Original Case: 1:21-cv-02265

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cvpri-07010
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2023
Terminated:Dec 29, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 01, 2024 3:20 AM EST
Defendant - Appellant
Donald J. Trump, solely in his personal capacity
Represented By
Mary Cecilia McCann
Binnall Law Group
contact info
Jesse R. Binnall
Binnall Law Group
contact info
David Warrington
Dhillon Law Group, Inc.
contact info
Jason Caldwell Greaves
Binnall Law Group
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Alan Hostetter
Represented By
Alan Hostetter
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Zachary Rehl
Represented By
Patrick Trainor
Law Office of Patrick Trainor, Esq., LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Charles Donohoe
Defendant - Appellee
Dominic J. Pezzola
Defendant - Appellee
Oath Keepers
Defendant - Appellee
Stewart Rhodes
Defendant - Appellee
Thomas E. Caldwell
Represented By
Thomas E. Caldwell
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Jessica Watkins
Defendant - Appellee
Kelly Meggs
Represented By
Juli Zsuzsa Haller
Law Offices of Julia Haller
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Ethan Nordean
Represented By
Nicholas David Smith
David B. Smith PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Russell Taylor
Represented By
Dyke Huish
Law Office of Dyke Huish
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Erik Scott Warner
Represented By
Erik Scott Warner
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Felipe Antonio Martinez, Tony
Represented By
Nicholas David Smith
David B. Smith PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Derek Kinnison
Represented By
Nicholas David Smith
David B. Smith PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Ronald Mele
Represented By
Steven C. Bailey
Bailey & Romero
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
John Does, 1-10
Defendant - Appellee
Make America Great Again PAC
Represented By
Mary Cecilia McCann
Binnall Law Group
contact info
Jesse R. Binnall
Binnall Law Group
contact info
Jason Caldwell Greaves
Binnall Law Group
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Joseph R. Biggs
Represented By
John Daniel Hull IV
Hull Mcguire PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Enrique Tarrio
Represented By
John Daniel Hull IV
Hull Mcguire PC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Proud Boys International, L.L.C.
Defendant - Appellee
Proud Boys, an unincorporated association
Defendant - Appellee
Roger J. Stone
Represented By
Robert C. Buschel
Buschel Gibbons, P.A.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Brandon J. Straka
Represented By
Stephen Klein
Barr & Klein PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Ali Alexander, also known as Ali Abdul Razaq
Represented By
Paul Douglas Kamenar
Law Office of Paul Kamener
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Stop the Steal L.L.C.
Defendant - Appellee
Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.
Represented By
Mary Cecilia McCann
Binnall Law Group
contact info
Jesse R. Binnall
Binnall Law Group
contact info
Jason Caldwell Greaves
Binnall Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Danny L. McElroy
Represented By
Duncan Taylor
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Connor Sullivan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Mark J. Cherry
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Edward G. Caspar
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Elizabeth Brooks Honkonen
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Blas
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William J. Blechman
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jon M. Greenbaum
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Faith Gay
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
contact info
Samuel Whipple
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Katherinee Michelle Marquart
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Alyse Wren Ullery
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Byron Evans
Represented By
Duncan Taylor
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Connor Sullivan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Mark J. Cherry
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Edward G. Caspar
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Elizabeth Brooks Honkonen
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Blas
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William J. Blechman
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jon M. Greenbaum
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Faith Gay
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
contact info
Samuel Whipple
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Katherinee Michelle Marquart
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Alyse Wren Ullery
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Governor Latson
Represented By
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Duncan Taylor
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jon M. Greenbaum
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Faith Gay
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
contact info
Samuel Whipple
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Katherinee Michelle Marquart
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Mark J. Cherry
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Alyse Wren Ullery
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Edward G. Caspar
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Elizabeth Brooks Honkonen
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Blas
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William J. Blechman
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Melissa Marshall
Represented By
Duncan Taylor
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Connor Sullivan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Mark J. Cherry
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Edward G. Caspar
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Elizabeth Brooks Honkonen
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Blas
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William J. Blechman
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jon M. Greenbaum
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Faith Gay
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
contact info
Samuel Whipple
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Katherinee Michelle Marquart
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Alyse Wren Ullery
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Michael Fortune
Represented By
Duncan Taylor
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Connor Sullivan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Mark J. Cherry
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Edward G. Caspar
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Elizabeth Brooks Honkonen
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Blas
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William J. Blechman
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jon M. Greenbaum
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Faith Gay
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
contact info
Samuel Whipple
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Katherinee Michelle Marquart
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Alyse Wren Ullery
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Jason Deroche
Represented By
Duncan Taylor
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Connor Sullivan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Mark J. Cherry
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Edward G. Caspar
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Elizabeth Brooks Honkonen
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Blas
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William J. Blechman
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jon M. Greenbaum
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Faith Gay
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
contact info
Samuel Whipple
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Katherinee Michelle Marquart
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Alyse Wren Ullery
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Reginald Cleveland
Represented By
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Duncan Taylor
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jon M. Greenbaum
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Faith Gay
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
contact info
Samuel Whipple
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Katherinee Michelle Marquart
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Mark J. Cherry
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Alyse Wren Ullery
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Edward G. Caspar
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Elizabeth Brooks Honkonen
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Blas
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William J. Blechman
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Conrad P. Smith
Represented By
Duncan Taylor
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Connor Sullivan
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Mark J. Cherry
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Edward G. Caspar
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Elizabeth Brooks Honkonen
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Lauren Blas
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
William J. Blechman
Kenny Nachwalter, P.A.
contact info
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jon M. Greenbaum
Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
contact info
Faith Gay
Selendy Gay Elsberg PLLC
contact info
Samuel Whipple
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Katherinee Michelle Marquart
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Alyse Wren Ullery
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 29 2023
PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [2033738] filed (without memorandum) that the district court's denial of appellant's motion to dismiss the claims against him on the grounds of presidential immunity be affirmed (SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS), withholding issuance of the mandate. Before Judges: Srinivasan, Garcia and Rogers. [23-7010]

Docket last updated: 01/01/2024 3:20 AM EST
Friday, January 27, 2023
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 23-7010
Related: [-]
61 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1983536] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:21-cv-02265-APM filed by Donald J. Trump. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 23-7010 23-7010
Related: [-]
1 pgs LETTER [1983539] sent regarding attorney membership to Steven C. Bailey for Ronald Mele, Juli Zsuzsa Haller for Kelly Meggs, Dyke Huish for Russell Taylor and Patrick Trainor for Zachary Rehl. Application for Admission due 02/27/2023. 23-7010
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1983563] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 02/27/2023. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 02/27/2023. APPELLANT statement of issues due 02/27/2023. APPELLANT underlying decision due 02/27/2023. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 02/27/2023. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 02/27/2023. APPELLANT transcript status report due 02/27/2023. APPELLANT procedural motions due 02/27/2023. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 03/13/2023; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 02/27/2023. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 02/27/2023. APPELLEE procedural motions due 02/27/2023. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 03/13/2023 23-7010
Related: [-]