New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Gary R Brown
Referred: Anne Y Shields
Case #: 2:23-cv-00373
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2023
Terminated:Feb 22, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2023 5:32 AM EDT
Defendant
WM. Bolthouse Farms, Inc.
Plaintiff
Gwendolyn Smith
Represented By
Jason P. Sultzer
The Sultzer Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 84 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/22 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gwendolyn Smith Without Prejudice (Sultzer, Jason)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/23 9:18 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Case closed as per5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (JC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 01/19 3:28 PM
Summons Issued as to WM. Bolthouse Farms, Inc. (CL)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Thu 01/19 3:26 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (CL)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Thu 01/19 3:22 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (CL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/19 1:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Wm. Bolthouse Farms, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-16322453 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Gwendolyn Smith. (Sultzer, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/19 3:26 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Gary R. Brown and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CL)
Related: [-]