Utah District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00006
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jan 27, 2023 12:18 AM MST
Defendant
Tadashi Kura Kojima (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Carol A. Dain
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/27/2023 1:38 AM MST
Friday, December 30, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Aaron Michael Zeman (1). Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. (alf) [2:22-mj-00905-DBP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
Arrest of Aaron Michael Zeman in Nebraska. (alf) [2:22-mj-00905-DBP]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2023
3 3 Rule 5/5.1 Documents Received - File consists of: Hearing Documents District of Nebraska as to Aaron Michael Zeman(alf) [2:22-mj-00905-DBP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Order,
Att: 2 Motion for Writ,
Att: 3 Writ,
Att: 4 Order Appointing Counsel,
Att: 5 Waiver Rule 5,
Att: 6 Rule 5 Order,
Att: 7 Commitment to Another District,
Att: 8 Slip Sheet Sealed Doc
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
5 5 INDICTMENT as to Tadashi Kura Kojima (1) count(s) 1, 2. Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. (dle)
Related: [-]