Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 1:23-cv-20250
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2023
Terminated:Apr 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 22, 2023 5:37 AM EDT
Defendant
Colony Insurance Company
Represented By
Jordan Scott Kosches
Grayrobinson, P.A.
contact info
Jack Roy Reiter
Grayrobinson, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Kleinman S. Eric
Plaintiff
Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
William David Wilson
Mound Cotton Wollan , Greengrass
contact info
Perry Ross Goodman
Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass LLP
contact info
Wendy Jill Stein Fulton
Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass LLP
contact info
Brooke Oransky Turetzky
Mound Cotton Wollan & Greengrass LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
AIX Specialty Insurance Company
Terminated: 04/29/2023

GPO Jul 31 2023
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, 13 MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and to join required parties filed by Colony Insurance Company. Recommending that the Motion to Remand 16 be DENIED and the Motion to Dismiss 13 be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Objections to R&R due by 8/14/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 7/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (ama)
GPO Aug 18 2023
ORDER Adopting 39 Report and Recommendations on 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Colony Insurance Company and 16 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company; granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 16 Motion to Remand to State Court. Plaintiff must amend its complaint on or before August 25, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/18/2023. See attached document for full details. (rm04)

Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Friday, October 04, 2024
89 89 misc Stipulation Fri 10/04 5:22 PM
STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Goodman, Perry)
Related: [-]