New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jil Mazer-Marino
Case #: 1:23-bk-40189
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2023
Creditor Meeting:Feb 23, 2023
Terminated:Jul 07, 2023

Debtor
Nutropia, Inc.
10502 Merrick Blvd
Jamaica, NY 11433-1706
Represented By
David Y Wolnerman
White & Wolnerman
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Debra Kramer
Debra Kramer, PLLC 10 Pantigo Road Suite 1
East Hampton, NY 11937
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn Office) U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Suite 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 01/23/2023 12:08 AM EST
Sunday, January 22, 2023
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Sun 01/22 12:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:1 23-40189 ) [misc,volp7a] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A21349283. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
misc Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 Business No Asset) (Auto Assign) Sun 01/22 12:00 PM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 Business & Appointment of Chapter 7 Trustee, Kramer, Debra, 341(a)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Sun 01/22 11:58 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $338 Filed by David Y Wolnerman on behalf of Nutropia, Inc. (Wolnerman, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Written Consent