Oregon District Court
Judge:Adrienne Nelson
Case #: 3:23-cv-00118
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 23, 2023 2:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Portland Terminal Railroad Company
an Oregon Corporation 3500 NW Yeon Avenue
Portland, OR 97210
Represented By
Elizabeth A. Falcone
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
William H. Walsh
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Rachel Elizabeth Timmins
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Defendant
Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By
Karl Neumann
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
William H. Walsh
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Plaintiff
Terry Brown
2426 NE 27th Ave.
Portland, OR 97212
Represented By
Paul S. Bovarnick
Rose, Senders & Bovarnick, LLP
contact info
Kathryn Averwater
Casey Jones Law
contact info
Emma Lerner Freeman
Apollo Law LLC
contact info
Jennifer Lee
Casey Jones Law
contact info
Nicholas Thompson
Casey Jones Law LLC
contact info
Adam W. Hansen
Apollo Law LLC
contact info

GPO Nov 21 2023
Opinion and Order: Accordingly, defendant Union Pacific's Motion to Compel Arbitration, ECF 22, is GRANTED and defendant PTRC's Motion for Joinder, ECF 33, is DENIED. Signed on 11/21/2023 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (mja)

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
43 43 notice Attorney Substitution Tue 02/27 2:04 PM
Notice of Attorney Substitution: Florence Z. Mao is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Rachel Elizabeth Timmins . Filed by on behalf of Portland Terminal Railroad Company. (Mao, Florence)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
order Order on Motion for Stay Fri 02/09 8:45 PM
ORDER: Defendant Portland Terminal Railroad Company's Motion for Stay, ECF41 , is GRANTED. This case is STAYED pending resolution of plaintiff's arbitration proceeding with defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Additionally, the parties are ordered to submit a joint status report within thirty (30) days of resolution of the arbitration proceedings. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
41 41 motion Stay Thu 01/18 2:11 PM
Motion for Stay . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Portland Terminal Railroad Company. (Falcone, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
40 40 16 pgs order Opinion and Order Tue 11/21 12:05 PM
Opinion and Order: Accordingly, defendant Union Pacific's Motion to Compel Arbitration, ECF22 , is GRANTED and defendant PTRC's Motion for Joinder, ECF33 , is DENIED. Signed on 11/21/2023 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (mja)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
39 39 resp Sur-Reply to Motion Tue 11/14 5:36 PM
Sur-Reply in Opposition to Portland Terminal's Notice of Joinder in Union Pacific's Motion to Compel Arbitration . Filed by Terry Brown. (Thompson, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
order 1 - Scheduling Thu 11/02 4:41 PM
ORDER: In light of the new arguments raised in Portland Terminal Railroad Company's Reply, ECF37 , the Court orders plaintiff to submit a sur-reply, addressing only Portland Terminal's third-party beneficiary and agency theory arguments, by November 14, 2023. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
37 37 oth_ans Reply Tue 10/31 12:24 PM
Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Opposition to Joinder in Union Pacific's Motion to Compel Arbitration Related [+] Filed by Portland Terminal Railroad Company. (Timmins, Rachel)
Related: [-] Brief35 .
Thursday, October 19, 2023
order 1 - Scheduling Thu 10/19 10:32 AM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant Portland Terminal Company's Notice of Joinder, ECF33 , and construes it as a Motion for Joinder in Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion to Compel Arbitration, ECF22 . The Court orders Portland Terminal to submit a reply, if any, to plaintiff's Opposition to Portland Terminal's Notice of Joinder, ECF35 , addressing only plaintiff's contract formation arguments, by November 1, 2023. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
35 35 oth_sup Brief Fri 07/21 2:30 PM
Brief in Opposition to Portland Terminal's Notice of Joinder . Filed by Terry Brown. Related [+] (Freeman, Emma)
Related: [-] Joinder Notice33 .
Friday, July 14, 2023
34 34 resp Reply to Motion Fri 07/14 1:23 PM
Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration 22 N/a requested. Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Walsh, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
33 33 notice Joinder Notice Thu 07/13 1:03 PM
Notice of Joinder in Motion to Compel22 Filed by Portland Terminal Railroad Company. Related [+] (Falcone, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] Motion to Compel22 .
