New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael A Shipp
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:23-cv-00343
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2023
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Friday Jul 21, 2023 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS LLC
619 Alexander Rd. Suite 301
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
JAMES M. MCDONNELL
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
AMANDA E. MILLER
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
BERTIN LEFKOVIC
27 Lake St.
Jamesburg, NJ 08831
Represented By
DARYL J KIPNIS
Kipnis Law Offices
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
PUBLIC CONSULTING GROUP, INC.
Terminated: 05/08/2023
619 Alexander Rd. Suite 301
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
JAMES M. MCDONNELL
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
AMANDA E. MILLER
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Wed 02/19 5:39 PM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 4/21/2025. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/19/2025. (jab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 02/03 9:10 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Ex-Parte Telephone Conference held on 1/7/2025. (jem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
29 29 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 12/19 2:20 PM
TEXT ORDER: An Ex-Parte Telephone Conference with Plaintiff's Counsel only is set for 01/07/2024 at 2:00 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. Plaintiff's Counsel is directed to initiate the conference by calling 609-989-2040. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 1219/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
28 28 order Text Order Fri 11/15 2:40 PM
TEXT ORDER: Ex parte settlement discussions are ongoing. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/15/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
27 27 order Text Order Tue 09/24 2:55 PM
TEXT ORDER: Ex parte Settlement discussions continue. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/24/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 08/09 10:23 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: An Ex-Parte Telephone Conference with Plaintiff's Counsel held on 8/5/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
26 26 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 07/25 4:08 PM
TEXT ORDER: An Ex-Parte Telephone Conference with Plaintiff's Counsel only is set for 8/05/2024 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference on a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/25/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
25 25 misc Status Report Wed 07/17 9:54 AM
STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS LLC. (MILLER, AMANDA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 06/11 1:42 PM
Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert no longer assigned to case. (gxh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
24 24 order Discovery Confidentiality Order Wed 05/15 4:16 PM
Discovery Confidentiality Order filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/15/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Mon 05/20 1:21 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Telephone Conference held on 5/15/2024. A status update regarding discovery as well as whether ripe for a settlement conference will be submitted by 7/17/2024. The discovery schedule will thereafter be addressed. (jem)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
23 23 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 04/25 11:43 AM
TEXT ORDER: Status Conference via telephone is set for 5/15/2024 at 2:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the telephone conference at a later date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/25/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/19 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JACQUELINE MUZETTE PALAZZOLO on behalf of PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS LLC (PALAZZOLO, JACQUELINE)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Letter Fri 04/19 3:10 PM
Letter from Daryl J. Kipnis, Esq. in response to the Court's Text Order #20 in ECF re 20 Order,. (KIPNIS, DARYL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
20 20 order Order Wed 04/17 4:04 PM
TEXT ORDER: By 4/24/2024, Plaintiff is to explain why it has failed to comply with the Court's Order [See Docket Entry Nos. 18 &19 . Failure to participate in discovery and/or comply with the Court's Orders may result in dismissal with prejudice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 4/17/2024. (jem)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
19 19 misc Letter Mon 04/15 1:04 PM
Letter from Amanda E. Miller. (MILLER, AMANDA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
18 18 order Order Wed 02/07 5:49 PM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff must serve responses to Defendant's outstanding discovery requests as well as serve written discovery requests by 2/20/2024. Failure to do so may result in waiver. Plaintiff must also provide defense counsel with a revised settlement demand by 2/20/2024. Counsel must submit a joint status report to the court by 4/15/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/7/2024. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Tue 02/06 6:05 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/6/2024. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
17 17 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 02/05 3:41 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference has been rescheduled for 2/6/2024 at 12:00 PM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/5/2024. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 12/21 2:21 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 2/5/2024 at 10:00 AM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/21/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
minutes Telephone Conference Thu 12/21 1:14 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/21/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
15 15 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/19 10:40 AM
TEXT ORDER: Granting14 Letter request. Converting the Settlement Conference to a Telephone Status Conference on 12/21/2023 at 12:00 PM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/19/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
14 14 misc Letter Wed 12/13 9:16 AM
Letter from Amanda E. Miller. (MILLER, AMANDA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
13 13 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 10/19 12:16 PM
TEXT ORDER: Granting12 letter request. The Settlement Conference is adjourned to 12/21/2023 at 12:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6W before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Lead trial counsel and client(s) with full settlement authority are required to appear at any settlement conference conducted by the Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/19/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
12 12 misc Letter Wed 10/18 1:22 PM
Letter from Amanda Miller. (MILLER, AMANDA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2023
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 09/07 9:11 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 10/26/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join new parties, whether by amended or third party complaint, must be filed by 11/30/2023. Fact Discovery is to remain open through 4/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/6/2023. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 08/29 1:27 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/29/2023, via telephone. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
10 10 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 07/11 5:17 PM
TEXT ORDER: Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 8/29/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/11/2023. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/10 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES M. MCDONNELL on behalf of All Defendants (MCDONNELL, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 07/07 4:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PUBLIC CONSULTING GROUP, INC., PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS LLC. (MILLER, AMANDA)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 07/07 4:30 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by PUBLIC CONSULTING GROUP, INC., PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS LLC.(MILLER, AMANDA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 05/10 5:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BERTIN LEFKOVIC. PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS LLC waiver sent on 5/8/2023, answer due 7/7/2023. (KIPNIS, DARYL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/08 2:47 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS LLC, filed by BERTIN LEFKOVIC.(KIPNIS, DARYL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover Sheet
4 4 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Mon 05/08 9:45 AM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Motion set for 5/22/2023 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 01/23 12:23 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PUBLIC CONSULTING GROUP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 22, 2023
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 01/22 10:57 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against PUBLIC CONSULTING GROUP, INC., filed by BERTIN LEFKOVIC.(KIPNIS, DARYL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 01/22 10:52 PM
COMPLAINT against PUBLIC CONSULTING GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13974504) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BERTIN LEFKOVIC.(KIPNIS, DARYL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 01/23 12:21 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kht)
Related: [-]