Colorado District Court
Judge:Daniel D Domenico
Referred: Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:23-cv-00252
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2023
Terminated:Apr 17, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jul 28, 2023 7:04 AM MDT
Defendant
Mitchell Burgess
Represented By
Thomas Gerard Pasternak
Akerman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Burgess Pipeline Services LLC
Represented By
Thomas Gerard Pasternak
Akerman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pipeline Conditioning, LLC
Represented By
Michael G. Strapp
Dla Piper Us LLP
contact info
Melissa Lawson Romero
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Kathryn A. Reilly
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
48 48 motion Strike Wed 01/22 10:42 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Strike 46 Reply by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC.(Strapp, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
47 47 motion Leave to Restrict Tue 01/21 1:54 PM
MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC.(Strapp, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Monday, January 13, 2025
46 46 misc Reply Mon 01/13 10:45 AM
DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO44 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant Mitchell Burgess. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
45 45 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court Mon 01/13 10:43 AM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant Mitchell Burgess..(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Monday, January 06, 2025
44 44 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court Mon 01/06 3:13 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC..(Strapp, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Thursday, January 02, 2025
43 43 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Thu 01/02 10:50 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, this case is redrawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00252-DDD-KAS.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
42 42 order Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict Thu 01/02 10:01 AM
ORDER GRANTING41 Motion for Leave to Restrict. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain Docs.36 , 36-2, 36-7, 36-10, 36-14, and 36-15 at Level 1 restriction. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/2/2025. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
41 41 motion Leave to Restrict Fri 12/27 3:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC.(Strapp, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
40 40 order Order on Motion for Leave to Restrict Tue 12/24 1:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING39 Emergency Motion to Seal Defendants' Response to36 Motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain Docs.38 , 38-8, 38-9, and 38-21 at Level 1 restriction. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/24/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
39 39 motion Leave to Restrict Tue 12/24 1:32 PM
Emergency MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC.(Strapp, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Monday, December 23, 2024
38 38 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/23 11:00 AM
RESPONSE to 37 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause, filed by Defendant Mitchell Burgess.(ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22
Friday, December 13, 2024
36 36 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court Fri 12/13 1:29 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC..(Strapp, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michael Strapp,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Declaration of Amanda Koplin,
Att: 16 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Monday, April 17, 2023
35 35 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 04/17 1:48 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk on 4/17/2023 in favor of Pipeline Conditioning, LLC against Burgess Pipeline Services LLC, Mitchell Burgess re:34 Order on Motion for Order entered by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/17/2023. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
34 34 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Mon 04/17 12:46 PM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Mitchell Burgess is ENJOINED from: (1) engaging in any business activities that directly or indirectly compete with any business conducted by Plaintiff PipelineConditioning, LLC until no earlier than January 14, 2024; (2) directly or indirectly soliciting any client or customer of Pipeline until no earlier than January 14, 2024; (3) directly or indirectly soliciting any employee or contractor of Pipeline to terminate his or her relationship with Pipeline or enter into any relationship with any entity other than Pipeline or hire or assist any other entity in hiring any employee or contractor of Pipeline who was an employee or contractor of Pipeline, until no earlier than January 14, 2024; and (4) using or disclosing to others any Pipeline trade secret orPipeline confidential information. It is FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all claims asserted by Pipeline against the defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and the Clerkof Court is DIRECTED to close this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/17/2023. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
33 33 3 pgs motion Order Wed 04/05 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Motion for Stipulated Injunction and for Dismissal by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC(Romero, Melissa) Modified on 4/5/2023 to correct event (athom, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Thursday, March 16, 2023
32 32 order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Stay Thu 03/16 3:05 PM
ORDER GRANTING31 Unopposed Motion to Stay. This case is hereby STAYED for thirty days while the parties finalize their settlement agreement. The parties must file appropriate dismissal papers or a joint report regarding the status of settlement on or before 4/17/2023. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Doc. 11 , is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/16/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Stay Thu 03/16 2:52 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines for 30 Days by Defendants Mitchell Burgess, Burgess Pipeline Services LLC.(Pasternak, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/07 1:34 PM
ANSWER to6 Complaint by Mitchell Burgess, Burgess Pipeline Services LLC.(Pasternak, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
29 29 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/06 11:59 AM
ORDER GRANTING28 Third Unopposed Motion for Extension to File Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants' response to3 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 3/24/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/6/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/06 11:24 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Mitchell Burgess, Burgess Pipeline Services LLC.(Pasternak, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
Friday, February 24, 2023
27 27 3 pgs order Order Fri 02/24 2:21 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 02/24/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/8/2023. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 6/15/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (alave, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 2 Continuation of Main Document,
