Original Case: 2:17-cv-07020

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-00107
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2023
Terminated:Mar 03, 2023
Last checked: Monday Mar 06, 2023 3:35 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
Royal Sovereign International, Inc.
Represented By
James Thomas Whalen
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Royal Centurian Inc.
Represented By
James Thomas Whalen
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RS Ningbo, Inc.
Represented By
RS Ningbo, Inc.
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Royal Sovereign Qingdao, AKA RS Qingdao
Represented By
Royal Sovereign Qingdao
-
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BJ's Wholesale Club, Inc.
Represented By
Juliann O'Meara
Coffey Modica O'Meara Capowski LLP
contact info
Joseph Daniel Velez
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Christopher A. McLaughlin
Litchfield Cavo, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ADT LLC
Represented By
Robert E. O'Connor
O'Connor, O'Connor, Hintz & Deveny
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Defenders, Inc., DBA Protect Your Home
Represented By
Robert E. O'Connor
O'Connor, O'Connor, Hintz & Deveny
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Taishan City Kexinte Motor Products Co., LTD.
Represented By
Kerry James Kaltenbach
Zhong Lun New York LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Thomas Sidik, as Administrator of the Estate of Kristen A. Sidik, deceased, as Parent and Natural Guardian of K.S., an Infant, as Parent and Natural Guardian of C.S., an Infant, Individually
Represented By
Nancy Marie McGee
Wisell & McGee, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/06/2023 3:31 AM EST
Monday, January 23, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Thomas Sidik, FILED. [3458791] [23-107] [Entered: 01/25/2023 03:56 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 43 pgs Case FILED
2 2 19 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 12/28/2022, RECEIVED.[3458814] [23-107] [Entered: 01/25/2023 04:04 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Thomas Sidik, district court receipt # ANYEDC-16334103, FILED.[3458817] [23-107] [Entered: 01/25/2023 04:05 PM]
Related: [-]