TRL SPE 2 LLC v. Littleton Group Eastern Division Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | David C Godbey |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00218 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 07, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 28, 2023 4:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Great Lakes Insurance SE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mitch Shaver
|
|
Defendant
David Becerra Ins Agency
|
|
Defendant
Littleton Group Eastern Division Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
TRL SPE 2 LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago |
Tuesday, January 07, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Dismissal of party Littleton Group Eastern Division Inc filed by TRL SPE 2 LLC (Pickett, Les) Modified text on 1/7/2025 (ndt) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Tue 01/07 5:18 PM
Civil Case Terminated per16 and chambers instructions. |
||
Tuesday, October 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Pickett, Les) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Settlement filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE (Pickett, Les) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by TRL SPE 2 LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Welsh, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Thursday, May 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derick W Lancaster on behalf of Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lancaster, Derick) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Kauffman, James (Jake)) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by TRL SPE 2 LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Welsh, Christopher) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of DISCOVERY filed by TRL SPE 2 LLC (Welsh, Christopher) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TRL SPE 2 LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Welsh, Christopher) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on 2/3/2025 before Chief District Judge David C Godbey. The setting is for a one week docket. Reset or continuance of the trial setting does not alter the deadlines in this Order unless expressly provided by court order. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 5/12/2023) (ykp) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() STATUS REPORT filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Kauffman, James (Jake)) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 4/24/2023) (twd) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Kauffman, James (Jake)) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James (Jake) B Kauffman for McKenzie L. Brown on behalf of Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Kauffman, James (Jake)) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (Filing fee $402; receipt number ATXNDC-13476802) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Kauffman, James (Jake)) Modified filer per document1 and per Attorney on 1/27/2023 (sxf) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 01/30 9:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Lakes Insurance SE. (See document 1 -5 for image) (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (mms) |