Att: 3 Continuation of Main Document
Thursday, February 23, 2023
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/23 1:03 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Second) by Defendants Mitchell Burgess, Burgess Pipeline Services LLC.(Pasternak, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/23 3:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING25 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants' response to3 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 3/10/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/23/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/13 2:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Mitchell Burgess, Burgess Pipeline Services LLC.(Pasternak, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only)
22 22 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 02/13 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Gerard Pasternak on behalf of Mitchell Burgess, Burgess Pipeline Services LLCAttorney Thomas Gerard Pasternak added to party Mitchell Burgess(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Gerard Pasternak added to party Burgess Pipeline Services LLC(pty:dft) (Pasternak, Thomas)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/13 3:44 PM
ORDER GRANTING23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants' response to3 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 2/24/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/13/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/06 10:50 AM
NOTICE re 20 Order,,,, Notice of Compliance with Court Order by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Kathryn
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, February 03, 2023
order Order Fri 02/03 10:20 AM
ORDER RE:3 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The defendants must respond to the motion by 2/15/2023. The plaintiff may file a reply in support of the motion within one week of the defendants' response. After reviewing the defendants' response and the plaintiff's reply, if any, I will determine whether to (a) set a preliminary-injunction hearing, (b) request supplemental briefing from the parties on specific legal or factual questions, or (c) decide the motion on the papers submitted. The plaintiff's counsel states that she has been in contact with the defendants' counsel concerning the motion. (Doc.3 at 1.) As no attorney has yet entered an appearance on behalf of the defendants, the plaintiff's counsel are directed to provide the defendants' counsel with a copy of this Order as soon as possible but no later than 05:00 PM today 2/3/2023 . SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/3/2023. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
19 19 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Thu 02/02 5:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pipeline Conditioning, LLC. Mitchell Burgess served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (Romero, Melissa)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Thu 02/02 5:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pipeline Conditioning, LLC. Burgess Pipeline Services LLC served on 2/1/2023, answer due 2/22/2023. (Romero, Melissa)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 02/02 9:55 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2 February 2023. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 02/02 7:13 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael G. Strapp on behalf of Pipeline Conditioning, LLCAttorney Michael G. Strapp added to party Pipeline Conditioning, LLC(pty:pla) (Strapp, Michael)
Related: [-]
misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Thu 02/02 9:57 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE pursuant to16 Order of Recusal. Case redrawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00252-DDD-KLM.(Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 02/01 8:31 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/1/2023. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
13 13 misc Summons Issued Tue 01/31 7:46 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (athom, )
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Tue 01/31 7:45 PM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-00252-DDD. (athom, )
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Summons Request Tue 01/31 1:36 PM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Mitchell Burgess by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC. (Romero, Melissa)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Summons Issued Tue 01/31 12:04 PM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. No Summons Issued for Mitchell Burgess. (tgall, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
8 8 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 01/31 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melissa Lawson Romero on behalf of Pipeline Conditioning, LLCAttorney Melissa Lawson Romero added to party Pipeline Conditioning, LLC(pty:pla) (Romero, Melissa)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Complaint Tue 01/31 11:30 AM
Redacted COMPLAINT against Mitchell Burgess, Burgess Pipeline Services LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8911177), filed by Pipeline Conditioning, LLC Related [+] Modified on 1/31/2023 to add title of document (athom, )
Related: [-] illy, Kathryn
misc Administrative Notice Tue 01/31 9:31 AM
Administrative Notice:No public initiating document filed and No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
Related: [-]
misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 01/31 11:58 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
4 4 misc Summons Request Mon 01/30 8:18 AM
SUMMONS REQUEST as to Burgess Pipeline Services by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Kathryn
Friday, January 27, 2023
3 3 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court Fri 01/27 7:35 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC.. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Kathryn
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Koplin Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Strapp Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Confidentiality Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Domain,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-BPS Registration,
Att: 6 Exhibit F-Letters to Burgess,
Att: 7 Exhibit G-Response Letters,
Att: 8 Exhibit H-Burgess Pipeline Services,
Att: 9 Exhibit I-Jobs,
Att: 10 Exhibit J-Pickling & Conditioning,
Att: 11 Exhibit K-Natural Gas Odorizers,
Att: 12 Exhibit L-Project Management,
Att: 13 Exhibit M-Mobile Combustion,
Att: 14 Exhibit N-Burgess LinkedIn,
Att: 15 Exhibit O-Pipeline Services at Pipeline Conditioning,
Att: 16 Exhibit P-Gas Odorization Services from Pipeline Conditioning,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q-Burgess,
Att: 18 Exhibit R-Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/27 6:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Kathryn
1 1 misc Restricted Doc. - Level 1 - Viewable by Case Participants & Court Fri 01/27 6:00 PM
RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC.. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Kathryn
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Confidentiality Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Domain,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-BPS Registration,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 01/31 7:36 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Pipeline Conditioning, LLC. (Public Entry for Level 1 Restricted Document3 ). Text Only Entry (athom, )
Related: [-]