New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Referred: Victoria Reznik
Case #: 7:23-cv-00519
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2023
Terminated:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jul 20, 2023 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Community Housing Management Corp.
5 West Main Street Suite 214
Elmsford, NY 10523
Represented By
Bhavleen Kaur Sabharwal
Law Office Of Bhavleen Sabharwal, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Eugene Conroy
individually 5 West Main Street Apt. 214
Elmsford, NY 10523
Represented By
Bhavleen Kaur Sabharwal
Law Office Of Bhavleen Sabharwal, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jose Feliciano
as Superintendent of Madison House Apartments, 79 South Highland Avenue Apartment D-5
Ossining, NY 10562
Represented By
Jeffrey Yehuda Aria Spiegel
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp (water St)
contact info
Defendant
Madison House Apartments, LLC
908 Main Street Suite 300
Peekskill, NY 10566
Represented By
Courtney Patrice Fain
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Noah Hertz Bunzl
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Meredith Rosen Cavallaro
Paduano & Weintraub, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Madison Housing Development Fund Company, Inc.
901 Main Street Suite No. 300
Peekskill, NY 10566
Represented By
Courtney Patrice Fain
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Noah Hertz Bunzl
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Meredith Rosen Cavallaro
Paduano & Weintraub, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Cindy Mauro
as Director of Operations of Community Housing Management Corp., 5 West Main Street Apt. 214
Elmsford, NY 10523
Represented By
Bhavleen Kaur Sabharwal
Law Office Of Bhavleen Sabharwal, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Tejash Sanchala
on behalf of Aura Abreu Westchester County Fair Housing Board 112 East Post Road, 3rd Floor
White Plains, NY 10601
Represented By
Raymond S. Carroll
Brandon J. Broderick, LLC
contact info
Christopher Jude Inzero
Westchester County Dep'T Of Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, December 12, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Tue 01/07 3:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik: Settlement Conference held on 12/12/2024. Follow up conference held in Teams. Parties continued discussion and matter was resolved. (bal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
54 54 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/11 5:41 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eileen Nora Nadelson on behalf of Community Housing Management Corp...(Nadelson, Eileen)
Related: [-]