California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00014
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jan 27, 2023 11:35 PM PST
Defendant
Pablo Valente Castaneda (1)
Represented By
Peter Michael Jones
Wanger Jones Helsley PC
contact info
Defendant
Giselle Carrillo Corral (3)
Defendant
Angelica Marie Romo (2)
Represented By
Anthony P. Capozzi
Law Offices Of Anthony P. Capozzi
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Stephanie Stokman
United States Attorney'S Office, Edca
contact info
Fresno Forfeiture Unit
United States Attorney'S Office, Fresno
contact info

GPO Jan 10 2023
SEALING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/10/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Flores, E)[1:23-mj-00005-EPG]SEALING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/10/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Flores, E)[1:23-mj-00005-EPG]SEALING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/10/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Flores, E)[1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
GPO Jan 17 2023
ORDER to UNSEAL Redacted Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/17/2023 as to Giselle Carrillo Corral (3). (Marrujo, C)[1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
GPO Jan 19 2023
ORDER to UNSEAL COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/19/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Maldonado, C)[1:23-mj-00005-EPG]ORDER to UNSEAL COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/19/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Maldonado, C)[1:23-mj-00005-EPG]ORDER to UNSEAL COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/19/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Maldonado, C)[1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
GPO Jan 24 2023
DETENTION ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/24/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda. (Kusamura, W)[1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
GPO Jan 25 2023
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS of RELEASE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/25/2023 as to Angelica Marie Romo (2). (Kusamura, W)[1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
GPO Jan 25 2023
ORDER re APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE BOND. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/25/2023 as to Angelica Marie Romo. (Kusamura, W)[1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
GPO Jan 27 2023
ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY Peter Michael Jones for Pablo Valente Castaneda, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/26/202. (Martin-Gill, S)
GPO Jan 27 2023
ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY Anthony P. Capozzi for Angelica Marie Romo, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/26/2023. (Martin-Gill, S)
GPO Apr 20 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act, as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), Angelica Marie Romo (2), and Giselle Carrillo Corral (3), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/2023. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from April 26, 2023, to July 12, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act, as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), Angelica Marie Romo (2), and Giselle Carrillo Corral (3), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/2023. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from April 26, 2023, to July 12, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act, as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), Angelica Marie Romo (2), and Giselle Carrillo Corral (3), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/2023. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from April 26, 2023, to July 12, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Jun 12 2023
ORDER DENYING 54 Motion to Revoke as to Giselle Carrillo Corral (3) signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 6/12/2023. (Hernandez, M)
GPO Jun 28 2023
ORDER re Request for Rule 43 Waiver of Appearance, as to Angelica Marie Romo (2), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/28/2023. Good cause appearing, it is hereby ordered that Defendant's appearance may be waived at any and all non-substantive proceedings until further order. (Valdez, E)
GPO Jun 30 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act, as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), Angelica Marie Romo (2), and Giselle Carrillo Corral (3), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/30/2023. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from July 12, 2023, to October 25, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act, as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), Angelica Marie Romo (2), and Giselle Carrillo Corral (3), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/30/2023. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from July 12, 2023, to October 25, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act, as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), Angelica Marie Romo (2), and Giselle Carrillo Corral (3), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/30/2023. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from July 12, 2023, to October 25, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Jul 19 2023
ORDER REASSIGNING Cases for all Purposes signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 7/17/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Sant Agata, S)ORDER REASSIGNING Cases for all Purposes signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 7/17/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Sant Agata, S)ORDER REASSIGNING Cases for all Purposes signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 7/17/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Sant Agata, S)
GPO Aug 11 2023
STIPULATION TO SET CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING AND EXCLUDE TIME UNDER SPEEDY TRIAL ACT; FINDINGS AND ORDER as to Giselle Carrillo Corral signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/11/2023. IT IS SO ORDERED the status conference set for October 25, 2023 is vacated. A change of plea hearing is set for October 2, 2023, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1 (ADA) before District Judge Ana de Alba. Time has already been excluded through October 25, 2023. (Gonzales, V)
GPO Sep 12 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER TO RESET CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING as to Giselle Carrillo Corral signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 9/12/2023. Change of Plea Hearing is RESET from 10/2/2023 to 10/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 1 (ADA) before District Judge Ana de Alba. (Hernandez, M)
