Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Case #: 4:23-cv-00006
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2023
Terminated:Mar 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 22, 2023 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Anthony Barba
Represented By
W. Jeremy Salter
Salter & Toomey, LLC
contact info
Defendant
La Scala Mediterranean Bistro, LLC
Represented By
W. Jeremy Salter
Salter & Toomey, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lauren Kelley
Represented By
Mitchell Douglas Benjamin
Delong Caldwell Bridgers Fitzpatrick & Benjamin, LLC
contact info
Matthew Wilson Herrington
Delong Caldwell Bridgers Fitzpatrick & Benjamin, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
33 33 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Wed 05/08 9:01 AM
ORDER GRANTING Parties'32 JOINT Motion to approve Settlement agreement. The parties' settlement agreement is APPROVED. This case is ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a dismissal with prejudice within 30 days of final payment pursuant to the terms of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/7/24. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
32 32 motion For Settlement Thu 05/02 2:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Lauren Kelley.(Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A_Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/20 11:54 AM
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. The parties shall file a dismissal or other filing disposing of this case upon finalization of any necessary paperwork. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/20/24. (jpa)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 03/20 11:55 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
30 30 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 03/05 1:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson: Mediation held on 3/5/2024. Case settled. (klb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
29 29 6 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Tue 01/30 11:43 AM
ORDER scheduling Mediation. Mediation Hearing set for 3/5/2024 at 10:30 AM in ROME Courtroom 201 before Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. COUNSEL DIRECTED TO EMAIL THEIR CONFIDENTIAL MEDIATION STATEMENTS TO JUDGE JOHNSON'S CRD ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 28, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/30/24. (klb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
28 28 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Order Tue 01/30 10:03 AM
ORDER granting27 Motion to Stay proceedings in this case and for referral to a Magistrate Judge for a mediated settlement conference. Parties shall report the outcome of the mediation to the Court and shall submit a motion for settlement approval in the event of a mediated resolution. If the Parties fail to reach a settlement at mediation, discovery shall be reopened for 14 days to permit the Parties to complete the deposition of Defendant La Scala and to resolve any outstanding discovery disputes, and the deadline for filing dispositive motions shall be 30 days after the end of the extended discovery period. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/29/24. (jpa)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/30 10:05 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson for mediation. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
27 27 motion Stay For Order Wed 01/24 4:06 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Mediation by Lauren Kelley.(Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, January 22, 2024
26 26 discov Initial Disclosures Mon 01/22 7:13 PM
Initial Disclosures by Anthony Barba, La Scala Mediterranean Bistro, LLC.(Salter, W.)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 15, 2024
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Mon 01/15 11:14 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE and Certificate of Serving Discovery (Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures) by Lauren Kelley.(Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 01/12 11:07 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery ends on 1/29/2024. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/28/2024. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 1/11/24. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2023
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 12/29 11:42 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Lauren Kelley.(Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 11/29 2:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING the20 MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery process and post-discovery deadlines. The discovery period in the above-styled matter shall extend through and conclude on December 29, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the all post-discovery deadlines are extended thirty days from their original dates. Dispositive motions shall be due no later than Monday, January 29, 2024. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 11/29/23. (jpa)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Proposed Consent Order Wed 11/29 8:58 AM
PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Proposed Consent Order extending discovery period and all post-discovery deadlines for 30 days re:20 MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery process and post-discovery deadlines . (Salter, W.)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/29 8:56 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time Discovery process and post-discovery deadlines by Anthony Barba, La Scala Mediterranean Bistro, LLC. (Salter, W.)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 11/29 2:46 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery ends on 12/29/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2024. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
19 19 discov Certificate of Service Mon 11/27 4:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Certificate of Discovery Responses Related [+] by Anthony Barba, La Scala Mediterranean Bistro, LLC.(Salter, W.)
Related: [-] quest for Admission
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
18 18 notice Notice to Take Deposition Wed 11/22 9:19 AM
Amended NOTICE to Take Deposition of Anthony Barba filed by Lauren Kelley (Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
17 17 notice Notice to Take Deposition Tue 11/21 7:52 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Anthony Barba filed by Lauren Kelley (Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
16 16 discov Certificate of Service Tue 10/31 11:04 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE and Certificate of Serving Discovery (Plaintiff's first continuing discovery requests to Defendant La Scala) by Lauren Kelley.(Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2023
15 15 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/19 8:52 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re13 Status Report. The Court hereby ORDERS that the stay of discovery in this action shall be extended through and including August 28, 2023. Discovery shall recommence on August 29, 2023, and conclude on November 29, 2023. All relevant disclosure and post-discovery deadlines are modified accordingly. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 10/18/23. (jpa)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
14 14 misc Leave of Absence Mon 08/07 12:23 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 12.15.2023 -12.21.2023, by Matthew Wilson Herrington. (Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2023
13 13 misc Status Report Fri 07/28 5:25 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by Lauren Kelley.(Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, June 26, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 06/26 1:50 PM
ORDER GRANTING11 Motion to Stay through 7/31/2023. No later than 7/31/2023, the Parties shall file a status report informing the Court of the possibility of continuing with litigation or the basis for seeking a further stay. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/26/2023. (tas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 06/22 4:07 PM
Submission of11 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Action , to District Judge William M. Ray II. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
11 11 motion Stay Wed 06/21 9:56 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Action by Lauren Kelley.(Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/21 5:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:9 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court GRANTS the parties' request for six months of discovery. Discovery ends on 9/17/2023. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/17/2023. If none filed, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/17/2023. The Clerk is directed to submit this action on 10/18/2023, if the parties have not filed a Motion for Summary Judgment or Proposed Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 3/21/2023. (tas)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Tue 03/21 12:28 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Lauren Kelley. (Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/17 5:20 PM
DEFENDANTS' COMBINED ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint by Anthony Barba, La Scala Mediterranean Bistro, LLC. Discovery ends on 7/17/2023.(Salter, W.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
7 7 29 pgs order Order Wed 02/08 12:42 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 2/8/2023. (tas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/01 5:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lauren Kelley. (Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Wed 02/01 2:58 PM
Return of Service Executed by Lauren Kelley. Anthony Barba served on 1/31/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. (Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Wed 02/01 2:58 PM
Return of Service Executed by Lauren Kelley. La Scala Mediterranean Bistro, LLC served on 1/31/2023, answer due 2/21/2023. (Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/23 4:37 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Lauren Kelley.(Herrington, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 01/23 3:55 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Anthony Barba, La Scala Mediterranean Bistro, LLC.(jpa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Anthony Barba
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/23 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Lauren Kelley. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12337703)(jpa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet