Gilmore v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Barry A Bryant |
Case #: | 6:23-cv-06009 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Tue 10/24 11:47 AM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Attorney Fees, in favor of Shannon Gilmore against Social Security Administration Commissioner in the amount of $6832.50, pursuant to the EAJA, 28 U.S.C. § 2412. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on October 24, 2023. (tmc) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Response
Mon 10/16 2:32 PM
RESPONSE by Social Security Administration Commissioner re19 Memorandum Brief in Support,20 Affidavit,18 MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to the equal access to justice act . (Fischer, John) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Affidavit
Fri 10/06 3:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Shannon Muse Carroll filed by Shannon Gilmore re19 Memorandum Brief in Support,18 MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to the equal access to justice act . (Carroll, Shannon) |
|
19 | 19
msupport
Memorandum Brief in Support
Fri 10/06 3:36 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of18 MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to the equal access to justice act by Shannon Gilmore. (Carroll, Shannon) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Attorney Fees
Fri 10/06 3:34 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to the equal access to justice act by Shannon Gilmore.(Carroll, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit consumer price index | ||
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment - SSA
Mon 09/11 2:43 PM
JUDGMENT REVERSING THE DECISION OF THE COMMISSIONER AND REMANDING THIS CASE TO THE COMMISSIONER FOR FURTHER CONSIDERATION PURSUANT TO SENTENCE FOUR of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) as set forth in the16 Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on September 11, 2023. (tg) |
|
16 | 16
7
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Mon 09/11 2:40 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on September 11, 2023. (tg) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Govt)
Fri 07/07 9:18 AM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Fischer, John) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 06/01 11:34 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff Brief due by 7/10/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on June 1, 2023. (jlm) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 06/01 7:03 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Fischer, John) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/25 6:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Fischer on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Fischer, John) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Appeal Brief (Social Security-Plaintiff)
Wed 05/10 11:18 AM
APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Shannon Gilmore. (Carroll, Shannon) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Thu 04/13 8:05 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiffs brief shall befiled on or before May 17, 2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 13, 2023. (tmc) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/13 8:40 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/17/2023. (tmc) |
||
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 04/12 1:59 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Shannon Gilmore. (Carroll, Shannon) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Social Security Scheduling Order
Fri 03/17 8:42 AM
TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 4/17/2023. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on March 17, 2023. (mfj) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Social Security Transcript
Thu 03/16 3:00 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Taylor, Candace) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Consent/Reassignment - SSA
Fri 01/20 11:24 AM
CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Shannon Gilmore. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Carroll, Shannon) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Service
Fri 01/20 9:19 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Further, finding as moot3 Motion for Service. (no motion for service per Civil Rule 7.1). Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on January 20, 2023. (jlm) |
|
service
Affidavit of Service as to USA
Fri 01/20 9:22 AM
Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 1/19/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (jlm) |
||
Thursday, January 19, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice - SSA
Thu 01/19 2:39 PM
NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 2/2/2023.(jlm) |
|
Att: 1 Consent/Reassignment Form | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis Service
Thu 01/19 2:39 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Shannon Gilmore. (Carroll, Shannon) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 01/19 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Shannon Gilmore.(Carroll, Shannon) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 01/19 2:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Shannon Gilmore. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (jlm) |