Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00003
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2023 2:37 AM EST
Defendant
Ismaelle Manuel (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Yolande G. Viacava
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info
James A. Muench
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/28/2023 3:02 AM EST
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Ismaelle Manuel (1) count(s) 1-3, 4-6, 7. (SEH) (SEH).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment
Att: 2 (1/26/2023) Indictment
4 4 ORDER as to Ismaelle Manuel: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny and orders the United States to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, and sanctions. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 1/26/2023. (SEH)
Related: [-]