Haughton v. Colbran et al
Hawaii District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie E Kobayashi |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00045 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Review Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 28, 2023 1:37 AM HST |
Defendant
Registrar Nicola Colbran
|
|
Defendant
John Shanahan
|
|
Defendant
Retired Justice Richard White
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter Scott Haughton
|
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM HST |
Thursday, June 08, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
![]() CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on ECF Nos.23 ,25 and26 on 6/8/2023. (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Peter Scott Haughton shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
![]() EO: COURT ORDER CLARIFYING THE ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND TO DISMISS COMPLAINT ... the Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to enter judgment and close this case on June 8, 2023 , unless Plaintiff files a timely motion for reconsideration of this entering order. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(afe) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFF'S CORRECT REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMNET AND TO DISMISS COMPLAINT re23 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 5/18/2023. (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Peter Scott Haughton shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on May 19, 2023. Additionally, the order shall be served by email to Mr. Haughton at trophytruck100@gmail.com on May 18, 2023. |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
24 | 24 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 23-00045 LEK-RT on all further pleadings . (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Peter Scott Haughton shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on April 6, 2023. Additionally, a Notice of Reassignment shall be served by email to Mr. Haughton at trophytruck100@gmail.com on April 5, 2023. | |
23 | 23
![]() FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY PLAINTIFF'S CORRECTED REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND TO DISMISS COMPLAINT re17 ,18 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 4/5/2023. Based on the foregoing, the Court FINDS that the Corrected Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. 18 ) is the operative motion and that the Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. 17 ) should be disregarded. The Court RECOMMENDS that the Corrected Motion for Default Judgment be DENIED. The Court FINDS that venue is improper but DOES NOT RECOMMEND that the district Court dismiss this action based on venue. However, should the district court permit leave to amend the Amended Complaint, this Court RECOMMENDS that the district court direct Plaintiff to address and respond to the issue of venue. The Court also FINDS that it lacks subject matter jurisdiction and RECOMMENDS that the Amended Complaint be dismissed without prejudice and without leave to amend. The telephonic hearing on the Corrected Motion scheduled for May 4, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED. Due to the lack of full consent of the parties pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), the Clerk of the Court is directed to REASSIGN this case to a district judge. IT IS SO FOUND AND RECOMMENDED. (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Peter Scott Haughton shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on April 6, 2023. Additionally, the F&R shall be served by email to Mr. Haughton at trophytruck100@gmail.com on April 5, 2023. |
|
notice
Notice of Case Reassignment
Wed 04/05 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 23-00045 LEK-RT on all further pleadings . (eta) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Peter Scott Haughton shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Letter to Plaintiff Peter Haughton from Josephine Hampton, Senior Lawyer, Australian Government Solicitor, on behalf of Defendants Nicola Colbran and retired Justice Richard White, dated April 3, 2023. (eta) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Mail Returned by USPS, re: 20 Entering Order. Mail re-sent to Peter Scott Haughton at 624 Brodie Road, Huntfield Heights, South Australia 5163. (jni) Modified on 3/22/2023 (jni) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
minutes
1 - Terminate Hearings 2 - Set Hearings
Mon 03/20 11:32 AM
EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2023 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER is CONTINUED to 6/21/2023 at 08:45AM . Scheduling conference statements must be filed by 6/14/2023. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864 (toll-free). Meeting ID: 161 5641 6035. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Corrected REQUEST for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55b(1) Federal Rule of Civil Procedure - by Plaintiff Peter Scott Haughton(eta) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
minutes
2 - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R)
Thu 03/16 11:33 AM
EO:18 Corrected REQUEST for Default Judgment,17 REQUEST for Default Judgment - Telephonic Motion Hearing is set for 5/4/2023 at 11:00 AM (HST) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864 (toll-free). Meeting ID: 161 5641 6035. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa) COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF) |
||
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() REQUEST for Default Judgment Pursuant to Rule 55b of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure - by Plaintiff Peter Scott Haughton(eta) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, March 03, 2023 | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 03/03 5:12 PM
(Text Entry Only/No pdf attached) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to John Shanahan re15 - by /s/ Pam Hartman Beyer, Clerk by /s/EA, Deputy Clerk on 3/3/2023. (eta) |
||
misc
Court's Certificate of Service
Fri 03/03 5:16 PM
COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 16 Clerk's Entry of Default has been served by email to Peter Haugton at trophytruck100@gmail.com on March 3, 2023. (eta) |
||
Thursday, March 02, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Request for Clerk's Certificate of Entry of Default - by Peter Scott Haughton.(eta) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Scott Haughton. Nicola Colbran served on 2/28/2023. (eta) |
|
13 | 13
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Scott Haughton. Richard White served on 2/28/2023. (eta) |
|
12 | 12
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Scott Haughton. John Shanahan served on 2/28/2023. (eta) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT for a Civil Case; Jury Trial Requested against All Defendants - filed by Peter Scott Haughton.(eta) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Summons Issued as to John Shanahan. (eta) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Summons Issued as to Richard White. (eta) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Summons Issued as to Nicola Colbran. (eta) |
|
Monday, January 30, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Filing fee: $ 402 , Pay.gov Tracking ID: 273KTO9N re1 Complaint. (eta) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Peter Scott Haughton. (eta) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. FILING INSTRUCTIONS ARE ATTACHED. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. (eta) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/3/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 1/26/2023. (eta) |
|
3 | 3
![]() DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 1/26/2023. (eta) |
|
2 | 2
![]() (Proposed) Summons to Nicola Colbran re1 Complaint - filed by Peter Scott Haughton.(eta) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT for a Civil Case; Jury Trial Requested against All Defendants - filed by Peter Scott Haughton.(eta) |