Chancey v. BASF
Original Case: 3:22-cv-00034
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:23-cr-40032 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Jan 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Oct 15, 2023 5:15 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
BASF
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Brian Chancey
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Oct 10 2023
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [23-40032 Affirmed] Judge: CDK, Judge: DRW, Judge: DMD. Mandate issue date is 11/01/2023 [23-40032] |
Docket last updated: 10/15/2023 5:15 AM CDT |
Monday, January 23, 2023 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Brian Chancey 23-40032 (CCR) |