21 order Extend Time - Order Tue 04/02 8:13 AM
Docket Text Order Regarding Second Consent Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline. Having reviewed the motion and having found that it sets forth cause as required by Rule 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Court hereby Orders that: The motion is granted. By April 30, 2024, the parties shall conclude discovery. As required by any applicable federal rule or statute, the filer shall serve this order on all appropriate parties (except those parties who will receive notice of electronic filing). This order has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to the case. Related [+]. (tls)
Related: [-] 20
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
20 20 motion Extend Time Wed 03/27 2:57 PM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Samuel Gray on behalf of Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC (Gray, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
19 19 order Extend Time - Order Fri 02/16 11:48 AM
Docket Text Order Regarding Consent Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline. Having reviewed the motion and having found that it sets forth cause as required by Rule 9006(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Court hereby Orders that: The motion is granted. By April 1, 2024, the parties shall conclude discovery. As required by any applicable federal rule or statute, the filer shall serve this order on all appropriate parties (except those parties who will receive notice of electronic filing). This order has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to the case. Related [+]. (tls)
Related: [-] 18
18 18 motion Extend Time Fri 02/16 10:36 AM
Motion to Extend Time Filed by Samuel Gray on behalf of Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC (Gray, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 02/02 2:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Samuel Gray on behalf of Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC..(Gray, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
16 16 order Stipulation Re: Scheduling - Order Thu 06/22 12:17 PM
Docket Text Order Regarding Stipulation Re: Scheduling. Having reviewed the stipulation and having determined the document contains the information required by the relevant federal rules, the Court hereby approves the Stipulation Re: Scheduling and orders the Trial Stipulation Re: Facts, Issues, Exhibits and Witnesses be filed by May 15, 2024. As required by any applicable federal rule or statute, the filer shall serve this order on all appropriate parties (except those parties who will receive notice of electronic filing). This order has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to this proceeding. Related [+]. Trial Stipulation Re: Facts, Issues, Exhibits and Witnesses due by 5/15/2024. (tls)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
15 15 motion Stipulation Re: Scheduling Wed 06/21 2:14 PM
Stipulation Re: Scheduling Filed by Plaintiffs Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC. (Carls, Abram)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
14 14 order Order Thu 06/01 8:43 AM
Minute Order < none; instead: Docket Text Order Regarding May 31, 2023 Scheduling Conference. It is hereby Ordered that: The parties shall submit their Stipulation Re: Scheduling by June 21, 2023. Beyond notice of electronic filing, service of this order is waived. Appearances: Mr. Carls for Plaintiffs, and Mr. Soppe for Defendant. This order has been entered on the docket as directed by Judge Jackwig. Related [+] (tls)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Summons and Notice Issued
Thursday, March 16, 2023
13 13 order motion - Order Thu 03/16 12:06 PM
Docket Text Order Regarding Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim and Notice of Dismissal of Counterclaim. Due to the procedural constraints of Rule 41(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure made applicable to adversary proceedings by operation of Rule 7041 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Court construes the notice as a no contest response and grants the motion. The counterclaim is dismissed. Beyond notice of electronic filing, service of this order is waived. This order has been entered on the docket as directed by Judge Jackwig. Related [+].. (tls)
Related: [-] 6 11 Notice of Dismissal filed by Counter-Claimant Travis Michael Ehrecke, Defendant Travis Michael Ehrecke
12 12 objectio Response (ONLY if not objecting) Thu 03/16 11:18 AM
Error: Document Entered in Error. Response Filed by Travis Michael Ehrecke Related [+](ccc Modified on 3/16/2023 (ccc).
Related: [-] related documents(s)6 Motion filed by Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Plaintiff Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Plaintiff Rock Solid Ag., Inc
11 11 court Notice of Dismissal Thu 03/16 9:55 AM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by Christopher M Soppe on behalf of Travis Michael Ehrecke. (Soppe, Christopher)
Related: [-]
court Entered in Error Thu 03/16 11:55 AM
Entered in Error Document Entered in Error. Related [+](ccc)
Related: [-] 12 Response filed by Counter-Claimant Travis Michael Ehrecke, Defendant Travis Michael Ehrecke
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/15 11:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/15/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, March 13, 2023
9 9 court Hearing Continued or Rescheduled - VTC Mon 03/13 10:42 AM
Hearing Continued or Rescheduled VTC Related [+] Hearing scheduled 5/31/2023 at 08:30 AM at Davenport Courtroom #120 - VTC. (tls)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Plaintiff Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Plaintiff Rock Solid Ag., Inc
Sunday, March 05, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/05 11:08 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/05/2023. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, March 03, 2023
7 7 court Notice of Bar Date - 14 day Fri 03/03 11:19 AM
Notice of Bar Date for Objections Related [+]Objections Due By 3/17/2023.(tls)
Related: [-] 6 Motion filed by Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Plaintiff Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Counter-Defendant Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Plaintiff Rock Solid Ag., Inc
Thursday, March 02, 2023
6 6 motion motion Thu 03/02 4:34 PM
Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim Filed by Abram V Carls on behalf of Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC. (Carls, Abram)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
5 5 cmp Counterclaim Tue 02/14 2:04 PM
Counterclaim by Travis Michael Ehrecke against Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC (ccc)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/14 1:10 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Travis Michael Ehrecke. (Soppe, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
3 3 court Summons and Notice Issued Tue 01/17 4:24 PM
Summons and Notice Issued on Travis Michael Ehrecke Answer Due 02/16/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 03/22/2023 at 08:30 AM at US Bk Ct, 4th Floor, Courtroom 2. (akam)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Support Document Tue 01/17 4:20 PM
Support Document Filed by Plaintiffs Rock Solid Ag., Inc, Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC Related [+]. (Carls, Abram)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Plaintiff Rock Solid Ag., Inc
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/17 3:22 PM
Adversary case 23-30003 Complaint by Rock Solid Liquid Application, LLC, Rock Solid Ag., Inc against Travis Michael Ehrecke. Fee Amount $350 (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) Lead Case No. 3:22-bk-1077 (Carls, Abram)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet