Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Referred: Scott T Varholak
Case #: 1:23-cv-00155
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 18, 2023
Terminated:Mar 10, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jul 17, 2023 2:33 AM MDT
Defendant
Fletcher's Medical Supplies, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher John Eby
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher White
Represented By
Todd M. Friedman
Law Offices Of Todd M. Friedman PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, March 10, 2023
12 12 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Terminate Motions Fri 03/10 2:50 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed in this case. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Fri 03/10 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Christopher White (Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/17 2:46 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AdaptHealth LLC for Fletcher's Medical Supplies, Inc.. (Eby, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Fri 02/17 2:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Fletcher's Medical Supplies, Inc.. (Eby, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Fri 02/17 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher John Eby on behalf of Fletcher's Medical Supplies, Inc.Attorney Christopher John Eby added to party Fletcher's Medical Supplies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Eby, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 01/23 10:51 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 23 January 2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/22/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2023 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
5 5 misc Summons Issued Fri 01/20 9:03 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (jcharl, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
misc Administrative Notice Fri 01/20 8:23 AM
Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (jcharl, )
Related: [-]
misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 01/20 8:53 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, )
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/20 9:17 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/20/2023. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
2 2 misc Summons Request Thu 01/19 11:59 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Fletcher's Medical Supply, Inc. re1 Complaint by Plaintiff White Christopher.(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/19 11:41 AM
COMPLAINT against Fletcher's Medical Supplies, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8890650)Attorney Todd M. Friedman added to party White Christopher(pty:pla), filed by White Christopher.(Friedman, Todd)
Related: [-]