Original Case: 2:20-cv-00509

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-35060
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2023
Terminated:Nov 30, 2023
Last checked: Friday Dec 01, 2023 5:53 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID ALAN JOHNSON, AKA ADJ
Represented By
Jeremy E. Roller
Arete Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LEAH FISHBAUGH
Represented By
Jeremy E. Roller
Arete Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICKEY MEEHAM
Represented By
Jeremy E. Roller
Arete Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NATHAN SULLIVAN
Represented By
Jeremy E. Roller
Arete Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
UNITED FEDERATION OF CHURCHES LLC, DBA The Satanic Temple
Represented By
Matt Kezhaya
Crown Law
contact info
Benjamin Justus
Lybeck Pedreira & Justus, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/01/2023 5:51 AM PST
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant United Federation of Churches LLC Mediation Questionnaire due on 02/01/2023. Appellant United Federation of Churches LLC opening brief due 03/27/2023. Appellees Leah Fishbaugh, David Alan Johnson, Mickey Meeham and Nathan Sullivan answering brief due 04/26/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12638676] (JBS) [Entered: 01/25/2023 03:19 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 1 pgs Mediation Letter
Att: 4 22 pgs Case Opening Packet