Colorado District Court
Judge:Nina Y Wang
Case #: 1:23-cv-00171
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2023
Terminated:May 02, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:20 PM MDT
Defendant
Gallant Law Group, PC
Represented By
Scott E. Brenner
Thomas P. Howard LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shane Scofield
Represented By
Anthony I. Paronich
Paronich Law, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
25 25 utility Terminate Civil Case - PUBLIC Tue 05/02 2:09 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Minute Order 24 filed in this case on 5/2/2023. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
Related: [-]
24 24 order Minute Order Tue 05/02 1:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the23 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice, which is a self-effectuating stipulation of dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff's claims were dismissed with prejudice as of the filing of the Stipulation. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case accordingly. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 05/02/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Tue 05/02 11:48 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Shane Scofield. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
22 22 order Minute Order Mon 05/01 11:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the20 Notice of Settlement, the Court hereby vacates the May 9, 2023 scheduling conference and related deadlines. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/1/23. Text Only Entry (mehlc5)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Minute Order Mon 05/01 8:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the20 Notice of Settlement, the Parties shall file dismissal papers on or before 5/9/2023 . By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 05/01/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 04/25 6:08 PM
NOTICE of Settlement of all claims by Defendant Gallant Law Group, PC (Brenner, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
19 19 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/06 3:38 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6 April 2023. Pursuant to the parties' emailed request, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conferencecurrently set for April 25, 2023 is vacated and rescheduled for May 9, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. , in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
18 18 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 04/05 5:55 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Shane Scofield. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
17 17 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/29 7:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Brenner, Scott)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/29 7:23 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Gallant Law Group, PC.(Brenner, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond Fri 03/10 9:35 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 March 2023. For good cause shown, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time toAnswer13 is granted. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before March 29, 2023. Accordingly, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference currently set for March 22, 2023 is vacated and rescheduled for April 25, 2023 at 9:45 a.m., in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver,Colorado.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
14 14 order Memorandum Thu 03/09 8:14 AM
MEMORANDUM regarding13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint, filed by Gallant Law Group, PC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/09/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond Wed 03/08 9:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re1 Complaint, by Defendant Gallant Law Group, PC. (Brenner, Scott)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 03/08 4:17 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 03/08/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Letter Reassigning Case Wed 03/08 1:41 PM
CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to10 Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00171-NYW. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/08 1:35 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8 March 2023. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF9 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C.Colo.LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Wed 03/08 9:44 AM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Shane Scofield All parties do not consent.. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 02/07 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony I. Paronich on behalf of Shane Scofield (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
misc Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2 Thu 02/02 4:25 PM
ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Anthony I. Paronich failed to pay the 2022 Biennial Fee. Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a) and District Court General Order 2022-7, counsel was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll. Counsel must submit another bar application through PACER, pay the application fee, and file a Notice of Entry of Appearance to continue as counsel of record in this case. Please fully review the Attorney Admission page on the courts website for instructions on re-admission (http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/AttorneyInformation/AttorneyAdmissionInformation.aspx) before contacting the court for assistance. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
6 6 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Wed 01/25 2:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shane Scofield. Gallant Law Group, PC served on 1/25/2023, answer due 2/15/2023. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 11:44 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 January 2023. Consent Form due by 3/9/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/15/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Fri 01/20 9:45 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 01/20 9:44 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
2 2 misc Summons Request Thu 01/19 7:03 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to GALLANT LAW GROUP, PC re1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Shane Scofield. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/19 6:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Gallant Law Group, PC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8892043)Attorney Anthony I. Paronich added to party Shane Scofield(pty:pla), filed by Shane Scofield.(Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet