The Simmons Manufacturing Co., LLC Jointly Administered under 23-90020.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-90020
Lead case is: 4:23-bk-90020
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:23-bk-90023 |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 07, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
trustee
Remark (batch)
Tue 10/17 12:31 PM
Remark: Case Reassigned from Judge Jones to Judge Lopez . (RobbieWestmoreland) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 09/07 10:13 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (VrianaPortillo) |
||
Friday, July 21, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly
Fri 07/21 5:25 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 6/30/2023, $208795322 disbursed (Filed By The Simmons Manufacturing Co., LLC ). (Morgan, Gabriel) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly
Wed 06/21 4:38 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 5/31/2023, $143299264 disbursed (Filed By The Simmons Manufacturing Co., LLC ). (Morgan, Gabriel) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly
Mon 05/22 6:33 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 4/30/2023, $405011425 disbursed (Filed By The Simmons Manufacturing Co., LLC ). (Morgan, Gabriel) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly
Fri 04/21 7:06 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 3/31/2023, $139528293 disbursed (Filed By The Simmons Manufacturing Co., LLC ). (Morgan, Gabriel) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly
Tue 03/21 11:20 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 2/28/2023, $125779226 disbursed (Filed By The Simmons Manufacturing Co., LLC ). (Morgan, Gabriel) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 01/27 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/27/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 01/26 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/26/2023. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists
Wed 01/25 6:00 AM
|
|
Tuesday, January 24, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
order
Joint Administration
Tue 01/24 11:04 AM
Order for Joint Administration under 23-90020 Signed on 1/24/2023 (AlbertAlonzo) |
|
utility
Remark (PUBLIC ENTRY)
Tue 01/24 11:05 AM
An order directing joint administration of this case has been entered by the Court in accordance with FED. R. BANKR. P. 1015(b). The docket in Case No. 23-90020 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. All future pleadings shall be filed in and all subsequent docket entries shall be made in the Lead Case. Interested parties are directed to the order directing joint administration for further information. (AlbertAlonzo) |
||
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
29
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event]
Mon 01/23 10:17 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by The Simmons Manufacturing Co., LLC. (Morgan, Gabriel) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 01/23 11:26 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-90023 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24158056. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |