Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:23-cv-00044
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2023 4:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Starstruck Entertainment, LLC
Represented By
Keane A. Barger
Loeb & Loeb, Llp (nashville)
contact info
Timothy L. Warnock
Loeb & Loeb, Llp (nashville)
contact info
Jacob William Neu
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings Llp (nashville, Tn Office)
contact info
Defendant
The Alexander Trust
Represented By
Keane A. Barger
Loeb & Loeb, Llp (nashville)
contact info
Timothy L. Warnock
Loeb & Loeb, Llp (nashville)
contact info
Jacob William Neu
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings Llp (nashville, Tn Office)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jay Wilfong
2890 Academy Road
Lebanon, TN 37087
Represented By
Jacob C. VanAusdall
Maurice Wutscher LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 02 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/2/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
44 44 2 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Thu 04/24 11:41 AM
ORDER RESETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Bench Trial set for 8/11/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2025 at 01:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 8/5/2025. Witness List due by 8/5/2025. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2025. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 04/24/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad) Modified on 4/24/2025 (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
43 43 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/18 3:55 PM
ORDER: The court is unable to try this bench trial on June 24, 2025. The court can reset the trial for July 8, 2025 or August 11, 2025. The parties shall inform Judge Trauger's Courtroom Deputy by April 24, 2025 whether either of these dates works to reschedule this bench trial. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/18/2025. (ch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
42 42 2 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Tue 11/26 12:41 PM
ORDER RESETTING BENCH TRIAL: Bench Trial set for 6/24/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2025 at 01:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 6/17/2025. Witness List due by 6/17/2025. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/17/2025. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/26/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
41 41 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 11/26 12:36 PM
ORDER: Motion40 to Reset Trial Date GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/26/2024. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
40 40 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/22 1:21 PM
Unopposed MOTION Reset Trial Date re39 Order Setting Case for Trial,, by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust. (Barger, Keane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
39 39 2 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Fri 11/22 8:42 AM
ORDER RESETTING BENCH TRIAL: Bench Trial set for 4/15/2025 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2025 at 01:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 4/8/2025. Witness List due by 4/8/2025. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/8/2025. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/21/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
38 38 adr Report of Mediation Thu 11/21 1:58 PM
REPORT of Mediation (Griffin, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/14 2:00 PM
NOTICE by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust re36 Order,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,, (Warnock, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
36 36 2 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 10/08 2:48 PM
ORDER: The court must try a criminal case on the day scheduled for this bench trial, November 19, 2024. Therefore, the trial scheduled for November 19, 2024 and the pretrial conference scheduled for November 15, 2024 are CONTINUED. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall mediate this case in the hope that it might be settled in that process. By October 18, 2024, they shall file a notice with the court that informs the court of the date on which they have scheduled a mediation and the name of the mediator who will be mediating the case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/08/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
35 35 2 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Fri 04/05 4:25 PM
ORDER RESETTING BENCH TRIAL: Bench Trial set for 11/19/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 11/15/2024 01:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2024; Exhibit List due by 11/12/2024; and Witness List due by 11/12/2024. Lead counsel for each party must attend the pretrial conference. If lead counsel is not from Tennessee, local counsel must also attend. By November 11, 2024, each party shall file proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/5/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 04/05 4:18 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion to Continue trial date. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/5/2024. (mg)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Declaration Fri 04/05 10:43 AM
DECLARATION of Keane Barger filed by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust re:32 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Date . (Barger, Keane)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Continue Fri 04/05 10:41 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Trial Date by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust. (Barger, Keane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 04/02 3:26 PM
ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, the defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No.16 ) is hereby DENIED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/2/2024. (af)
Related: [-]
30 30 16 pgs order Memorandum Opinion of the Court Tue 04/02 3:25 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/2/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
29 29 6 pgs misc Declaration Mon 04/01 2:04 PM
DECLARATION of Jay WIlfong filed by Jay Wilfong re:22 Response in Opposition to Motion.(VanAusdall, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures,
Att: 2 14 pgs Exhibit B - Def. Responses to Interrogatories,
Att: 3 20 pgs Exhibit C - Def. Responses to Requests for Production,
Att: 4 14 pgs Exhibit D - Alexander Trust's Response to Interrogatories,
Att: 5 20 pgs Exhibit E - Alexander Trusts' Responses to Requests for Production,
Att: 6 3 pgs Exhibit F - Starstuck Dance Trademark,
Att: 7 2 pgs Exhibit G - Starstruck Dance Challenge Trademark,
Att: 8 7 pgs Exhibit H - Defendants' Trademark Application,
Att: 9 2 pgs Exhibit I - Wilfong's Trademark Registration,
Att: 10 1 pgs Exhibit J - Defendants' Trademark Registration
Thursday, December 28, 2023
28 28 9 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 12/28 10:05 AM
REPLY to Response to re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust. (Warnock, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
27 27 misc Certificate Tue 12/19 10:31 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Jay Wilfong re24 Declaration filed by Jay Wilfong. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Certificate Tue 12/19 10:30 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Jay Wilfong re25 Declaration filed by Jay Wilfong. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Mon 12/18 4:03 PM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#24 25 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
25 25 misc Declaration Fri 12/15 2:55 PM
DECLARATION of Patricia Biggerstaff filed by Jay Wilfong re:23 Response in Opposition to Motion. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Declaration Fri 12/15 2:53 PM
DECLARATION of Pique Lyle filed by Jay Wilfong re:22 Response in Opposition to Motion. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/15 2:51 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts filed by Jay Wilfong. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/15 2:40 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jay Wilfong. (VanAusdall, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/28 3:02 PM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Having considered the motion, record, and lack of opposition to the Motion, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the motion is granted and Plaintiff's deadline to file a response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is extended until December 15, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/28/2023. (af)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 11/28 9:14 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Jay Wilfong.(VanAusdall, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
19 19 misc Declaration Tue 11/07 2:37 PM
DECLARATION of Cliff Williamson filed by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust re:16 MOTION for Summary Judgment .(Warnock, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Report for TTAB Proceeding,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Petition for Cancellation,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Institution,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Appearance for Jay Wilfong,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Registrant's Answer to Petition to Cancel,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Appearance for Starstruck and Alexander Trust,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Order re attorney admissions,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Change of Correspondence Address,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Order Resuming Matter and Setting Deadlines,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Petitioners' Motion to Amend Petition of Cancellation,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 Part 1 - Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment & Exs. 1-30,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 Part 2 - Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment & Exs. 1-30,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11 - Part 3 - Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment & Exs. 1-30,
Att: 14 Exhibit 12 - Exs. 31-43 to Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 15 Exhibit 13 - Exs. 44-52 to Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 16 Exhibit 14 - Registrant's Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 17 Exhibit 15 - Petitioners' Reply ISO Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 18 Exhibit 16 - Order Suspending Proceedings,
Att: 19 Exhibit 17 - Order re Motion to Amend Petition to Cancel, MSJ and Resuming Proceeding,
Att: 20 Exhibit 18a - Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 21 Exhibit 18b - Ex. A to Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 22 Exhibit 18c - Exs. B-I to Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 23 Exhibit 18d - Exs. K-P to Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 24 Exhibit 18e - Exs. Q-Y to Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 25 Exhibit 18f - Exs. Z-AI to Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 26 Exhibit 18g - Exs. AJ-AR to Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 27 Exhibit 18h - Exs. AS-BC to Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 28 Exhibit 18i - Exs. BD-BG to Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 29 Exhibit 18j - Exs. BH-BL to Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 30 Exhibit 18k - Exs. BM-BX to Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 31 Exhibit 18l - Exs. BY-CK to Petitioners' Notice of Reliance,
Att: 32 Exhibit 19a - Testimonial Declaration of Cliff Williamson and Exhibits,
Att: 33 Exhibit 19b - Continuation of Ex. 5 to Testimonial Declaration of Cliff Williamson,