Friday, June 30, 2023
32 32 30+ pgs resp Memorandum in Opposition Fri 06/30 9:48 AM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration 22 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Freeman, Emma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
30 30 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/15 7:05 AM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Adam W. Hansen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8979880. Filed by Terry Brown. (Hansen, Adam)
Related: [-]
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 06/15 9:44 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Adam W. Hansen. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-897988030 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
Related: [-]
order Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/15 1:36 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 30 ; Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 29 . Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
29 29 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/14 8:03 AM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Emma Lerner Freeman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8977956. Filed by Terry Brown. (Freeman, Emma)
Related: [-]
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 06/14 3:17 PM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Emma Lerner Freeman. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-897795629 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 06/12 12:14 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, ECF27 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company's Motion to Compel Arbitration is now due June 30, 2023. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
27 27 motion Extension of Time Thu 06/08 2:41 PM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant Union Pacific Mtn to Compel Arb . Filed by Terry Brown. (Bovarnick, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Document Declaration of Paul S. Bovarnick
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
26 26 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 06/07 4:01 PM
Answer to21 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint . Filed by Portland Terminal Railroad Company. (Falcone, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 06/06 9:15 AM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jennifer Lee. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-896489624 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
Related: [-]
order Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/06 10:48 AM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 24 . Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
24 24 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/05 4:28 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Jennifer Lee. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8964896. Filed by Terry Brown. (Lee, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
23 23 oth_sup Declaration Fri 06/02 4:23 PM
Declaration of Trevor Kingston In Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration . Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. Related [+] (Walsh, William)
Related: [-] Motion to Compel22 .
22 22 motion Compel Fri 06/02 4:21 PM
Motion to Compel Arbitration . Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Walsh, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES) Wed 05/24 7:49 AM
First Amended Complaint . Filed by Terry Brown against Terry Brown. (Bovarnick, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
order Order on Motion for Leave to File AmendedComplaint/Petition Mon 05/22 2:55 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, ECF18 , is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
19 19 oth_sup Declaration Thu 05/18 5:49 AM
Declaration of Paul S. Bovarnick in Support of Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . Filed by Terry Brown. Related [+] (Bovarnick, Paul)
Related: [-] Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition18 .
18 18 motion Amend Complaint/Petition Thu 05/18 5:46 AM
Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint . Filed by Terry Brown. (Bovarnick, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment First Amended Complaint
Monday, March 13, 2023
17 17 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/13 11:48 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Portland Terminal Railroad Company. (Falcone, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
16 16 service Summons/Service Return (All Types) Mon 03/13 10:24 AM
Return of Service Executed as to Portland Terminal Railroad Company and Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 2/7/2023, answer due on 2/28/2023. (sb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/07 3:36 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Portland Terminal Railroad Company. (Falcone, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Attorney Substitution Tue 03/07 12:08 PM
Notice of Attorney Substitution: Elizabeth A. Falcone is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Karl Neumann and William H. Walsh . Filed by on behalf of Portland Terminal Railroad Company. (Falcone, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/06 3:18 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Walsh, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT Mon 02/27 3:22 PM
Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael W. Mosman to Judge Adrienne C. Nelson. (eo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
11 11 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/10 10:51 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Walsh, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 02/08 4:32 PM
Notice of Appearance of William H. Walsh appearing on behalf of Portland Terminal Railroad Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company . Filed by on behalf of Portland Terminal Railroad Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Walsh, William)
Related: [-]
8 8 refund Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Wed 02/08 3:01 PM
Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 4 . Filed by Terry Brown. (Bovarnick, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt,
Att: 2 Notice of Duplicate Payment
oth_evt Refund Request Due Wed 02/08 4:41 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
6 6 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/31 2:27 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kathryn Averwater. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8804246. Filed by Terry Brown. (Averwater, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Service
5 5 motion Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/31 1:58 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Nicholas Thompson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8804123. Filed by Terry Brown. (Thompson, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Service
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 01/31 2:43 PM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Nicholas Thompson. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-88041235 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
Related: [-]
attyadm Clerk's Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 01/31 2:44 PM
Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Kathryn Averwater. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-88042466 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp)
Related: [-]
order Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/31 2:53 PM
ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice 5 and6 . Attorney Nicholas Thompson and Kathryn Averwater added. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 01/26 10:26 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Portland Terminal Railroad Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Refund Request Due Thu 01/26 10:49 AM
A duplicate payment in the amount of $402.00 was submitted by Terry Brown in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit[LINK:Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees] on the Court's website. Refund Request is Due 2/6/2023. (nd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Wed 01/25 4:11 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 5/25/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/26/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 6/26/2023. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (sb)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 01/25 11:55 AM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8797331 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Terry Brown against All Defendants. (Bovarnick, Paul) (PDFs of attachments 1, 2, and 3 replaced on 1/25/2023. Documents were not complete or were not flattened.) (eo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons