Connecticut District Court
Judge:Stefan R Underhill
Referred: Maria E Garcia
Case #: 3:23-cv-00061
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2023
Terminated:Aug 21, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2023 7:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Aquinas Consulting, LLC
Represented By
John M. Letizia
Letizia, Ambrose & Falls, P.C.
contact info
Phyllis M. Pari
Letizia, Ambrose & Falls, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By
James F. Shea
Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, Ct
contact info
Trisana Natwya Spence
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation
Represented By
James F. Shea
Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, Ct
contact info
Trisana Natwya Spence
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Vienna DiPiave
Represented By
John T. Bochanis
Daly, Weihing & Bochanis
contact info

GPO Jul 17 2023
ORDER granting 20 and 21 Motions to Dismiss. For the reasons set forth in the attached order, I grant Defendants' motions to dismiss, docs. no. 20-21, and dismiss Counts Two and Three without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within thirty days, on or before August 16, 2023. The dismissals of Counts Two and Three without prejudice will become dismissals with prejudice unless Plaintiff timely files an amended complaint curing the noted pleading deficiencies. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/17/2023. (Hurley, S.)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
93 93 order Judgment Wed 08/21 2:57 PM
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Aquinas Consulting, LLC, against Vienna DiPiave. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by District Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/21/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] is, J
92 92 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Wed 08/21 2:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Stefan R. Underhill: Motion Hearing held on 8/21/2024.66 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aquinas Consulting, LLC and73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation and Lockheed Martin Corporation are GRANTED. Total Time: 1 hour and 1 minute (Court Reporter: Melissa Cianciullo) Related [+]
Related: [-] is, J
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Wed 08/21 2:58 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey Related [+]
Related: [-] is, J