New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Case #: 1:14-cv-05776
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:203 Equal Pay Act
Case Filed:Oct 02, 2014
Terminated:Nov 07, 2014
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 5:02 PM EDT
Defendant
A. Stein Meat Products, Inc.
Defendant
Staci Blank
Defendant
Alan Buxbaum
Defendant
Mora Karen
Defendant
Howard Mora
Plaintiff
Donna Johnson
Represented By
Ronnie L. Silverberg
The Harman Firm, P.C.
contact info
Walker G. Harman, Jr.
The Harman Firm P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 10, 2014
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12/10 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Donna Johnson WITH PREJUDICE (Harman, Walker)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 05, 2014
6 6 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 12/05 12:39 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Donna Johnson. (Harman, Walker)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Fri 12/05 1:05 PM
ORDER granting6 joint letter request. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents provided such documents are submitted by 12/18/2014. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/5/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 07, 2014
5 5 Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Donna Johnson. (Harman, Walker)
Related: [-]
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court having been advised that this matter has settled, the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 30 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents provided such documents are submitted within this period. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/7/2014. (Cogan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 07, 2014
4 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 11/18/2014 at 10:30 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR CONFERENCE . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/7/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 03, 2014
3 3 Summons Issued as to A. Stein Meat Products, Inc., Staci Blank, Alan Buxbaum, Mora Karen, Howard Mora. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
2 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. The following corrections were made: None. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 02, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7240681 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Donna Johnson. (Silverberg, Ronnie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Corporate,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Buxbaum,
Att: 4 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons Blank,
Att: 5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons H Mora,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons K Mora