Original Case: 1:18-cv-00181

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01147
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2023
Terminated:May 24, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 27, 2024 5:10 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Rick Fisher
Represented By
Lisa Andersen
BRAATEN LAW FIRM
contact info
Derrick Braaten
BRAATEN LAW FIRM
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Rosella Fisher
Represented By
Lisa Andersen
BRAATEN LAW FIRM
contact info
Derrick Braaten
BRAATEN LAW FIRM
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Continental Resources, Inc., an Oklahoma corporation
Represented By
Alexander K. Obrecht
BAKER & HOSTETLER
contact info
Lawrence Bender
FREDRIKSON & BYRON
contact info
Lyle Poe Leggette
BAKER & HOSTETLER
contact info
Cody T. Vasut
BAKER & HOSTETLER
contact info
Renee M. Knudsen
BAKER & HOSTETLER
contact info
William Ray Whitman
BAKER & HOSTETLER
contact info
Andrew Michael Grossman
BAKER & HOSTETLER
contact info

GPO May 24 2024
OPINION FILED - THE COURT: Lavenski R. Smith, James B. Loken and Steven M. Colloton
AUTHORING JUDGE:Lavenski R. Smith (PUBLISHED) [5397201] [23-1147]

Docket last updated: 05/27/2024 5:10 AM CDT
Thursday, January 26, 2023
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5239560] 23-1147 (MMH)
Related: [-]
30+ pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Judgment 10/7/22, Order on motion for judgment of dismisal and order awarding fees/costs 12/27/22, and AMD Judgment 12/27/22 [5239566] 23-1147 (MMH)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Transcript due on or before 03/07/2023. Appendix due 03/17/2023. BRIEF APPELLANT, Continental Resources, Inc. due 03/17/2023
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5239567] 23-1147 (MMH)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Derrick L. Braaten for Appellees Rick Fisher and Rosella Fisher w/service 01/26/2023 [5239646] 23-1147 (DB)
Related: [-]