GPO Oct 20 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), and Angelica Marie Romo (2) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/20/2023. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from October 25, 2023, to March 13, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), and Angelica Marie Romo (2) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/20/2023. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from October 25, 2023, to March 13, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Feb 23 2024
JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT signed by District Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/23/2024 as to Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Gonzales, V)
GPO Mar 08 2024
STIPULATION REGARDING EXCLUDABLE TIME PERIODS UNDER SPEEDY TRIAL ACT; FINDINGS AND ORDER as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/8/2024. IT IS SO ORDERED that the Status Conference is continued from March 13, 2024, to May 22, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Navarro, F)STIPULATION REGARDING EXCLUDABLE TIME PERIODS UNDER SPEEDY TRIAL ACT; FINDINGS AND ORDER as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/8/2024. IT IS SO ORDERED that the Status Conference is continued from March 13, 2024, to May 22, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Navarro, F)
GPO May 14 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), and Angelica Marie Romo (2) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/14/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from May 22, 2024, to July 10, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), and Angelica Marie Romo (2) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/14/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from May 22, 2024, to July 10, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Jun 28 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), and Angelica Marie Romo (2) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/28/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from July 10, 2024, to November 13, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Excludable Time Periods Under Speedy Trial Act as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), and Angelica Marie Romo (2) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/28/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference is continued from July 10, 2024, to November 13, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 8 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Aug 05 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Set Change of Plea Hearing and Exclude Time Under Speedy Trial Act as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/5/2024. It is so ordered that the status conference set for November 13, 2024, is vacated. A change of plea hearing is set for October 24, 2024, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before the District Court Judge. Time is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§ 3161(h)(7)(A), B(iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Nov 06 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue the Status Conference as to Angelica Marie Romo (2) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/6/2024. Upon the Parties' stipulation and for good cause shown, the Status Conference scheduled for November 13, 2024, at 1:00 p.m. is continued until January 8, 2025, at 1:00 p.m. before the Honorable McAuliffe. The period through January 8, 2025, inclusive, is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §§ 3161(h)(7)(A) and 3161(h)(7)(B)(i) and (iv). (Valdez, E)
GPO Dec 10 2024
PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE signed by Chief District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/10/2024 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda. (Nair, C)
GPO Dec 26 2024
STIPULATION and ORDER to Vacate the Status Conference as to Angelica Marie Romo (2) signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/26/2024. Upon the Parties' stipulation and for good cause shown, the Status Conference scheduled for January 8, 2025, at 1:00 p.m. is vacated and a change of plea be set for March 10, 2025 at 8:30 am before the District Court Judge. The period through March 17, 2025, inclusive, is excluded pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §§ 3161(h)(7)(A) and 3161(h)(7)(B)(i) and (iv). (Valdez, E)

Docket last updated: 01/27/2023 11:58 PM PST
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1), Angelica Marie Romo (2), Giselle Carrillo Corral (3). (Flores, E) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/13/2023) (Lundstrom, T). [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
5 5 APPLICATION for Order Sealing by USA as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Flores, E) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
6 6 SEALING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/10/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Flores, E) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
7 7 MOTION to UNSEAL Redacted Complaint by USA as to Giselle Carrillo Corral (3). (Marrujo, C) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER to UNSEAL Redacted Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/17/2023 as to Giselle Carrillo Corral (3). (Marrujo, C) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
9 9 CRIMINAL COMPLAINT Related [+] as to Giselle Carrillo Corral (3). (Marrujo, C) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-] dacted
Thursday, January 19, 2023
10 10 MOTION to UNSEAL COMPLAINT by USA as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Maldonado, C) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER to UNSEAL COMPLAINT, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/19/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda, Angelica Marie Romo, Giselle Carrillo Corral. (Maldonado, C) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
12 12 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 01/19/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda. (Maldonado, C) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
13 13 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 01/19/2023 as to Angelica Marie Romo. (Maldonado, C) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
14 14 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: INITIAL APPEARANCE ON COMPLAINT as to Angelica Marie Romo held on 1/19/2023. Defendant preliminarily advised of charges/rights. As defendant advised that she will be seeking to retain counsel, a CONTINUED INITIAL APPEARANCE ON COMPLAINT HEARING is set for 1/23/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Defendant ordered temporarily detained pending her next hearing.) Government Counsel: Stephanie Stokman present. Defense Counsel: Erin Snider (special appearance for today only) present. Custody Status: Custody - FCJ (via Zoom) present. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Araceli Gil-Garcia. (Rooney, M) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
