Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Travis R Mcdonough
Referred: Jill E Mccook
Case #: 3:23-cv-00022
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2023
Terminated:Feb 07, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2023 7:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Theodore Richardson
3904 Lonas Drive
Knoxville, TN 37909
Represented By
Edward G Phillips
Kramer, Rayson Llp (knox)
contact info
Brandon Layne Morrow
Kramer, Rayson Llp (knox)
contact info
Defendant
South College of Tennessee, Inc.
RA: Stephen A South 3904 Lonas Drive
Knoxville, TN 37909
Represented By
Edward G Phillips
Kramer, Rayson Llp (knox)
contact info
Brandon Layne Morrow
Kramer, Rayson Llp (knox)
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Perez
11 Middleton Street
Providence, RI 02907
Represented By
Roman David Reese
Garner & Connor, PLLC
contact info
J Richard Ratcliffe
Ratcliffe Harten Galamaga LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 63 minutes ago
Monday, February 06, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/06 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Juan Perez (Ratcliffe, J. Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
19 19 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for TRO Fri 01/27 11:20 AM
ORDER denying 3 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym; denying 4 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/27/2023. (AML)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Fri 01/27 1:20 PM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5273404.) filed by Juan Perez (ABF)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/27 1:24 PM
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E. McCook on 1/27/2023. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
18 18 misc Court Reporter Notes (use this event when attaching notes converted to pdf) Thu 01/26 11:44 AM
COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Elizabeth Coffey of Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order before Judge Travis R. McDonough on 1/26/2023. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of TN before Judge Travis R. McDonough on 1/26/2023. By s/ Elizabeth Coffey. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (EBC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
17 17 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/25 11:13 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re3 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by Theodore Richardson, South College of Tennessee, Inc.. (Phillips, Edward)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 01/25 10:38 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Theodore Richardson, South College of Tennessee, Inc..(Phillips, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Declaration of T. Richardson,
Att: 2 Other Declaration of A. Banks
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/24 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G Phillips on behalf of All Defendants (Phillips, Edward)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/24 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Layne Morrow on behalf of Theodore Richardson, South College of Tennessee, Inc. (Morrow, Brandon)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 01/24 11:16 AM
ORDER. Motion Hearing for Temporary Restraining Order set for 1/25/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to attempt to give notice of hearing to Defendant and to be prepared to explain their efforts to give notice at the hearing. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/24/2023. (AML)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 01/24 2:17 PM
ORDER. The temporary-restraining-order hearing is hereby RESET to 1/26/2023 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. The hearing will be held virtually, and the link to join the hearing will be circulated to the parties via email. Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 1/24/2023.(EJB)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
11 11 service Summons Issued Mon 01/23 9:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Theodore Richardson, South College of Tennessee, Inc..(ABF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons South College of TN
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/23 8:41 AM
NOTICE by Juan Perez re1 Complaint Summons for South College of Tennesse, Inc Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Roman
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/23 8:40 AM
NOTICE by Juan Perez re1 Complaint Summons for Richardson Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Roman
Thursday, January 19, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) Thu 01/19 5:37 PM
Administrative Notice to Counsel requirements due by 1/24/2023 . (DJH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
7 7 3 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Thu 01/19 5:15 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/18/2023. (DJH)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Thu 01/19 5:13 PM
Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/18/2023. (DJH)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Thu 01/19 5:11 PM
Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 1/18/2023. (DJH)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Wed 01/18 6:08 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Juan Perez. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Roman
Att: 1 Other
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/18 6:05 PM
MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by Juan Perez. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Roman
Att: 1 Other
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/18 6:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-5273404.) by Juan Perez. Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Roman
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/18 5:58 PM
COMPLAINT against Theodore Richardson, South College of Tennessee, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-5273400.), filed by Juan Perez Related [+]
Related: [-] ese, Roman
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 01/19 5:04 PM
District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook added. (DJH)
Related: [-]