Att: 34 Exhibit 20 - Registrant's First Notice of Reliance,
Att: 35 Exhibit 21 - Testimony of Jay Wilfong,
Att: 36 Exhibit 22 - Petitioners' Rebuttal Notice of Reliance,
Att: 37 Exhibit 23 - Rebuttal Testimonial Declaration of Cliff Williamson,
Att: 38 Exhibit 24 - Petitioners' Notice of Filing Trial Depo Testimony of Jay Wilfong,
Att: 39 Exhibit 25 - Petitioners' Main Brief,
Att: 40 Exhibit 26 - Registrant's Main Brief,
Att: 41 Exhibit 27 - Petitioners' Reply Brief,
Att: 42 Exhibit 28 - TTAB Opinion,
Att: 43 Exhibit 29 - Order Cancelling Registration No. 6020394,
Att: 44 Exhibit 30 - Facebook Message from Michelle Foster,
Att: 45 Exhibit 31 - Text Message Berkley Kriz received from Chris Looney,
Att: 46 Exhibit 32 - Facebook post re Songwriter Rounds,
Att: 47 Exhibit 33 - Facebook post re A Night in the Grand Ole Barn II,
Att: 48 Exhibit 34 - Facebook post re Grand Ole Barn Songwriters Round-Buffet Dinner show
18 18 misc Statement of facts Tue 11/07 1:59 PM
STATEMENT of facts filed by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust in support of16 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Warnock, Timothy)
Related: [-]
17 17 25 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Tue 11/07 1:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust . (Warnock, Timothy)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Summary Judgment Tue 11/07 1:53 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust. (Warnock, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Fri 10/20 3:35 PM
ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL: Bench Trial set for 7/2/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2024 at 01:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Exhibit List due by 6/25/2024. Witness List due by 6/25/2024. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/25/2024. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/20/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Judge Fri 10/20 3:28 PM
ORDER: The plaintiff now has counsel. Therefore, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is WITHDRAWN. The Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to File Dispositive Motions (Doc. No.12 ) is GRANTED, and the deadline for the filing of dispositive motions is hereby extended to November 7, 2023. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/20/23. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Filing Thu 10/19 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Filing by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions (Warnock, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 10/18 12:05 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust. (Warnock, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/03 9:00 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jacob C. VanAusdall admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/01 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob C. VanAusdall on behalf of Jay Wilfong (VanAusdall, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Thu 02/23 2:05 PM
ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Exhibit List due by 6/10/2024. Witness List due by 6/10/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 02/23/23. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad) Modified on 2/23/2023 (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Setting Case for Trial Wed 02/22 4:19 PM
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Bench Trial set for 7/2/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. It is further ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge shall conduct the pretrial conference, rule on all motions in limine, and enter a pretrial order. She shall assist the plaintiff with the preparation of subpoenas, discuss exhibits, and all other matters necessary for having the case prepared to be tried on the date set. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 02/22/23. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
8 8 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/21 3:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/24/2023. Discovery due by 8/24/2023. Motions due by 10/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 02/21/23. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 02/21 9:10 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Timothy L. Warnock, Keane A. Barger, Jacob William Neu admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/17 11:17 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust.(Warnock, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Opinion,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Order
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/14 2:19 PM
ORDER: The4 motion is GRANTED. Starstruck and The Alexander Trust respectfully request the Court to enlarge the time to respond from Wednesday, February 8, 2023, by nine days to Friday, February 17, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 02/14/23. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 02/13 3:38 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 02/13/23. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/08 10:56 AM
MOTION to Enlarge by Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust. (Warnock, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 02/01 1:57 PM
Summons issued as to Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust. Summons handed back to plaintiff at intake. (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
2 2 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 01/19 10:30 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ad)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Thu 01/19 10:40 AM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (ad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 01/18 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT/APPEAL against Starstruck Entertainment, LLC, The Alexander Trust (Filing fee $402, Receipt number 34675068209), filed by Jay Wilfong.(ad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Receipt