Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Gina R Mendez-Miro
Case #: 3:23-cv-01034
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 23, 2023 5:52 AM AST
Defendant
Benworth Capital Partners LLC
700 Biltmore Way Suite C1
Coral Gables, FL 33134
Represented By
Rasheed K. Nader
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton
contact info
Jorge L. Piedra
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton
contact info
Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Ferraiuoli, LLC
contact info
Corali Lopez-Castro
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton
contact info
Michael Robert Lorigas, I
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton LLP
contact info
Monica Del Pilar Ramos-Benitez
Ferraiuoli LLC
contact info
Jaime A. Torrens-Davila
Ferraiuoli LLC
contact info
Defendant
Benworth Capital Partners PR LLC
405 Esmeralda Ave. PMB 146
Guaynabo, PR 00969
Represented By
Carla S. Loubriel
contact info
Ricardo F. Casellas
Casellas Alcover & Burgos, P.S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Bernardo Navarro
954 Ponce de Leon Ave. Suite 205 - PMB 10319
San Juan, PR 00907
Represented By
Rasheed K. Nader
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton
contact info
Jorge L. Piedra
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton
contact info
Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Ferraiuoli, LLC
contact info
Corali Lopez-Castro
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton
contact info
Michael Robert Lorigas, I
Kozyak Tropin & Throckmorton LLP
contact info
Monica Del Pilar Ramos-Benitez
Ferraiuoli LLC
contact info
Jaime A. Torrens-Davila
Ferraiuoli LLC
contact info
Defendant
Claudia Navarro
954 Ave Ponce de Leon
Suite 205 - PMB 10319, PR 00907
Represented By
Carla S. Loubriel
contact info
Plaintiff
Oto Analytics, LLC
Represented By
Gabriela A. Perez-Velez
Mcconnell Valdes LLC
contact info
Alexander Leonard Cheney
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz
Mcconnell Valdes, LLC
contact info
Joshua Seth Levy
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Stuart Roth Lombardi
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info

GPO Oct 12 2023
OPINION AND ORDER re 34 Motion to Dismiss or Stay Proceedings Pending the Outcome of Arbitration. See attached. The Court DENIES co-Defendant's request to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and GRANTS the request to stay pending arbitration. Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 10/12/2023. (GMN)
GPO Jul 29 2024
ORDER granting 127 Motion to Intervene under Fed. R. Civ. P. 24. Movant Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco (Reserve Bank) satisfies the requirements of intervention under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 24. Moreover, neither Plaintiff nor Defendants oppose Reserve Banks petition to intervene in these proceedings. See (Docket Nos. 140; 141). Reserve Bank's Complaint due by 8/5/2024. Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 7/29/2024. (AJO)
GPO Apr 02 2025
OPINION AND ORDER denying 169 Defendant Benworth Capital Partners, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Federal Reserve's Complaint and Complaint in Intervention. See attached. Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 4/2/2025. (GMN)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
241 241 order Order Tue 05/06 10:32 AM
ORDER noting240 Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 5/6/2025.(GMN)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
240 240 misc Status Report Mon 05/05 8:08 PM
STATUS REPORT by Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. (Fernandez-Barrera, Ubaldo)
Related: [-]
239 239 order Order on Motion to Compel Mon 05/05 2:14 PM
ORDER holding in abeyance238 Motion to Enforce Order at ECF No. 224 Granting Plaintiff-Intervenor Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco's Motion to Compel Benworth's Quickbooks Accounting Data. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff-Intervenors motion on or before May 19, 2025. Signed by Judge Gina R. Mendez-Miro on 5/5/2025. (GMN)
Related: [-]
238 238 motion Compel Mon 05/05 12:27 PM
MOTION to Compel MOTION TO ENFORCE ORDER AT ECF NO. 224 GRANTING PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR FEDERAL RESERVE BANK OF SAN FRANCISCOS MOTION TO COMPEL BENWORTHS QUICKBOOKS ACCOUNTING DATA filed by Antonio L. Roig-Lorenzo on behalf of Federal Reserve Bank of San Francisco. Responses due by 5/19/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Roig-Lorenzo, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit