Barnett et al v. Raoul et al
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen P Mcglynn |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00209 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Jan 24, 2023 |
Case in other court: | 23-01825 Harrel et al v. Raoul et al, 3:23-cv-00141-SPM |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 23, 2023 3:47 AM CDT |
Amicus
Illinois Sheriffs Association
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Second Amendment Law Center
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Everytown for Gun Safety
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brendan F. Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kwame Raoul
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patrick D. Kenneally
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Watson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeremy Walker
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Gomric
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robb Tadelman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cole Price Shaner
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jarrod Peters
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jay Robert Pritzker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marengo Guns, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Illinois State Rifle Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Piasa Armory
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Second Amendment Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jasmine Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hoods Guns & More
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy W. Langley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy B. Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caleb Barnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dane Harrel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Guns Save Life
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gun Owners of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gun Owners Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Federal Firearms Licensees of Illinois
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
C4 Gun Store, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pro Gun and Indoor Range
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Norman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
181 | 181
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Fri 04/26 7:59 AM
ORDER:180 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is GRANTED . Attorney Mariel A. Brookins terminated as counsel of record for the Barnett Plaintiffs. The Barnett Plaintiffs will continue to be represented by Attorneys Paul D. Clement, Erin E. Murphy, Matthew D. Rowen, Nicholas Gallagher, Gary C. Pinter, Andrew Lothson, and James B. Vogts. Signed by Judge Stephen P. McGlynn on 4/26/2024. (trf) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
180 | 180
3
pgs
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 04/25 3:59 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by National Shooting Sports Foundation, Inc.. (Brookins, Mariel) |