Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-11141

Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert E Grant
Case #: 1:23-ap-01003
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Marc Alan Greene
5935 East 1000 S-92
Roanoke, IN 46783
Represented By
Marc Alan Greene
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristin Cripe
310 W Hillside Dr
Syracuse, IN 46567
Represented By
Adam Gregory Golden
Golden Law, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Friday, March 17, 2023
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sat 03/18 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 03/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Judgment
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
15 15 order Judgment Wed 03/15 2:33 PM
Order and Judgment Excepting Debt from Discharge Related [+]. (laf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kristin Cripe
Monday, March 13, 2023
14 14 court Alias Summons Issued Mon 03/13 10:20 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Marc Alan Greene Date Issued 3/13/2023, Answer Due 4/12/2023. (laf)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 11, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sun 03/12 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 03/11/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Friday, March 10, 2023
12 12 misc Proposed Order Fri 03/10 1:16 PM
Proposed Order Filed by Plaintiff Kristin Cripe Related [+] (Golden, Adam) Modified on 3/13/2023 (laf)
Related: [-] 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment filed by Kristin Cripe
11 11 motion Entry of Default Fri 03/10 1:15 PM
Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment with Attorney Affidavit Filed by Plaintiff Kristin Cripe (Golden, Adam) Modified on 3/13/2023 (laf)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 03/10 12:44 PM
Certificate of Service Amended Filed by Plaintiff Kristin Cripe Related [+] (Golden, Adam)
Related: [-] 3 Certificate of Service filed by Kristin Cripe
Thursday, March 09, 2023
9 9 order Entry of Default Thu 03/09 12:59 PM
Order Denying Motion for Default Judgment Related [+] (dlh)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
8 8 misc Proposed Order Tue 03/07 1:06 PM
Proposed Order Filed by Plaintiff Kristin Cripe Related [+] (Golden, Adam) Modified on 3/8/2023 (dlh)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Kristin Cripe
7 7 motion Entry of Default Tue 03/07 1:05 PM
Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment with Attached Attorney Affidavit Filed by Plaintiff Kristin Cripe (Golden, Adam) Modified on 3/8/2023 (dlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sat 03/04 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 03/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Marc Alan Greene
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 03/01 10:47 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Marc Alan Greene . (dlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
4 4 motion Entry of Default Tue 02/28 11:35 AM
Motion for Entry of Default with Declaration Filed by Plaintiff Kristin Cripe (Golden, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Thu 01/26 10:47 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kristin Cripe Related [+] (Golden, Adam)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Kristin Cripe
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 01/24 10:23 AM
Summons Issued on Marc Alan Greene Date Issued 1/24/2023, Answer Due 2/23/2023. (dlh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/23 11:43 AM
Adversary case 23-01003 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) Complaint by Kristin Cripe against Marc Alan Greene. Fee Amount $350. (Golden, Adam)
Related: [-]