Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Leonie M Brinkema
Referred: Ivan D Davis
Case #: 1:23-cv-00108
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 23, 2023 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043
Represented By
Martha Goodman
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Erica Spevack
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Sara Leann Salem
Freshfield Brukhaus Deringer Us Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Craig Crandall Reilly
Law Office Of Craig C. Reilly
contact info
Bradley Justus
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider, LLP
contact info
Koren Wong Ervin
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Lauren Kaplin
Freshfield Brukhaus Deringer Us Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Jeannie Rhee
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
David Rudolph Pearl
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Bryon Patrick Becker
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Scott Andrew Eisman
Freshfields Brukhaus Deringer Us Llp (ny-Na)
contact info
William Isaacson
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Meredith Dearborn
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (ca-Na)
contact info
Eric Johnson Mahr
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer LLP
contact info
Karen Leah Dunn
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Julie S Elmer
Freshfields Brukhaus Deringer Us Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Joseph Bial
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Claire Linda Leonard
Freshfield Brukhaus Deringer Us Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Amy Mauser
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison LLP
contact info
Daniel Shalom Bitton
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider Llp (ca-Na)
contact info
Tyler Garrett
Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer Us LLP
contact info
Andrew John Ewalt
Freshfield Brukhaus Deringer Us Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Erin J. Morgan
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison Llp (na-Ny)
contact info
Jeanette Bayoumi
Freshfields Brukhaus Deringer Us Llp (ny-Na)
contact info
Allison Vissichelli
Axinn, Veltrop & Harkrider Llp (dc-Na)
contact info
Movant
Comcast Corporation
Represented By
Michael William Kucharski
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (na)
contact info
Fiona Rose Moran
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Christopher Philip Lynch
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (na)
contact info
Arthur Joseph Burke
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (na)
contact info
Anna Maria Kozlowski
Davis Polk & Wardwell Llp (na)
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Gerard J. Mene
Doj-Usao
contact info
Kaitlyn Barry
Doj-Atr
contact info
Michael Joseph Freeman
Doj-Usao
contact info
Milosz Gudzowski
Doj-Atr
contact info
Jimmy S McBirney
Doj-Civ
contact info
Craig Louis Briskin
Doj-Atr
contact info
Aaron Teitelbaum
Doj-Atr
contact info
Katherine E Clemons
Doj-Atr
contact info
Jeffrey Grant Vernon
Doj-Atr
contact info
Kelly Dodge Garcia
Doj-Atr
contact info
Michael Wolin
Doj-Atr
contact info
Amanda Morrow Strick
Doj-Atr
contact info
Daniel S. Guarnera
Doj-Atr
contact info
David Michael Teslicko, Jr
U.S. Department Of Justice, Antitrust Division
contact info
Julia Tarver Mason Wood
Doj-Atr
contact info
Plaintiff
State of West Virginia
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Douglas Lee Davis
Office Of The West Virginia Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Washington
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amy Nicole Linscheid Hanson
Washington State Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Tyler Wesley Arnold
Washington State Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of North Carolina
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Jasmine Spring McGhee
North Carolina Department Of Justice (na)
contact info
Kunal Janak Choksi
North Carolina Department Of Justice (na)
contact info
Jonathan Richard Marx
North Carolina Department Of Justice
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New Hampshire
Represented By
Brandon Harris Garod
Office Of The New Hampshire Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
James Romeyn Davis
Office Of The New Hampshire Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Nebraska
Represented By
Joseph Marcus Conrad
Nebraska Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Colin Price Snider
Nebraska Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Minnesota
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Zachary William Biesanz
Minnesota Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Michigan
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Jason Robert Evans
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Scott A Mertens
Scott A. Mertens
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Illinois
Represented By
Jennifer Marie Coronel
Office Of The Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Elizabeth Louise Maxeiner
Office Of The Illinois Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Arizona
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Jayme Louise Weber
Arizona Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By
Kevin Michael Gallagher
Virginia Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Andrew N. Ferguson
Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Steven G. Popps
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Tennessee
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Corcoran
Office Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Andrew N. Ferguson
Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Scott Ethan Bowers
Office Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
John David McDowell
Office Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Rhode Island
150 South Main Street
Providence, RI 02903
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Leslie Lloyd Mullings Ocean
State Of Rhode Island, Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Andrew N. Ferguson
Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Nicholas Stephan Provazza
State Of Rhode Island, Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New York
28 Liberty Street 20th Floor
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Elinor Rose Hoffmann
New York State Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Andrew N. Ferguson
Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Morgan Jessen Feder
New York State Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of New Jersey
124 Halsey Street 5th Floor
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Yale Alexander Leber
New Jersey Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Andrew N. Ferguson
Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Connecticut
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Nicole Demers
States Of Connecticut, Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Andrew N. Ferguson
Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Colorado
1300 Broadway 7th Floor
Denver, CO 80203
Represented By
Steven Kaufmann
Colorado Department Of Law
contact info
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Jan Michael Zavislan
Colorado Department Of Law
contact info
Andrew N. Ferguson
Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Bryn Williams
Colorado Department Of Law
contact info
Bryn Anderson Williams
Colorado Department Of Law
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
State of California
455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Harrison, II
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Henry Hardy Cornillie
Office Of The California Attorney General
contact info
Brian Dingting Wang
Office Of The California Attorney General
contact info
Andrew N. Ferguson
Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Paula L. Blizzard
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Paula Lenore Blizzard
Office Of The California Attorney General
contact info
Carolyn Danielle Jeffries
Office Of The California Attorney General
contact info
Tyler Timothy Henry
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Lauren Jessica Pomeroy
State Of California Attorney General
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
1432 1432 misc Transcript Thu 05/08 9:48 AM
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/2/25 before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Court Reporter Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone No. 571-358-9539. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have thirty (30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after ninety (90) calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov . Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/9/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2025.(Montgomery, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
1431 1431 notice Notice (other) Mon 05/05 10:28 PM
NOTICE of Initial Proposal for Appropriate Remedies filed by Google LLC re1428 Order Related [+] Modified to correct docket entry on 5/7/2025 (Sbro, ).
Related: [-] illy, Craig
1430 1430 notice Notice (other) Mon 05/05 10:09 PM
NOTICE of Proposed Remedies by Commonwealth of Virginia, State of Arizona, State of California, State of Colorado, State of Connecticut, State of Illinois, State of Michigan, State of Minnesota, State of Nebraska, State of New Hampshire, State of New Jersey, State of New York, State of North Carolina, State of Rhode Island, State of Tennessee, State of Washington, State of West Virginia, United States of America (Wolin, Michael) Modified to correct docket entry on 5/7/2025 (Sbro, ).
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
1429 1429 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/02 1:59 PM
ORDER granting1427 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stan Michael Doerrer terminated for Sovrn Holdings, Inc. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/2/2025. (kgall)
Related: [-]
1428 1428 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/02 1:57 PM
ORDERED that1416 the Joint Proposal Regarding Adjudication of Equitable Remedies is adopted (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/2/2025. (kgall)
Related: [-]
1427 1427 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/02 1:00 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sovrn Holdings Inc..(Doerrer, Stan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1426 1426 minutes Evidentiary Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/02 11:27 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema: Evidentiary Hearing in re Equitable Distribution held on 5/2/2025. Appearances of counsel. Argument Heard. Comments of the Court. Court adopts proposed schedule. Remedies Trial set for 9/22/2025 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (Court Reporter R.Montgomery)(kgall)
Related: [-]