Nicholas Allen et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-04693 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 26, 2023 4:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Savannah Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Allen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gene Walters, Jeanette Walters, Curt Wasserman, Shannon Wasserman, Ronald K Dancy, Dexter A Dobson, Regina Dobson, Anthony Pulli, Mary Pulli, James Tucker, Marianne Tucker, Dawn Platek, Eric Platek, Alfred Valdez, Robyn Valdez, Nicholas Allen, Savannah Allen, Jennifer Sutton, Michael Sutton, Jackie Moon, Keishaun Moon, Joseph Canfill, Patrick Williams, Jana L Joyner, Phillip J Joyner, Bruce Cavallari, Patrick Grimes, Ernest Harris, Jessica Richardson, Roger Richardson, Edward Weller, Kelly Diane Weller, Brian Wade, Genevelyn Wade, Roderick Nelson, Paul Mears, Rebecca Mears, Shane York Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Vasquez, James) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nicholas Allen re1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued, 3 MDL Member Case Opened (Vasquez, James) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 12/28/2022), Nicholas Allen et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-04693-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern Mississippi (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 01/27 3:56 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 12/28/2022), Nicholas Allen et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-04693-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern Mississippi (sshe, ) |
||
Wednesday, December 28, 2022 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10866586.), filed by Nicholas Allen, Savannah Allen. Service due by 3/28/2023(sshe, ) |