16 16 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: INITIAL APPEARANCE ON COMPLAINT as to Pablo Valente Castaneda held on 1/19/2023. The hearing was conducted via video and in person pursuant to General Orders 614, 620, 624, 628, 630, 632, 635, 640, 649, 652, 655, and 656 and the CARES Act. Defendant and counsel consented to the appearance by video. Upon review of defendant's financial affidavit, CJA Panel Attorney Peter Jones was appointed. Defendant advised of charges/rights; reading/advisement waived; true name stated as charged; DENIAL ENTERED. DETENTION HEARING set for 1/24/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto (defendant ordered temporarily detained pending said hearing) . At the request of defense counsel, and with good cause found by the Court to hold the preliminary examination outside of the statutory time-frame, the Court sets the PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION HEARING for 2/3/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Government Counsel: Stephanie Stokman present. Defense Counsel: Peter Jones present. Custody Status: Custody (present via Zoom). Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO - Araceli Gil-Garcia. (Rooney, M) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
17 17 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Angelica Marie Romo held on 1/23/2023. The Court noted the hearing was being conducted via video conference pursuant to General Order 614, 620, 624, 628, 630, 632, 635, 640, 649, 652, 655 and 656 the CARES Act. Defendant and counsel consented to the appearance by video and government counsel also consented to appearance by video. Defendant is advised of charges and rights; Financial affidavit submitted on behalf of defendant. The Court appoints a panel counsel to represent defendant. Defendant acknowledged receipt of the complaint and waives formal reading and statutory and constitutional rights. DENIAL of the allegations. The court instructed government counsel under Rule 5(f) to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland. Detention Hearing set for 1/25/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Defendant is Ordered TEMPORARILY detained. Preliminary Examination set for 2/2/2023 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Government Counsel: Stephanie Stokman present. Defense Counsel: Anthony Capozzi present. Custody Status: CUSTODY - FCJ (ZOOM). Court Reporter/CD Number: Otilia Rosales. Pretrial Services Officer: Ryan Beckwith. (Kusamura, W) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER (TEXT ONLY) as to Defendant Angelica Marie Romo signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/23/2023: According to the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure Rule 5(f), the government is ordered to comply with its discovery obligations as required by federal law, including those duties imposed by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions interpreting Brady. This order does not relieve any party of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating this order or the government's obligations under Brady may include sanctions, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges, among other consequences. (Kusamura, W) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
20 20 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: DETENTION HEARING as to Pablo Valente Castaneda held on 1/24/2023. The Court noted the hearing was being conducted via video conference pursuant to General Order 614, 620, 624, 628, 630, 632, 635, 640, 649, 652, 655 and 656 the CARES Act. Defendant and counsel consented to the appearance by video and government counsel also consented to appearance by video. The matter of Detention was argued and submitted. The Court Orders Defendant to remain DETAINED in the care control and custody of the US Marshals. PRELIMINARY EXAM is set for 2/3/2023. Government Counsel: Stephanie Stokman present. Defense Counsel: Peter Jones present. Custody Status: CUSTODY - FCJ. Court Reporter/CD Number: Otilia Rosales. Pretrial Services Officer: Anthony Perez. (Kusamura, W) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
21 21 DETENTION ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/24/2023 as to Pablo Valente Castaneda. (Kusamura, W) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
22 22 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: DETENTION HEARING as to Angelica Marie Romo held on 1/25/2023. The Court noted the hearing was being conducted via video conference pursuant to General Order 614, 620, 624, 628, 630, 632, 635, 640, 649, 652, 655 and 656 the CARES Act. Defendant and counsel consented to the appearance by video and government counsel also consented to appearance by video. The matter of Detention was submitted. The Court RELEASES the defendant on O/R with a 3rd party custodian and special conditions. All conditions were read into the record. The defendant is to surrender her passport to the Clerk's office by no later than 1/27/2023. Government Counsel: Stephanie Stokman present. Defense Counsel: Anthony Capozzi present. Custody Status: CUSTODY - FCJ. Court Reporter/CD Number: Otilia Rosales. Pretrial Services Officer: Liz Gutierrez. (Kusamura, W) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
23 23 NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Anthony P. Capozzi appearing for Angelica Marie Romo. Attorney Capozzi, Anthony P. added. Notice of Appearance (Capozzi, Anthony) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS of RELEASE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/25/2023 as to Angelica Marie Romo (2). (Kusamura, W) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER re APPEARANCE AND COMPLIANCE BOND. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/25/2023 as to Angelica Marie Romo. (Kusamura, W) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
26 26 COLLATERAL RECEIVED as to Angelica Marie Romo: USA Passport No. 661317347 from Angelica Marie Romo. (Lawrence, A) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
27 27 COLLATERAL RECEIVED as to Angelica Marie Romo: USA Passport Card No. C24843744 from Angelica Marie Romo. (Lawrence, A) [1:23-mj-00005-EPG]
Related: [-]
28 28 INDICTMENT as to Pablo Valente Castaneda (1) count(s) 1, 3, 4, Angelica Marie Romo (2) count(s) 1, 4, Giselle Carrillo Corral (3) count(s) 1, 2. (Martin-Gill, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 True Bill and Information Sheet