Washington Western District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00011
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jan 26, 2023 11:49 PM PST
Defendant
Munir Walji (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Laura Harmon
Us Attorney'S Office (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 3:37 AM PDT
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Munir Walji (1) counts 1, 2. (AQ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Status Sheet
2 2 SEALED Signature Page to1 Indictment as to Munir Walji. (AQ)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs PRAECIPE FOR A SUMMONS by USA as to Munir Walji. Arraignment set for 2/2/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12B before Hon. Paula L McCandlis. (AQ)
Related: [-]